Carolina Power & Light Company v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff: Carolina Power & Light Company
Defendant: The Holladay Corporation, Commonwealth Edison Company, Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc., Christus Health, City Public Service of San Antonio, a Municipal Board of the City of San Antonio, North Carolina State University, Viacom Inc., PPG Industries, Inc., Trap Rock, Inc., Dutch Electric, Inc., LWB Refractories Company, CPS Energy, N.L. Industries, Inc., Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership, Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co., Southland Electrical Supply, Inc., Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Domtar Paper Company, LLC, Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO), Alcan Primary Products Corporation, Chevron Mining Inc., Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc., Duquesne Light Company, United States Department of the Army, Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Wartburg College, Four County Electric Membership Corporation, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Graftech International Holdings, Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, SECO Energy, United States Pipe and Foundry Company, LLC, Green Circle Growers, Inc., Florida Power & Light Company, The Hershey Company, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Central Regional Hospital, Pharmacia Corporation, Shieldalloy Mettallurgical Corporation, Consumers Energy Company, General Motors Corporation, Dravo Corporation, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Test Electrical Services, Inc., Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kraft Foods Global, Inc., West Penn Power Company, International Power Machinery Company, 3M Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Monongahela Power Company, Exelon Corporation, PPL Electric Utilities Corporation, O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center, Carlisle Syntec Incorporated, Arkema, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd., Tennessee Valley Authority, Royal Street Junk Company, Inc., Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc., City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, Intertape Polymer Group, Inc., Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc., Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Georgia Power Company, Continental Grain Company Corp., Augusta State University, United States Department of the Navy, Furman University, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, Grand Haven Board of Light & Power, Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company, Weyerhaeuser Company, Solo Cup Operating Corporation, Atlas Electrical Construction, Inc., Cherry Hospital, Nucor Corporation, Cleveland Electric Company, City of Lakeland, Florida, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Buist Electric, Inc., Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc., Harsco Corporation, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., South Central Power Company, Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc., East Central Regional Hospital, Akers National Roll Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Environmental Protection Services, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation, Consolidation Coal Company, Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., Kingsport Power Company, The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Town of Tarboro, North Carolina, Eastman Chemical Company, Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc., Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Midamerican Energy Company, Appalachian Power Company, Holcim, Inc., Cogentrix Energy, LLC, Danny Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Glenwood Regional Medical Center, North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation, City of Bedford, Virginia, United States Defense Logistics Agency, Caterpillar Inc., Town of Louisburg, North Carolina, General Extrusions, Inc., Beta Marine & Industrial Corporation, PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc., Conopco, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. and/or Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Lockwood's Electric Motor Service, Lacrosse Footwear, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Imerys Carbonates, LLC, United States Central Intelligence Agency, Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Mid-Valley Pipeline Company, Alliant Techsystems Inc. and/or ATK Launch Systems, Inc., Alcoa Inc., Pactiv Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Unimin Corporation, Tredegar Film Products Corporation, Christus Schumpert Medical Center, Sara Lee Corporation, Frontier Communications Corporation, CSX Residual Company, St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc., City of Monroe, North Carolina, Corning Incorporated, Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation, BASF Corporation, American Skiing Company, Sonoco Products Company, General Electric Company, Cargill, Incorporated, GKN Driveline North America, Inc., Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Holladay Property Services Midwest, Roanoke Electric Steel Corporation, Koch Industries, Inc., East Penn Manufacturing Co., Carr and Duff, Inc., Unitil Energy Systems, Inc., Greenwood Mills, Inc., Foremost Electric & Transmission, Inc., International Paper Company, United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division, Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc., City of Luverne, Minnesota, Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Atlantic City Electric Company, Chemical Products Corporation, United States Air Force, Apogee Coal Company, LLC and Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv00190
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER - Where the court designated a lead case, 5:08-CV-460-FL, and directed that all further filings be made in the lead case, the clerk's office is directed to statistically close the above-captioned case, to be reopened upon motion by any party or on the court's own initiative. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/27/2012. (Baker, C.)
December 14, 2011 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #309 Financial Disclosure Statement and #310 Financial Disclosure Statement - This case has been consolidated with lead case 5:08-cv-460-FL. No documents are to be filed in this case unless directed by the court. All filings should only be made in the lead case. (Baker, C.)
