Gregory v. Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Defendant: R. J. Pichon, Jackson & Efting, Santa Clara County Superior Court, Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC and A. Persky
Case Number: 4:2019cv00147
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 32 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Jeane Gregory as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 12/24/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. (Meeker, Emily)
December 3, 2019 Filing 30 Financial Disclosure Statement by Santa Clara County Superior Court (Crook, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 29 Financial Disclosure Statement by R. J. Pichon (Crook, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by A. Persky (Crook, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support regarding #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A. Persky, R. J. Pichon, Santa Clara County Superior Court. (Crook, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A. Persky, R. J. Pichon, Santa Clara County Superior Court. (Crook, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by John Thomas Crook on behalf of A. Persky, R. J. Pichon, Santa Clara County Superior Court. (Crook, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Coats on behalf of A. Persky, R. J. Pichon, Santa Clara County Superior Court. (Coats, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint, #2 Copy of Summons and Return Receipt, #3 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Appointing Successor Trustee, #2 Exhibit B - Antonio and Susana Sabado Family Trust - 29 July 1997, #3 Exhibit C - Petition for Order Instructing Trustee, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Postal Service Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Herrmann, L.) Modified on 12/4/2019 to create linkage to docket entry 19. (Herrmann, L.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Jeane Gregory as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 12/10/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of William D. Connell in Support of GCA Law Partners LLP's Motion to Dismiss) (Meeker, Emily)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. (Meeker, Emily)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Jeane Gregory as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 11/26/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Derrenbacher on behalf of Jackson & Efting. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jackson & Efting. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Derrenbacher, Christopher) Modified on 11/6/2019 to create linkage to the motion. (Herrmann, L.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jackson & Efting (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jackson & Efting. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
October 31, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time #13 filed by GCA Law Partners, LLP, named in the complaint as "Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC." For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including November 19, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/31/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
October 31, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Herrmann, L.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meeker, Emily)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC (Meeker, Emily)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow on behalf of Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily M. Meeker on behalf of Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. (Meeker, Emily)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jeane Gregory served on Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC on 10/15/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jeane Gregory served on Santa Clara County Superior Court on 10/15/2019. (Herrmann, L.) Modified on 10/25/2019 to correct filed date. (Herrmann, L.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jeane Gregory served on R. J. Pichon on 10/15/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jeane Gregory served on A. Persky on 10/15/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jeane Gregory served on Jackson & Efting on 10/15/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
October 17, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Jeane Gregory has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Herrmann, L.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jackson & Efting, A. Persky, R. J. Pichon, Santa Clara County Superior Court, Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jeane Gregory. (Rudd, D.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jeane Gregory. (Rudd, D.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number NEW0001038), filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. J. Pichon
Represented By: John Thomas Crook
Represented By: David S. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson & Efting
Represented By: Christopher J. Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara County Superior Court
Represented By: John Thomas Crook
Represented By: David S. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small & Loeb GCA Law Partners LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Represented By: Emily M. Meeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Persky
Represented By: John Thomas Crook
Represented By: David S. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?