Hughes et al v. Zarrab et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hughes, Kristine Zitny, Kathleen Alexander, Patricia Hughes, Patricia Goins, Paul Goins, III, Janice Caruso, Dana Rainey, Emmitt Burns, Helena Davis, C.D., Mary Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Regina Smedinghoff, Joan Smedinghoff, Mark Smedinghoff, Miranda Landrum, G.L., B.L., Janet Landrum, James Landrum, Tracey Prescott, Joseph Prescott, Jacob Prescott, Aaron Prescott, Joshua Prescott, Christine Phillips, S.P., Maria Cardoza, Ramiro Cardoza, Sr., Ramiro Cardoza, Jr., Chet Murach, William Murach, Samantha McNamara, Brenda Daehling, Kirk Daehling, Adam Daehling, Kayla Daehling, Joanna Gilbert, Jessica Benson, Lieselotte Roldan, Matthias Roldan, Angel Roldan, Samantha Roldan, Chapman Good, Nancy Mullen, Miriam Mullen, William Mullen, Joelle Ellis, John Ellis, James Ellis, Brandon Korona, Michelle Zimmerman, Chris Zimmerman, Baily Zimmerman, Lorria Welch, Barry Welch, Zackary Welch, Bruce Nichols, Jeanne Nichols, Molly Nichols, Tammy Olmstead, William M. Burley, Dan Olmstead, Michael Collins, Martha Smith, Thomas Wickliff, Michelle Rotelli, Sheila Long, Nancy Wilson, Kapriel Wilson, Mara Wilson, Ashley Gerding, G.P., Deborah Peters, Dennis Peters, Michael Donios, Esta Smith, Joe Torian, Nathan Torian, Emily Torian, Jimmy Smith, Joseph Jones, Jr., Alberto Diaz, Kayla Diaz, N.J.A.D., N.J.D., Frances Diaz, Maximo Diaz, Anthony Diaz, Matthew Diaz, Michelle Riley, Rodney Riley, Julie Martin, Brian Martin, Catherine Martin, Elizabeth Martin, Kelli-Jo Dodge, B.D., P.D., Kathleen McEvoy, Patrick McEvoy, Michelle McEvoy, Janice Proctor, Luann Varney, Summer Sutton, Erin Goss, Harriet Sutton, Wendy Shedd, Trecia Brock Hood, Freddie Sutton, Annie McBride, Chester R. McBride, Sr., Alexandra McClintock, D.M., Joyce Paulsen, George McClintock, III, Kevin King, Stephanie Miller, Anngel Norkist, William Newnham, Hart Norkist, Aujza Norkist, Nicole Kamaleson, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Sunderraj Kamaleson and Matthew Schrier
Defendant: Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., Reza Zarrab and Halkbank
Case Number: 1:2023cv06481
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2333 Civil Remedies: Anti-Terrorism Act of 1991
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for James W Kirkpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for James W. Kirkpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28308463. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S...(Kirkpatrick, James)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Simon A. Latcovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28308374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S...(Latcovich, Simon) Modified on 9/19/2023 (vba).
September 19, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for James W. Kirkpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28308463. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 19, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Simon A. Latcovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28308374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of VA;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M Cary on behalf of Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S...(Cary, Robert)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Kathleen Alexander, B.D., B.L., Jessica Benson, C.D., Maria Cardoza, Ramiro Cardoza, Jr, Ramiro Cardoza, Sr, Janice Caruso, Michael Collins, D.M., Adam Daehling, Brenda Daehling, Kayla Daehling, Kirk Daehling, Helena Davis, Alberto Diaz, Anthony Diaz, Frances Diaz, Kayla Diaz, Matthew Diaz, Maximo Diaz, Kelli-Jo Dodge, Michael Donios, James Ellis, Joelle Ellis, John Ellis, Emmitt Burns, G.L., G.P., Ashley Gerding, Joanna Gilbert, Patricia Goins, Chapman Good, Erin Goss, Trecia Brock Hood, Patricia Hughes, Daniel Hughes, Joan Smedinghoff, Joseph Jones, Jr, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Nicole Kamaleson, Kevin King, Brandon Korona, Kristine Zitny, James Landrum, Janet Landrum, Miranda Landrum, Lieselotte Roldan, Sheila Long, Mark Smedinghoff, Brian Martin, Catherine Martin, Elizabeth Martin, Julie Martin, Matthias Roldan, Annie McBride, Chester R. McBride, Sr, Alexandra McClintock, George McClintock, III, Kathleen McEvoy, Michelle McEvoy, Patrick McEvoy, Samantha McNamara, Stephanie Miller, Miriam Mullen, Nancy Mullen, William Mullen, Chet Murach, William Murach, N.J.A.D., N.J.D., William Newnham, Bruce Nichols, Jeanne Nichols, Molly Nichols, Anngel Norkist, Aujza Norkist, Hart Norkist, Dan Olmstead, Tammy Olmstead, P.D., Paul Goins, III, Joyce Paulsen, Deborah Peters, Dennis Peters, Christine Phillips, Aaron Prescott, Jacob Prescott, Joseph Prescott, Joshua Prescott, Tracey Prescott, Janice Proctor, Dana Rainey, Regina Smedinghoff, Michelle Riley, Rodney Riley, Angel Roldan, Michelle Rotelli, S.P., Samantha Roldan, Matthew Schrier, Wendy Shedd, Mary Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Esta Smith, Jimmy Smith, Martha Smith, Sunderraj Kamaleson, Freddie Sutton, Harriet Sutton, Summer Sutton, Emily Torian, Joe Torian, Nathan Torian, Luann Varney, Barry Welch, Lorria Welch, Zackary Welch, Thomas Wickliff, William M. Burley, Kapriel Wilson, Mara Wilson, Nancy Wilson, Baily Zimmerman, Chris Zimmerman, Michelle Zimmerman..(Singh, Tejinder)
July 27, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 27, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tejinder Singh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Daniel Owen Hughes;Kristine A. Zitny, Paul Edward Goins, III, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Samantha G. Roldan, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Matthias P. Roldan, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, William Burley, Halkbank to Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
