Doe v. Selsky et al
Plaintiff: |
John Doe |
Defendant: |
Donald Selsky, J. Wood, D. Squires, Spike, Sergeant Harvey, Christine A. Antenore, Peter Russell, J. Thompson, John Doe and Jane Doe |
Case Number: |
6:2008cv06199 |
Filed: |
May 2, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Rochester Office |
County: |
Chemung |
Presiding Judge: |
Jonathan W. Feldman |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
64
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the complaint. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 9/20/13. (EMA)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
56
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to reinstate plaintiff's first amended complaint 10 , which will become the operative complaint in this action. That reinstatement does not extend to plaintiff's claim for malicious prosecution, which remains dismissed. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 6/10/13. (EMA)
|
March 12, 2013 |
Filing
51
ORDER that in light of the Second Circuit's remand,both sides should submit additional briefs addressing the issues presented by that remand. Defendants shall file a brief, not to exceed 10 pages in length, addressing the issues presented by the Second Circuit's remand order, no later than 40 days after the date of issuance of this Order. Plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' brief no later than 30 days after the filing of defendants' brief. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 3/12/13. (EMA)
|
June 12, 2012 |
Filing
48
ORDER denying plaintiff's 47 Motion to Vacate the judgment. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 6/12/12. (EMA)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
46
It is ordered and adjudged that defendants motion for summary judgment is granted and the complaint is dismissed.Signed by Michael J. Roemer on 1/18/2012. (BK)
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the complaint. Plaintiff's Cross Motion 41 Motion for Declaratory Judgment is denied. ***CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/17/12. (EMA)
|
October 16, 2009 |
Filing
22
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the complaint without prejudice to plaintiff's filing of a second amended complaint setting forth a claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 for malicious prosecution. Plaintiff is advised that such complaint must comply with the pleading requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as explained by the Supreme Court in Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544 (2007). In particular, the complaint must make clear when the underlying events occurred, and the nature and extent of each defendants personal involvement in those events. The second amended complaint must be filed no later than December 1, 2009. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 10/16/09. (EMA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?