Dublino v. Wende Correctional Facility et al

Plaintiff: Mark Dublino
Defendant: Mr. Klepp, Mr. Sheftic, Lyman, Mr. Mancini, Mr. Brown, Mr. Martin, Brown, G. Schenk, Wende Correctional Facility, Wade, Mr. Wade, Mr. Kintzel, Mr. Bradley, Mr. McQuire, J. Krygier, Benjamine A. Wilson, Mr. Sears, Barlow, Mr. Vendetti, Mr. Byron, Mr. Shaneley, Stewart Eckert, Ms. Vanni, Thomas, Mr. Carhart, Mr. Ferrell and Mr. Kroel
Case Number: 6:2019cv06354
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from NYS Correction and Community Supervision, dated 6/14/19, to Judge Payson. (JHF)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 Pro se Office Letter Response to Plaintiff Mark T. Dublino. (JHF)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:19-cv-00381.
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Mr. Carhart, G. Schenk, Mr. Sheftic, Ms. Vanni, Mr. Vendetti. Copies of Summons, Complaint and the Decision and Order dated 5/9/2019 provided to the New York State Attorney General. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Auburn Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #9 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION and ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk file a copy of the Claims and Supporting Documents (Dkt. No. [3-4] immediately following the signature page of the complaint, and a copy of the Supplement to Complaint (Dkt. No. [11) immediately following the Claims and Supporting Documents insert. ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to amend the docket to add Babin, Hearing Officer, Auburn Correctional Facility, as a defendant. ORDERED that the claims arising out of plaintiff's confinement at Wende Correctional Facility are severed and transferred to the Western District of New York. ORDERED that the Clerk shall advise the Clerk of the Western District of New York, in writing, of the entry of this Order and provide that Clerk with a certified copy of this Order and of the docket sheet for this action, together with all information necessary for the Western District Clerk to electronically access the documents filed in this action. ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove Wende Correctional Facility, Mr. Klepp, Mr. Ferrell, Mr. Wade, J. Krygier, Mr. Kintzel, Mr. Sears, Mr. Shaneley, Mr. Brown, Mr. McQuire, Mr. Byron, Mr. Martin, Mr. Thomas, Mr. Lyman, Mr. Mancini, Mr. Barlow, Mr. Kroel, Mr. Bradley, Mr. Wade, Stewart Eckert, Benjamine A. Wilson, and Mr. Brown from the docket as defendants in the Northern District action. ORDERED that plaintiff's First Amendment free-flow-of-mail claim against defendants Sheftic, Vanni, Shanke, and Carhardt and First Amendment retaliation claim against defendant Vendetti SURVIVE sua sponte review and require a response. ORDERED that plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Auburn Correctional Facility and the non-severed named defendants in their official capacity are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) as barred by the Eleventh Amendment. ORDERED that all remaining claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ORDERED that Auburn Correctional Facility is DISMISSED with prejudice as a defendant. ORDERED that the following individuals are DISMISSED without prejudice as defendants: Ms. Jones, Mr. Kirkwood, Mr. Wheeler, Ms. Vullwhite, Mr. Knapp, Mr. Norris, Mr. Vanderwerff, J. Remington, Mr. "D", Mr. Milnane, Mr. Nowak, Mr. Pickert, Mr. Penello, Mr. Corey, Mr. Grady, Anthony Smith, Ms. Simmons, Mr. Powell, Timothy McCarthy, Brenda J. Walsh, Michael C. Polcovich, Thomas J. Loughren, Leanne Callahan. ORDERED that plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon defendants Sheftic, Vanni, Shanke, Carhardt, and Vendetti. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summons and complaint by mail to the Office of the New York State Attorney General, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that a response to the complaint be filed by defendants Sheftic, Vanni, Shanke, Carhardt, and Vendetti, or their counsel, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/9/2019.(Decision and Order mailed to plaintiff by regular mail). (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in further support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Dublino. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Dublino requesting injunctive relief. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Affidavit of Service) (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by Mark Dublino. (Attachments: #1 Letters to Mr. B. Babin, #2 Affidavit of Service) (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/14/19. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Mark Dublino. (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Dublino. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in support of #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Dublino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Submission in support of #1 Complaint by Mark Dublino. (nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a signed Inmate Authorization Form consenting to payment of $350.00 over time. ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/2/2019. (Order and an Inmate Authorization Form mailed to plaintiff by regular mail.) (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Mark Dublino. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Dublino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration #1, #2 Declaration #2, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Claims 1-6, #5 Verification) (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Dublino. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mr. "D", Auburn Correctional Facility, Mr. Barlow, Mr. Bradley, Mr. Brown(Correction Officer, Wende Correctional Facility), Mr. Brown(Sergeant, Wende Correctional Facility), Mr. Byron, Leanne Callahan, Mr. Carhart, Mr. Corey, Stewart Eckert, Mr. Ferrell, Mr. Grady, Ms. Jones, Mr. Kintzel, Mr. Kirkwood, Mr. Klepp, Mr. Knapp, Mr. Kroel, J. Krygier, Thomas J. Loughren, Mr. Lyman, Mr. Mancini, Mr. Martin, Timothy McCarthy, Mr. McQuire, Mr. Milnane, Mr. Norris, Mr. Nowak, Mr. Penello, Mr. Pickert, Michael C. Polcovich, Mr. Powell, J. Remington, G. Schenk, Mr. Sears, Mr. Shaneley, Mr. Sheftic, Ms. Simmons, Anthony Smith, Mr. Thomas, Mr. Vanderwerff, Ms. Vanni, Mr. Vendetti, Ms. Vullwhite, Mr. Wade(Correction Officer, Wende Correctional Facility), Brenda J. Walsh, Wende Correctional Facility, Mr. Wheeler, Benjamine A. Wilson filed by Mark Dublino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 envelope) (rar, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/9/2019) (rar, ). [Transferred from nynd on 5/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dublino v. Wende Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Klepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Sheftic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wende Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kintzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. McQuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Krygier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamine A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Vendetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Shaneley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Vanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Carhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kroel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dublino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?