December 14, 2011 Filing 310 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E. Luke Greene Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:08-cv-00463-FL et al. (Johnson, Russell)
December 14, 2011 Filing 309 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E. Luke Greene Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:08-cv-00460-FL et al. (Johnson, Russell)
December 9, 2011 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #308 Financial Disclosure Statement - This case has been consolidated with lead case 5:08-cv-460-FL. No documents are to be filed in this case unless directed by the court. All filings should only be made in the lead case. (Baker, C.)
December 9, 2011 Filing 308 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emma L. Bixby Medical Center. Associated Cases: 5:08-cv-00460-FL et al. (Brown, Gregory)
May 10, 2011 Filing 307 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE Proceedings held on 4/27/2011, before Judge Daniel. Transcriber Janice Russell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website.. Redaction Request due 5/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2011. Associated Cases: 5:08-cv-00460-FL et al. (Steele, F.)
May 2, 2011 Filing 306 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION Proceedings held on 4/27/2011, before Judge Daniel. Transcriber Janice Russell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website.. Redaction Request due 5/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2011. Associated Cases: 5:08-cv-00460-FL et al. (Steele, F.)
March 24, 2011 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: #305 Notice of Appearance - Documents are not to be filed in this case but are to be filed in the lead case as designated by the court in Scheduling Conference held 08/19/2009. This document must be refiled in the appropriate case. (Baker, C.)
March 23, 2011 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan R. Brillault on behalf of Cogentrix Energy, LLC (Brillault, Megan)
September 9, 2010 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #304 Answer to Complaint - Documents are not to be filed in this case but are to be filed in the lead case as designated by the court in Scheduling Conference held 08/19/2009. This document must be refiled in the appropriate case. (Baker, C.)
September 8, 2010 Filing 304 Individual ANSWER to #1 Complaint,and Affirmative Defenses by Cleveland Electric Company. (Fussell, Herman) Modified on 9/9/2010 to remove excess commas after the word Complaint(Beasley, B.).
September 9, 2009 Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Zachary D. Knaub on behalf of Cogentrix Energy, LLC (Knaub, Zachary)
September 3, 2009 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All necessary parties in this consolidated action have been added to lead case 5:08-cv-460-FL. Counsel for all defendants not previously appearing in the lead case may now file Notices of Appearance in lead case 5:08-cv-460-FL. (Baker, C.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Debora S. Lasch on behalf of International Power Machinery Company (Lasch, Debora)
September 2, 2009 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to the court's directive during the August 18, 2009 conference, Plaintiff's counsel has filed its Second Amended Complaint in lead case 5:08-cv-460-FL. Due to technical issues, not all parties received electronic notification of this filing. The deputy clerk is in the process of adding necessary parties to the court's docket in the lead case. Defendants' counsel not previously appearing in the lead case may then file new Notices of Appearance on the docket of the lead case 5:08-cv-460-FL. Please do not file Notices of Appearances in the lead case until further notice issues from this court indicating the proper parties have been added to the lead case docket. (Baker, C.)