July 27, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 27, 2023 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 26, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Joshua Goldstein on behalf of Kathleen Alexander, B.D., B.L., Jessica Benson, William Burley, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, C.D., Maria Cardoza, Ramiro Cardoza, Jr, Ramiro Cardoza, Sr, Janice Caruso, Michael Collins, D.M., Adam Daehling, Brenda Daehling, Kayla Daehling, Kirk Daehling, Helena Davis, Alberto Diaz, Anthony Diaz, Frances Diaz, Kayla Diaz, Matthew Diaz, Maximo Diaz, Kelli-Jo Dodge, Michael Donios, James Ellis, Joelle Ellis, John Ellis, G.L., G.P., Ashley Gerding, Joanna Gilbert, Patricia Goins, Paul Edward Goins, III, Chapman Good, Erin Goss, Trecia Brock Hood, Daniel Owen Hughes, Patricia Hughes, Joseph Jones, Jr, Barclay Kamaleson, Cade Kamaleson, Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Nicole Kamaleson, Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Kevin King, Brandon Korona, James Landrum, Janet Landrum, Miranda Landrum, Sheila Long, Brian Martin, Catherine Martin, Elizabeth Martin, Julie Martin, Annie McBride, Chester R. McBride, Sr, Alexandra McClintock, George McClintock, III, Kathleen McEvoy, Michelle McEvoy, Patrick McEvoy, Samantha McNamara, Stephanie Miller, Miriam Mullen, Nancy Mullen, William Mullen, Chet Murach, William Murach, N.J.A.D., N.J.D., William Newnham, Bruce Nichols, Jeanne Nichols, Molly Nichols, Anngel Norkist, Aujza Norkist, Hart Norkist, Dan Olmstead, Tammy Olmstead, P.D., Joyce Paulsen, Deborah Peters, Dennis Peters, Christine Phillips, Aaron Prescott, Jacob Prescott, Joseph Prescott, Joshua Prescott, Tracey Prescott, Janice Proctor, Dana Rainey, Michelle Riley, Rodney Riley, Angel Roldan, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Matthias P. Roldan, Samantha G. Roldan, Michelle Rotelli, S.P., Matthew Schrier, Wendy Shedd, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Mary Smedinghoff, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Thomas Smedinghoff, Esta Smith, Jimmy Smith, Martha Smith, Freddie Sutton, Harriet Sutton, Summer Sutton, Emily Torian, Joe Torian, Nathan Torian, Luann Varney, Barry Welch, Lorria Welch, Zackary Welch, Thomas Wickliff, Kapriel Wilson, Mara Wilson, Nancy Wilson, Baily Zimmerman, Chris Zimmerman, Michelle Zimmerman, Kristine A. Zitny..(Goldstein, Adam)
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Singh, Tejinder)
July 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., Reza Zarrab. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28059876)Document filed by Chet Murach, Cade Kamaleson, Anthony Diaz, Kapriel Wilson, Kevin King, Patrick McEvoy, G.L., Cedric Paul Kamaleson, Mark T. Smedinghoff, Samantha G. Roldan, Baily Zimmerman, Christine Phillips, Alberto Diaz, Barry Welch, Brian Martin, Janet Landrum, Wendy Shedd, Maximo Diaz, Ramiro Cardoza, Jr, Brenda Daehling, C.D., Esta Smith, Rodney Riley, Summer Sutton, Maria Cardoza, Michael Collins, Alexandra McClintock, Zackary Welch, Joan M. Smedinghoff, Emily Torian, Jeanne Nichols, Kathleen McEvoy, Ashley Gerding, Dennis Peters, N.J.A.D., Tammy Olmstead, Thomas Wickliff, Matthew Schrier, Kristine A. Zitny, Miranda Landrum, Jimmy Smith, Trecia Brock Hood, Regina C. Smedinghoff, Sheila Long, Annie McBride, Joelle Ellis, Jacob Prescott, Janice Proctor, Nicole Kamaleson, Joe Torian, William Newnham, Joseph Prescott, Catherine Martin, Barclay Kamaleson, Miriam Mullen, Dana Rainey, Kelli-Jo Dodge, Adam Daehling, Angel Roldan, George McClintock, III, Patricia Goins, William Murach, William Burley, James Landrum, Janice Caruso, Joshua Prescott, Nathan Torian, Stephanie Miller, B.D., Mara Wilson, G.P., Molly Nichols, Harriet Sutton, D.M., Michelle Riley, Michelle McEvoy, Helena Davis, Chester R. McBride, Sr, Matthew Diaz, Erin Goss, William Mullen, N.J.D., Michael Donios, Aujza Norkist, John Ellis, Joanna Gilbert, Dan Olmstead, Elizabeth Martin, Lieselotte R. Roldan, Mary Smedinghoff, Brandon Korona, Lorria Welch, Chapman Good, Martha Smith, B.L., Chris Zimmerman, Nancy Wilson, Michelle Rotelli, Daniel Owen Hughes, Frances Diaz, Joyce Paulsen, Ramiro Cardoza, Sr, P.D., Sunderraj Mark Kamaleson, Aaron Prescott, Anngel Norkist, S.P., Joseph Jones, Jr, Jessica Benson, Deborah Peters, Bruce Nichols, Michelle Zimmerman, Hart Norkist, Tracey Prescott, Matthias P. Roldan, Nancy Mullen, Thomas Smedinghoff, Luann Varney, Paul Edward Goins, III, Kayla Diaz, Kathleen Alexander, Kirk Daehling, Julie Martin, Emmitt Dwayne Burns, James Ellis, Freddie Sutton, Kayla Daehling, Patricia Hughes, Samantha McNamara..(Singh, Tejinder)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Zarrab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S.
Represented By: Robert M Cary
Represented By: James Wills Kirkpatrick, III
Represented By: Simon Latcovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Zarrab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halkbank
Represented By: Robert M Cary
Represented By: James Wills Kirkpatrick, III
Represented By: Simon Latcovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hughes
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Zitny
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Alexander
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hughes
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Goins
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Goins, III
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Caruso
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Rainey
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt Burns
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Davis
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.D.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Smedinghoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smedinghoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Smedinghoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Smedinghoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Smedinghoff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Landrum
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.L.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.L.
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Landrum
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Landrum
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Prescott
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Prescott
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Prescott
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Prescott
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Prescott
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Phillips
