Tafari v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: InJah Unique Tafari
Defendant: Candice Baker, Jennifer Brink, Zebra Cicconi-Crozier, Maureen Mack, Gary Taylor, Jill Northrop, Peter Braselmann, Gregory Keller, Paul Piccolo, Jeffrey Minnerly, Michael Kirkpatrick, Raymond Coveny, Paul Chappius, Carl Koenigsmann and Anthony Annucci
Case Number: 6:2016cv06472
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend (Dkt #34) is denied as futile; that because Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee within the required time, and because he has not requested an extension of time to do so, his Complain t (Dkt #1) is dismissed with prejudice; that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt #28) is denied as moot. Plaintiffs Motion for the Court to Provide Copies (Dkt #29)is denied as moot based on Defendants Response (Dkt #32) to that motion. (Clerk to close case.) (Copy of Decision and Order sent by first class mail to Plaintiff.) Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 5/30/17. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendants motion to revoke Plaintiffs IFP status. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the full $400 filing fee, with credit to be afforded for any amounts previously collected from his prison account, within (30) thirty days of the date of this Decision and Order. Furthermore, if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the Courts directive to pay the full filing fee, his Complaint will be dismissed with prejudice by the Clerk of Court without further order of the Court. T he Court will hold Defendants summary judgment motion in abeyance pending Plaintiffs payment of the filing fee. If Plaintiff timely pays the full filing fee, the Court then will consider Defendants summary judgment motion. If not, his Complaint will be dismissed. (Copy of Decision and Order sent by first class mail to Plaintiff.). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 4/20/17. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECISION AND ORDER denying 17 Motion ; denying 17 Motion to Stay; denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; finding as moot 5 Motion for TRO; finding as moot 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 6 Motion to Stay; denying 17 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice with leave to renew as a converted motion for summary judgment, upon provision of the appropriate notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 1/19/17. (clerk to follow up consistent with this Decision and Order. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER denying 4 Motion for Reconsideration. The claims in the Complaint against Dr. Peter Braselman are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Dr. Peter Braselman as a defendant to this action, and to terminate any pending deadlines as to him. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 9/28/16. A copy of this Order was sent by U.S. Mail to the pro se plaintiff by Chambers staff on this date. (AFB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tafari v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InJah Unique Tafari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zebra Cicconi-Crozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Northrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Braselmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Minnerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Coveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Chappius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Koenigsmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?