August 31, 2009 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman W. Shearin, Jr on behalf of Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation (Shearin, Norman)
August 31, 2009 Filing 300 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
August 28, 2009 Filing 299 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
August 27, 2009 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Sullivan on behalf of International Power Machinery Company (Sullivan, Sean)
August 27, 2009 Filing 297 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of Holcim, Inc. substituting for Nikole Setzler Mergo (Manos, Marcus)
August 27, 2009 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by William T. Lavender, Jr on behalf of Greenwood Mills, Inc., IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc., Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc., Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc., Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc. (Lavender, William)
August 26, 2009 Filing 295 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc. substituting for Nikole Setzler Mergo (Manos, Marcus)
August 21, 2009 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Stephen W. Smithson on behalf of G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc. (Smithson, Stephen)
August 20, 2009 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Jeffrey B. Wagenbach on behalf of G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc. (Wagenbach, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2009 Filing 292 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #210 Motion Strike re #173 Status Report, pages 7 through 22. Entered by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/18/09. (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2009 Filing 291 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan and United States Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel: Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2009 in Raleigh. Counsel for all parties required to be in attendance. Issues bearing on case scheduling and management discussed. All pending motions to strike denied. Clerk to conform docket to reflect same. Any pending motions to excuse counsel from attendance at these proceedings denied. Clerk to conform docket to reflect same. Cases are to be consolidated with each plaintiff's original filed case to serve as lead case (i.e. 5:08-cv-460-FL for plaintiff Carolina Power & Light Company and 5:08-cv-463-FL for plaintiff Consolidated Coal Company). Each plaintiff is to file an Amended Complaint in its lead case within ten (10) days. Counterclaims and Crossclaims due within fourteen (14) days after filing and service of amended pleadings. Motions to Dismiss are due within four weeks of the Counterclaims/Crossclaims deadline. Court suspends 20-day mediator selection requirement. Rule 26(f) Initial Disclosures to be exchanged within twenty-one (21) days. Second status conference to convene before United States Magistrate Judge David W. Daniel subsequent to exchange of disclosures. Magistrate Judge Daniel to determine scheduling and structure of second conference. No written order to issue. (Attachments for court personnel use only.) (Court Reporter Patti Elliot.) (Attachments: #1 Court's Questions to Counsel, #2 Counsel Attendance Form) (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2009 Filing 290 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caterpillar Inc.. (Millberg, John)
August 19, 2009 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Millberg on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Millberg, John)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #288 MOTION TO EXCUSE ATTENDANCE OF LOCAL COUNSEL AT THE AUGUST 18, 2009 HEARING. Entered by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/18/09. (Baker, C.)
August 17, 2009 Motions Submitted: #288 Consent MOTION TO EXCUSE ATTENDANCE OF LOCAL COUNSEL AT THE AUGUST 18, 2009 HEARING submitted to Chief Judge Flanagan for consideration. (Baker, C.)
August 17, 2009 Filing 288 Consent MOTION TO EXCUSE ATTENDANCE OF LOCAL COUNSEL AT THE AUGUST 18, 2009 HEARING by Frontier Communications Corporation, Imerys Carbonates, LLC, North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation, Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Pactiv Corporation, Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership, Buist Electric, Inc., Christus Health. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #273 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bradford A. DeVore terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/17/09. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
August 14, 2009 Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Jeffrey J. Hayward on behalf of Georgia Power Company (Hayward, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2009 Filing 285 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint- / Served on Augusta State University and East Central Regional Hospital Acknowledgement filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service) (Belk, Caroline)
August 14, 2009 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Hampton Y. Dellinger on behalf of Monongahela Power Company, Viacom Inc., West Penn Power Company, Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company, ConocoPhillips Company (Dellinger, Hampton)
August 14, 2009 Filing 283 STATUS REPORT of certain defendants regarding appointment of liaison counsel by G&S Motor Equipment Company, Inc. (Gifford, William)
August 14, 2009 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM LOCATION for Consolidated Initial Conference set for 8/18/2009 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Baker, C.)
August 12, 2009 Filing 282 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alcan Primary Products Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Alcan Corporation for Alcan Primary Products Corporation.. (Bennett, Joshua)
August 12, 2009 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua H. Bennett on behalf of Alcan Primary Products Corporation (Bennett, Joshua)
August 12, 2009 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by D. Kyle Deak on behalf of Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO) (Deak, D.)
August 12, 2009 Filing 279 NOTICE by Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc. Basis of Independent Status (Roessler, Todd)
August 12, 2009 Filing 278 STATUS REPORT by United States Air Force, United States Central Intelligence Agency, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Navy. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Spear, C.)
August 12, 2009 Motions Submitted: #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney submitted to Chief Judge Flanagan for consideration. (Baker, C.)
August 11, 2009 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. Merrigan on behalf of Koch Industries, Inc. (Merrigan, Jessica)
August 11, 2009 Filing 276 Proposed Order re #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership. (De Vore, Bradford)
August 11, 2009 Filing 275 NOTICE by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. Basis for Independent Status (Cowan, J.)
August 10, 2009 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of Kingsport Power Company, Appalachian Power Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement Eastern District of North Carolina Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form) (Olson, Kurt)
August 10, 2009 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #273 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1, or the judge's practice preferences, counsel must submit a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Baker, C.)
