Harvill v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Harvill
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2009cv00145
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CRAVEN
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/16/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES: Plaintiff filed a petition for attorney fees on August 5, 2010, requesting $5,701.80 in fees and $350 in costs. Thereafter, the parties jointly filed a Stipulated Consent Motion noting that the parties had agreed to settle the E.A.J.A. claim for $4,700 in fees and $350 in costs. Accordingly, the Court hereby directs the defendant to pay plaintiff $4,700 in fees and costs of $350. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 8/24/2010. (Sawyer, D.)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT: For good cause shown, the Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. See Shala1a v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292 (1993); Melkonyan v. Sullivan, 501 U.S. 89 (1991). Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk on 7/21/2010. Copies served. (Sawyer, D.)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Remand: For good cause shown, the Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 7/2/2010. Copies served. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvill v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Harvill
Represented By: Barbara von Euler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?