Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc. et al v. Waste Management of New York, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Andrew Brickle, Brandie Antenucci, Nathan Bubb, Stephen Hallenbeck, Jonathan Zaffer, Meghan DeFisher, Helen Gross, Vicki Martuscello, Elizabeth Agte, Patrick Domaratz, Brittany Shaughnessy, Chuck Volo, Camille Mancuso, Jennifer Piskorowski, Julie Anderson, Ferni Kinnaw, Christopher Sienkiewycz, Jason Kump, Linda Allison, Brandon Stein, Dianne Valle, Paula Pentoney, Jennifer Jackson, Ann Moffitt, Matthew Houck, Thomas Murray, Jeremy Saucier, Heather Merlo, Aphrodite Hollway, Michael Stuver, Curtis Dehm, Jessica Jones, James Nail, Lisa Brancato, John Sykes, Malique Jones, Michael Kaiser, Justin Busch, Maria Frazer, Samantha Anderson, Jill Gress, Ken Jones, Kevilyn O'Connor, Christine Dehm, Adam Gursslin, Jerry Hefley, Jennifer McNeil, Matthew Betzenhauser, Melissa Pease, Nicole Osimowicz, Debra Ramsperger, Elizabeth Reisinger, Laura Clark, Katherine Short, Paula Marasco, John Clark, Susan Gardner, Glenn Batchelor, Corrine Renault, Karyn Rando, Kaye Brotzman, Philip Lang, Jon Reisinger, Thomas Reidy, Kristen Betzenhauser, Molly Romagnola, Kathleen Poleon, Emily Olsen, Brian Shaughnessy, Kevin Moravec, Carol Kane, Jane Gatewood, Barbara Harvey, Paul Weber, Elizabeth Stevens, Takahiro Hachiya, Leanne Bushart, Timothy Pasley, Harvey Gross, Patricia Anderson, George Rodibaugh, Michael Jackson, Amy Pasley, Carol Hallenbeck, Sherrie Turano, Bryan Reinicke, Cooper Gilbert, Julie Stuver, David Gross, Jacqueline Stein, Catherine King, Jacqueline Scott, Josh Dawson, Lorinda VanDerlinde, Daniel Bond, Justin Foley, Alecia Romano, Catherine Murray, Emily Giunta, Ann Schauman, Robin Thompson, Dwight Roeters, Jody Moulton, Debbie Yendrzeski, John Polchowski, Anthony Tempesta, Randy Jones, Marc Anderson, Shannon Oliverio, Tracy Lyn Lause, Rebecca Koppmann, Susan Widrick, Amanda Martin, Patricia Polchowski, Nicole Thibault, Marly Calderon-Singer, Victoria Scozzafava, Mary Slaughter, James Miller, Virginia Gullo, Lauren Moravec, Donna Lozipone, Anne DeWitte, Christopher Williams, Heather Little, Diane Allen, Krystina Clark, John Ramsperger, Jon Renault, John Fish, Leslie Houck, Megan Volhejn, Erinne Selim, Peter Schuch, Kathleen Roeters, Matthew Tice, Michael Merlo, Paula Mencucci, Derek Orf, Erica Larzelere, Wendy Miller, Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc., Craig Ephraim, Tony Griffey, Meredith Weber, Kim Bender, George Thomas, Ellen Larzelere, Scott Miga, Jill Gordner, Daniel Osimowicz, Jeffrey Marasco, David C. Gross, Rebecca Snyder, Kathleen Olsen, Sarah Dawson, Lisa Kaiser, Christine Hefley, John Turano, Winfield Terry, Matthew Martin, Catherine Freemantle, Mallory Williams, Brian Caiazza, Reid Holmes, Shaun Logue, Andrew Cittadino, Stacey DiNicola, Bryan Gardner, Sharon Marble, Gary McNeil, Scott Pease, Todd Anderson, Wendy Clifford, Dave Valle, Brian Miller, Jennifer Kump, William Kinnaw, Claire Thomas, Gerald Totsline, Chad Anderson, Donna DiMaria, Erin Brooks, Thomas Miller, Daniel Shelley, Cheryl Allen, Sara Bond, Wayne Slaughter, Ralph Volpe, Tony Brancato, Kenneth Rando, Rosemarie Reidy, Traci Totsline, Elmer Gordner, Mark Laskoski, Nicholas Romano, Peter Clifford, Matthew Scozzafava, Kaitlyn Foley, David Messina, Mark Brotzman, Tara Saucier, Mark Scott, David Schinsing, Jennifer Zaffer, Christina Ferg, Marissa Logue, Cheryl Schmidt, Kevin Kray, James Oliverio, Patricia Donohue, Malissa Beckwith, Kim Garrison, Robert Freemantle, Glenn Harvey and Charlie Shoemaker
Defendant: Waste Management of New York, L.L.C.