August 7, 2009 Filing 273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership. (De Vore, Bradford)
August 7, 2009 Filing 272 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
August 7, 2009 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership (Sidbury, Benjamin)
August 6, 2009 Filing 270 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buist Electric, Inc.. (Bentz, Curtis)
August 6, 2009 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis L. Bentz on behalf of Buist Electric, Inc. (Bentz, Curtis)
August 6, 2009 Filing 268 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, / Service on Lakeland (City of), Florida Acknowledgement filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Belk, Caroline)
August 3, 2009 Filing 267 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
August 3, 2009 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of The Holladay Corporation (Olson, Kurt)
July 31, 2009 Filing 265 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
July 30, 2009 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Beth Deemer on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. (Deemer, Mary Beth)
July 29, 2009 Filing 263 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cleveland Electric Company. (Schoolman, Brian)
July 29, 2009 Filing 262 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of Augusta State University, East Central Regional Hospital substituting for William R. Phillips (Olson, Kurt)
July 29, 2009 Filing 261 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission on 07/27/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service) (Belk, Caroline)
July 29, 2009 Filing 260 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, / Service on CBS Corporation Acknowledgement filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Belk, Caroline)
July 29, 2009 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Spear on behalf of United States Air Force, United States Central Intelligence Agency, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Navy (Spear, C.)
July 28, 2009 Filing 258 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sara Lee Corporation (Olson, Kurt)
July 28, 2009 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Viacom Inc. (DeGeorge, R.)
July 28, 2009 Filing 256 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midamerican Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent MidAmerican Energy Holdings Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Midamerican Energy Company. (Olson, Kurt)
July 28, 2009 Filing 255 Letter from Renee Albert informing the Court that CT Corporation is not the agent for Alliant Techsystems Inc. and/or ATK Launch Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Fogle, L.)
July 28, 2009 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Ginsberg on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. (Ginsberg, Michael)
July 28, 2009 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Borthwick Story on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. (Story, Jane)
July 28, 2009 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Dahl on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. (Dahl, Ryan)
July 24, 2009 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Jeffrey P. Wallack on behalf of Carr and Duff, Inc. (Wallack, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2009 Filing 250 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foremost Electric & Transmission, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 249 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 248 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Duquesne Light Company identifying Corporate Parent DQE Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Duquesne Light Holdings, Inc. for Duquesne Light Company. (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Bradley M. Risinger on behalf of Lockwood's Electric Motor Service (Risinger, Bradley)
July 23, 2009 Filing 246 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockwood's Electric Motor Service. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Risinger, Bradley)
July 23, 2009 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben L. Pfefferle on behalf of Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc. (Pfefferle, Ben)
July 23, 2009 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory R. Flax on behalf of Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc. (Flax, Gregory)
July 23, 2009 Filing 243 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Sunbelt Transformer, General Partnership for Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd.. (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 242 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Central Power Company (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 241 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 240 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Extrusions, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
July 23, 2009 Filing 239 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kingsport Power Company identifying Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for Kingsport Power Company. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 238 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc., Tennessee Electro-Minerals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Imerys U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Imerys S.A., Corporate Parent C-E Minerals, Inc. for Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc., Tennessee Electro-Minerals, Inc... Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 22, 2009 Filing 237 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Imerys Carbonates, LLC, Imerys Carbonates, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Imerys Marble, Inc., Corporate Parent E.C.C.A. Calcium Products, Inc., Corporate Parent Mircal S.A., Corporate Parent Imerys U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Imerys Pigments, Inc., Corporate Parent Imerys S.A. for Imerys Carbonates, L.L.C., Imerys Carbonates, LLC.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 22, 2009 Filing 236 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Paper Company (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 235 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 234 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Environmental Protection Services, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 233 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Residual Company identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Residual Company. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 232 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemical Products Corporation (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 231 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BASF Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BASF Americas Corporation for BASF Corporation. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 230 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arkema, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Delaware Chemical, Inc. for Arkema, Inc.. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 229 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Appalachian Power Company identifying Corporate Parent American Electric Power Company, Inc. for Appalachian Power Company. (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Filing 228 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Skiing Company (Olson, Kurt)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 AMENDED ORDER re #226 Order - No further filings are requested and, as such, the court strikes that provision of earlier order requiring submission of Rule 26(f) reports no later than August 15, 2009. That deadline and others will be considered at pending conference. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/22/09. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order Setting Hearings -Consolidated Initial Conference set for 8/18/2009 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Defendants are encouraged now to consider the matter of liaison counsel and to make such report(s) in advance of initial conference as may promote a more efficient address at that conference. Said filing(s) shall be limited only to the topic of liaison counsel. No further filings are requested. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/22/09. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
July 21, 2009 Filing 225 NOTICE by Koch Industries, Inc. of Objection in Part to Stay Order (Shields, Grady)
July 21, 2009 Filing 224 RESPONSE to Motion re #210 First MOTION Strike re #173 Status Report. (Belk, Caroline)
July 20, 2009 Filing 223 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Constellation Energy Group Inc. for Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. (Cralle-Jones, Catherine)
July 17, 2009 Filing 222 Letter from RaTasha Smith informing the Court that CT Corporation is not the agent for Honeywell International Inc. (Grady, B.)