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.P.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cardoza
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Cardoza, Sr.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Cardoza, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chet Murach
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Murach
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha McNamara
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Daehling
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Daehling
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Daehling
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Daehling
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Gilbert
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Benson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieselotte Roldan
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthias Roldan
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Roldan
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Roldan
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapman Good
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mullen
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Mullen
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mullen
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joelle Ellis
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ellis
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ellis
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Korona
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Zimmerman
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Zimmerman
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baily Zimmerman
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorria Welch
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Welch
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackary Welch
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Nichols
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Nichols
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Nichols
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Olmstead
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. Burley
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Olmstead
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Collins
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Smith
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wickliff
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rotelli
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Long
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Wilson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kapriel Wilson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mara Wilson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Gerding
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.P.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Peters
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Peters
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Donios
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esta Smith
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Torian
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Torian
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Torian
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Smith
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Diaz
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Diaz
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.J.A.D.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.J.D.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Diaz
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximo Diaz
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Diaz
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Diaz
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Riley
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Riley
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Martin
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Martin
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Martin
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Martin
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli-Jo Dodge
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.D.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.D.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen McEvoy
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick McEvoy
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McEvoy
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Proctor
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luann Varney
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Sutton
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Goss
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Sutton
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Shedd
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trecia Brock Hood
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Sutton
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie McBride
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester R. McBride, Sr.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra McClintock
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Paulsen
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George McClintock, III
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin King
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Miller
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anngel Norkist
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Newnham
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hart Norkist
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aujza Norkist
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Kamaleson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Paul Kamaleson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barclay Kamaleson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cade Kamaleson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunderraj Kamaleson
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Schrier
Represented By: Adam Joshua Goldstein
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?