Case Number: 6:2018cv06588
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Stipulating to the Waiver of Service and setting the time for the Defendant to respond to the Complaint until November 16, 2018. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/19/2018. (BK)
August 28, 2018 Case Reassigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Hon. Michael A. Telesca no longer assigned to the case. (BK)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Elizabeth A. Wolford. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 8/27/18. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Elizabeth Agte, Cheryl Allen, Diane Allen, Linda Allison, Chad Anderson, Julie Anderson, Marc Anderson, Patricia Anderson, Samantha Anderson, Todd Anderson, Brandie Antenucci, Glenn Batchelor, Malissa Beckwith, Kim Bender, Kristen Betzenhauser, Matthew Betzenhauser, Daniel Bond, Sara Bond, Lisa Brancato, Tony Brancato, Andrew Brickle, Erin Brooks, Kaye Brotzman, Mark Brotzman, Nathan Bubb, Justin Busch, Leanne Bushart, Brian Caiazza, Marly Calderon-Singer, Andrew Cittadino, John Clark, Krystina Clark, Laura Clark, Peter Clifford, Wendy Clifford, Josh Dawson, Sarah Dawson, Meghan DeFisher, Anne DeWitte, Christine Dehm, Curtis Dehm, Donna DiMaria, Stacey DiNicola, Patrick Domaratz, Patricia Donohue, Craig Ephraim, Christina Ferg, John Fish, Justin Foley, Kaitlyn Foley, Maria Frazer, Catherine Freemantle, Robert Freemantle, Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc., Bryan Gardner, Susan Gardner, Kim Garrison, Jane Gatewood, Cooper Gilbert, Emily Giunta, Elmer Gordner, Jill Gordner, Jill Gress, Tony Griffey, David Gross, David C. Gross, Harvey Gross, Helen Gross, Virginia Gullo, Adam Gursslin, Takahiro Hachiya, Carol Hallenbeck, Stephen Hallenbeck, Barbara Harvey, Glenn Harvey, Christine Hefley, Jerry Hefley, Aphrodite Hollway, Reid Holmes, Leslie Houck, Matthew Houck, Jennifer Jackson, Michael Jackson, Jessica Jones, Ken Jones, Malique Jones, Randy Jones, Lisa Kaiser, Michael Kaiser, Carol Kane, Catherine King, Ferni Kinnaw, William Kinnaw, Rebecca Koppmann, Kevin Kray, Jason Kump, Jennifer Kump, Philip Lang, Ellen Larzelere, Erica Larzelere, Mark Laskoski, Tracy Lyn Lause, Heather Little, Marissa Logue, Shaun Logue, Donna Lozipone, Camille Mancuso, Jeffrey Marasco, Paula Marasco, Sharon Marble, Amanda Martin, Matthew Martin, Vicki Martuscello, Gary McNeil, Jennifer McNeil, Paula Mencucci, Heather Merlo, Michael Merlo, David Messina, Scott Miga, Brian Miller, James Miller, Thomas Miller, Wendy Miller, Ann Moffitt, Kevin Moravec, Lauren Moravec, Jody Moulton, Catherine Murray, Thomas Murray, James Nail, Kevilyn O'Connor, James Oliverio, Shannon Oliverio, Emily Olsen, Kathleen Olsen, Derek Orf, Daniel Osimowicz, Nicole Osimowicz, Amy Pasley, Timothy Pasley, Melissa Pease, Scott Pease, Paula Pentoney, Jennifer Piskorowski, John Polchowski, Patricia Polchowski, Kathleen Poleon, Debra Ramsperger, John Ramsperger, Karyn Rando, Kenneth Rando, Rosemarie Reidy, Thomas Reidy, Bryan Reinicke, Elizabeth Reisinger, Jon Reisinger, Corrine Renault, Jon Renault, George Rodibaugh, Dwight Roeters, Kathleen Roeters, Molly Romagnola, Alecia Romano, Nicholas Romano, Jeremy Saucier, Tara Saucier, Ann Schauman, David Schinsing, Cheryl Schmidt, Peter Schuch, Jacqueline Scott, Mark Scott, Matthew Scozzafava, Victoria Scozzafava, Erinne Selim, Brian Shaughnessy, Brittany Shaughnessy, Daniel Shelley, Charlie Shoemaker, Katherine Short, Christopher Sienkiewycz, Mary Slaughter, Wayne Slaughter, Rebecca Snyder, Brandon Stein, Jacqueline Stein, Elizabeth Stevens, Julie Stuver, Michael Stuver, John Sykes, Anthony Tempesta, Winfield Terry, Nicole Thibault, Claire Thomas, George Thomas, Robin Thompson, Matthew Tice, Gerald Totsline, Traci Totsline, John Turano, Sherrie Turano, Dave Valle, Dianne Valle, Lorinda VanDerlinde, Megan Volhejn, Chuck Volo, Ralph Volpe, Meredith Weber, Paul Weber, Susan Widrick, Christopher Williams, Mallory Williams, Debbie Yendrzeski, Jennifer Zaffer, Jonathan Zaffer. (Valle, Melissa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Waste Management of New York, L.L.C.. (TF)
August 15, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
August 15, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
August 15, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc.. (Kanyuck, Dwight)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwight Eliot Kanyuck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kanyuck, Dwight)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. Valle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Valle, Melissa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3189035, filed by Kevin Moravec, Andrew Cittadino, Michael Kaiser, Lorinda VanDerlinde, Heather Merlo, Adam Gursslin, Mark Laskoski, Gerald Totsline, Matthew Betzenhauser, Brian Miller, Kim Bender, Donna DiMaria, Robert Freemantle, Michael Jackson, Nathan Bubb, Julie Stuver, George Rodibaugh, Winfield Terry, Rebecca Koppmann, Susan Gardner, Sara Bond, Dwight Roeters, Jeffrey Marasco, John Ramsperger, Lisa Kaiser, Matthew Scozzafava, Patricia Polchowski, Marly Calderon-Singer, Krystina Clark, Patricia Anderson, Chuck Volo, Jerry Hefley, Ferni Kinnaw, Shaun Logue, Elizabeth Reisinger, Tony Griffey, Leanne Bushart, George Thomas, Sherrie Turano, Derek Orf, Matthew Tice, Vicki Martuscello, Kim Garrison, Paul Weber, Kenneth Rando, Malissa Beckwith, Kathleen Olsen, Leslie Houck, Cooper Gilbert, Erica Larzelere, Carol Hallenbeck, Jessica Jones, Glenn Harvey, Elmer Gordner, David Gross, Dave Valle, Alecia Romano, Robin Thompson, Daniel Osimowicz, Jody Moulton, Kristen Betzenhauser, Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc., Rebecca Snyder, Paula Marasco, Matthew Houck, John Polchowski, John Turano, Tara Saucier, Mary Slaughter, Shannon Oliverio, Glenn Batchelor, Amanda Martin, Harvey Gross, Michael Stuver, Peter Schuch, Paula Pentoney, Christina Ferg, Brian Shaughnessy, Erin Brooks, Jacqueline Stein, Nicole Osimowicz, Wendy Miller, Heather Little, Thomas Murray, Charlie Shoemaker, Scott Miga, Aphrodite Hollway, Susan Widrick, Rosemarie Reidy, Andrew Brickle, Kevin Kray, Ann Moffitt, Corrine Renault, Jon Renault, Victoria Scozzafava, Patricia Donohue, Julie Anderson, Ralph Volpe, Jennifer Kump, Jennifer Zaffer, Wendy Clifford, Paula Mencucci, Anne DeWitte, Nicole Thibault, Diane Allen, David Schinsing, Laura Clark, Lisa Brancato, Jill Gordner, Chad Anderson, Mark Brotzman, Reid Holmes, Anthony Tempesta, Michael Merlo, Daniel Shelley, Philip Lang, Brittany Shaughnessy, Kathleen Roeters, Takahiro Hachiya, Stephen Hallenbeck, Katherine Short, Emily Giunta, Camille Mancuso, Gary McNeil, Catherine King, Tracy Lyn Lause, Traci Totsline, Samantha Anderson, Matthew Martin, Karyn Rando, Elizabeth Stevens, Megan Volhejn, Timothy Pasley, Carol Kane, Jeremy Saucier, Craig Ephraim, Donna Lozipone, Malique Jones, Mark Scott, Christine Hefley, Mallory Williams, Kevilyn O'Connor, Kathleen Poleon, Thomas Miller, John Fish, Sarah Dawson, Meredith Weber, Jill Gress, Jason Kump, Todd Anderson, Christine Dehm, Kaitlyn Foley, Jacqueline Scott, Bryan Gardner, Stacey DiNicola, David C. Gross, Daniel