July 17, 2009 Filing 221 AMENDED DOCUMENT by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.. Amendment to #219 Financial Disclosure Statement. (Cowan, J.)
July 17, 2009 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Raymond T. Reott on behalf of Pactiv Corporation (Reott, Raymond)
July 17, 2009 Filing 219 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND RE-FILED AT DOCKET ENTRY NO. #221 * - FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Potash Corporation of Saskatchewan, Inc. for PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00191-FL, 5:09-cv-00190-FL (Cowan, J.) Modified on 7/20/2009 to insert re-filing information. (Baker, C.).
July 17, 2009 Filing 218 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc. for Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc... Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL et al. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 17, 2009 Filing 217 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL et al. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 17, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
July 16, 2009 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. White on behalf of Cogentrix Energy, LLC (White, William)
July 16, 2009 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. White on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., North Carolina State University, Nucor Corporation, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (White, William)
July 16, 2009 Filing 213 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PPG Industries, Inc. (Stinson, Peter)
July 16, 2009 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Peter T. Stinson on behalf of PPG Industries, Inc. (Stinson, Peter)
July 16, 2009 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of Foremost Electric & Transmission, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
July 16, 2009 Filing 210 First MOTION Strike re #173 Status Report, pages 7 through 22 by General Extrusions, Inc., American Skiing Company, Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc., International Paper Company, Kingsport Power Company, Midamerican Energy Company, Appalachian Power Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Arkema, Inc., Sara Lee Corporation, South Central Power Company, Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd., BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Chemical Products Corporation, Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, CSX Residual Company, Duquesne Light Company, Environmental Protection Services, Inc.. (Olson, Kurt)
July 16, 2009 Filing 209 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PPL Electric Utilities Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PPL Corporation for PPL Electric Utilities Corporation, PPL Electric Utilities Corporation.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Higgins, Sara)
July 16, 2009 Filing 208 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation d/b/a National Grid identifying Corporate Parent National Grid USA for Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation d/b/a National Grid.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Higgins, Sara)
July 16, 2009 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Wyche Higgins on behalf of Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, PPL Electric Utilities Corporation (Higgins, Sara)
July 15, 2009 Filing 206 AMENDED DOCUMENT by St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc. Amendment to (203 in 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 51 in 5:09-cv-00037-FL, 62 in 5:08-cv-00460-FL) Financial Disclosure Statement. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:08-cv-00460-FL, 5:09-cv-00037-FL (Fedder, Jane)
July 15, 2009 Filing 205 30 Day Notice of Failure to Register and File Electronically issued and mailed to William R. Phillips, counsel for Augusta State University and East Central Georgia Regional Hospital. (Baker, C.)
July 15, 2009 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance of William R. Phillips, Senior Assistant Attorney General, State of Georgia by Augusta State University, East Central Georgia Regional Hospital. (Baker, C.)
July 13, 2009 Filing 203 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND RE-FILED AT DOCKET ENTRY NO. #206 * - FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:08-cv-00460-FL, 5:09-cv-00037-FL (Fedder, Jane) Modified on 07/15/2009 to insert re-filing information (Baker, C.).
July 13, 2009 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane E. Fedder on behalf of St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc. (Fedder, Jane)
July 13, 2009 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Donald Cowan, Jr on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. (Cowan, J.)
July 13, 2009 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #173 Status Report, Amended (Belk, Caroline)
July 13, 2009 Filing 199 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (Kramer, Joel)
July 13, 2009 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel A. Kramer on behalf of Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (Kramer, Joel)
July 13, 2009 Filing 197 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Circle Growers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent coram flora company for Green Circle Growers, Inc... (McCallister, Steven)
July 13, 2009 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K. McCallister on behalf of Green Circle Growers, Inc. (McCallister, Steven)
July 13, 2009 Filing 195 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frontier Communications Corporation (Alexander, Rodney)
July 13, 2009 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E. Alexander on behalf of Frontier Communications Corporation (Alexander, Rodney)
July 13, 2009 Filing 193 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Shearin, Norman)
July 13, 2009 Filing 192 NOTICE by International Power Machinery Company re #184 Financial Disclosure Statement (to correct image) (Dawson, Amos)
July 10, 2009 Filing 191 *FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT A NAMED PARTY IN THIS ACTION* - FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consumers Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent CMS Energy Corporation for Consumers Energy Company. (Fedder, Jane) Modified on 8/7/2009 to include filer information (Baker, C.).
July 10, 2009 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane E. Fedder on behalf of Consumers Energy Company (Fedder, Jane)
July 10, 2009 Filing 189 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center (Erteschik, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 188 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Monroe, North Carolina (Erteschik, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 187 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Town of Louisburg, North Carolina (Erteschik, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 186 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Regional Hospital (Erteschik, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 185 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cherry Hospital (Erteschik, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 184 *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND RE-FILED AT DOCKET ENTRY NO. #192 * - FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Power Machinery Company. (Dawson, Amos) Modified on 7/13/2009 to insert re-filing information (Baker, C.).
July 10, 2009 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Harrison Johnson on behalf of Town of Louisburg, North Carolina, City of Monroe, North Carolina, O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center, Central Regional Hospital, Cherry Hospital (Johnson, Keith)
July 10, 2009 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of Environmental Protection Services, Inc. (Olson, Kurt)
July 10, 2009 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Amos C. Dawson, III on behalf of International Power Machinery Company (Dawson, Amos)
July 10, 2009 Filing 180 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carr and Duff, Inc. (Lewis, E.)
July 10, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Hardy Lewis on behalf of Carr and Duff, Inc. (Lewis, E.)
July 10, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. Erteschik on behalf of Town of Louisburg, North Carolina, City of Monroe, North Carolina, O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center, Central Regional Hospital, Cherry Hospital (Erteschik, Andrew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 177 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Coats, David)
July 10, 2009 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Coats on behalf of East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form (Dennis Conniff), #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form (Amy Cubbage)) (Coats, David)
July 10, 2009 Filing 175 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 10, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 10, 2009 Filing 173 STATUS REPORT by Carolina Power & Light Company, Carolina Power & Light Company, Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants Who Object to the Stay, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Who Do Not Object to the Stay, #3 Exhibit C - EPA Press Release, #4 Exhibit D - Map of Removal Action)(Belk, Caroline)
July 10, 2009 Filing 172 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 10, 2009 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 10, 2009 Filing 170 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Koch Industries, Inc.. (Shields, Grady)
July 10, 2009 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Grady L. Shields on behalf of Koch Industries, Inc. (Shields, Grady)
July 10, 2009 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bernard Taylor on behalf of Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc. (Taylor, Anthony)
July 10, 2009 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bernard Taylor on behalf of Imerys Carbonates, LLC (Taylor, Anthony)
July 10, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 10, 2009 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of Imerys Carbonates, LLC (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 10, 2009 Filing 164 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Domtar Paper Company, LLC (Asbill, Mary)
July 10, 2009 Filing 163 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc. (Mimms, Julia)
July 10, 2009 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Maclean D Asbill on behalf of Domtar Paper Company, LLC (Asbill, Mary)
July 10, 2009 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia G. Mimms on behalf of Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc. (Mimms, Julia)
July 10, 2009 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bernard Taylor on behalf of Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc. (Taylor, Anthony)
July 10, 2009 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bernard Taylor on behalf of North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation (Taylor, Anthony)
July 10, 2009 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 10, 2009 Filing 157 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL et al. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 10, 2009 Filing 156 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