Bond, Catherine Freemantle, Virginia Gullo, Brandon Stein, Helen Gross, Nicholas Romano, Emily Olsen, Randy Jones, Jennifer McNeil, Scott Pease, Amy Pasley, Brian Caiazza, Ellen Larzelere, Kaye Brotzman, Lauren Moravec, Justin Busch, David Messina, Bryan Reinicke, James Oliverio, Meghan DeFisher, Barbara Harvey, Jennifer Jackson, John Sykes, Jane Gatewood, Debbie Yendrzeski, Erinne Selim, Debra Ramsperger, Thomas Reidy, Catherine Murray, Jonathan Zaffer, Maria Frazer, James Miller, Melissa Pease, Dianne Valle, Jon Reisinger, Curtis Dehm, Tony Brancato, Patrick Domaratz, Brandie Antenucci, Marissa Logue, Linda Allison, Ken Jones, Wayne Slaughter, Peter Clifford, Elizabeth Agte, Christopher Williams, Christopher Sienkiewycz, William Kinnaw, Jennifer Piskorowski, Justin Foley, Marc Anderson, Sharon Marble, Josh Dawson, Cheryl Allen, John Clark, Ann Schauman, Molly Romagnola, James Nail, Claire Thomas, Cheryl Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Shaw, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc. et al v. Waste Management of New York, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Brickle
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandie Antenucci
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Bubb
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hallenbeck
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Zaffer
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan DeFisher
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Gross
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Martuscello
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Agte
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Domaratz
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Shaughnessy
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Volo
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Mancuso
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Piskorowski
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Anderson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferni Kinnaw
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sienkiewycz
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kump
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Allison
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Stein
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Valle
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Pentoney
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jackson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Moffitt
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Houck
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Murray
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Saucier
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Merlo
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aphrodite Hollway
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stuver
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Dehm
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Jones
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nail
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Brancato
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sykes
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malique Jones
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kaiser
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Busch
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Frazer
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Anderson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Gress
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Jones
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevilyn O'Connor
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Dehm
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Gursslin
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hefley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer McNeil
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Betzenhauser
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Pease
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Osimowicz
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ramsperger
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Reisinger
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Clark
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Short
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Marasco
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clark
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gardner
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Batchelor
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrine Renault
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn Rando
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Brotzman
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Lang
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Reisinger
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Reidy
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Betzenhauser
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Romagnola
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Poleon
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Olsen
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Shaughnessy
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Moravec
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kane
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gatewood
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Harvey
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Weber
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stevens
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takahiro Hachiya
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne Bushart
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Pasley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Gross
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Anderson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rodibaugh
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Pasley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hallenbeck
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Turano
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Reinicke
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper Gilbert
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Stuver
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gross
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Stein
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine King
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Scott
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Dawson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorinda VanDerlinde
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bond
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Foley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alecia Romano
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Murray
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Giunta
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Schauman
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Thompson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Roeters
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Moulton
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Yendrzeski
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Polchowski
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tempesta
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Jones
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Anderson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Oliverio
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lyn Lause
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Koppmann
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Widrick
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Martin
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Polchowski
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Thibault
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marly Calderon-Singer
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Scozzafava
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Slaughter
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miller
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Gullo
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Moravec
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lozipone
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne DeWitte
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Little
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Allen
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystina Clark
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ramsperger
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Renault
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fish
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Houck
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Volhejn
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erinne Selim
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Schuch
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Roeters
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tice
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Merlo
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Mencucci
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Orf
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Larzelere
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Miller
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresh Air for the Eastside, Inc.
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Ephraim
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Griffey
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Weber
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bender
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Thomas
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Larzelere
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Miga
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Gordner
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Osimowicz
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Marasco
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Gross
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Snyder
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Olsen
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dawson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kaiser
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Hefley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Turano
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winfield Terry
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Martin
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Freemantle
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Williams
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Caiazza
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Holmes
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Logue
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cittadino
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey DiNicola
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Gardner
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Marble
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary McNeil
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Pease
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Anderson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Clifford
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Valle
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Miller
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kump
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kinnaw
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Thomas
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Totsline
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Anderson
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna DiMaria
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Brooks
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Miller
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Shelley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Allen
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Bond
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Slaughter
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Volpe
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Brancato
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rando
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Reidy
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Totsline
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Gordner
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Laskoski
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Romano
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Clifford
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Scozzafava
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Foley
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Messina
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Brotzman
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Saucier
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Scott
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schinsing
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zaffer
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ferg
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Logue
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Schmidt
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kray
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Oliverio
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Donohue
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa Beckwith
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Garrison
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Freemantle
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Harvey
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Shoemaker
Represented By: Dwight Eliot Kanyuck
Represented By: Linda Radko Shaw
Represented By: Melissa M. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of New York, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?