July 10, 2009 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 10, 2009 Filing 154 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
July 10, 2009 Filing 153 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL et al. (Roessler, Todd)
July 10, 2009 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd S. Roessler on behalf of Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc. (Roessler, Todd)
July 9, 2009 Filing 151 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Georgia Power Company identifying Corporate Parent The Southern Company for Georgia Power Company.. (Parsons, Gavin)
July 9, 2009 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Bryce Parsons on behalf of Georgia Power Company (Parsons, Gavin)
July 9, 2009 Filing 149 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 9, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 9, 2009 Filing 147 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 9, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 9, 2009 Filing 145 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greenwood Mills, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 9, 2009 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus A. Manos on behalf of Greenwood Mills, Inc. (Manos, Marcus)
July 9, 2009 Filing 143 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electric Equipment Corporation of Virginia. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00037-FL, 5:08-cv-00460-FL, 5:09-cv-00190-FL (Fedder, Jane)
July 9, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine W. Cralle-Jones on behalf of Baltimore Gas & Electric Company (Cralle-Jones, Catherine)
July 9, 2009 Filing 141 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G&S Motor Equipment Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00191-FL, 5:09-cv-00190-FL (Gifford, William)
July 9, 2009 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Gifford, Jr on behalf of G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc. (Gifford, William)
July 9, 2009 Filing 139 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carlisle Syntec Incorporated. (Briggs, Susan)
July 9, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Susan H. Briggs on behalf of Carlisle Syntec Incorporated (Briggs, Susan)
July 9, 2009 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan H. Briggs on behalf of Carlisle Syntec Incorporated (Briggs, Susan)
July 9, 2009 Filing 136 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apogee Coal Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent New Trout Coal Holdings II, LLC for Apogee Coal Company, LLC.. (Risinger, Bradley)
July 9, 2009 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley M. Risinger on behalf of Apogee Coal Company, LLC (Risinger, Bradley)
July 9, 2009 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Fox on behalf of Cogentrix Energy, LLC (Fox, David)
July 9, 2009 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Fox on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., North Carolina State University, Nucor Corporation, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (Fox, David)
July 8, 2009 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia M. Currin on behalf of Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc. (Currin, Cynthia)
July 8, 2009 Filing 131 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint/ Service on PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Belk, Caroline)
July 8, 2009 Filing 130 NOTICE by Weyerhaeuser Company re #70 Notice of Appearance Amended (Hart, Scott)
July 7, 2009 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd. (Olson, Kurt)
July 7, 2009 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company (DeGeorge, R.)
July 7, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of West Penn Power Company (DeGeorge, R.)
July 7, 2009 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Monongahela Power Company (DeGeorge, R.)
July 7, 2009 Filing 125 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership. (De Vore, Bradford)
July 7, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford A. De Vore on behalf of Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership (De Vore, Bradford)
July 7, 2009 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman W. Shearin, Jr on behalf of Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation (Shearin, Norman)
July 6, 2009 Filing 122 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Green, Stanley)
July 6, 2009 Filing 121 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danny Corporation. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia S. Bright on behalf of Danny Corporation (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 119 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 118 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cleveland Electric Company (Schoolman, Brian)
July 6, 2009 Filing 117 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unimin Corporation identifying Corporate Parent SCR Sibelco N.V. for Unimin Corporation.. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 116 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southland Electrical Supply, Inc.. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 115 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Glenwood Regional Medical Center. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Schoolman on behalf of Cleveland Electric Company (Schoolman, Brian)
July 6, 2009 Filing 113 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GKN Driveline North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GKN plc for GKN Driveline North America, Inc... (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 112 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Florida Power & Light Company identifying Corporate Parent FPL Group, Inc. for Florida Power & Light Company.. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 111 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cargill, Incorporated. (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia S. Bright on behalf of Florida Power & Light Company, GKN Driveline North America, Inc., Glenwood Regional Medical Center, Southland Electrical Supply, Inc., Unimin Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division, Cargill, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bright, Julia)
July 6, 2009 Filing 109 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc. (Mergo, Nikole)
July 6, 2009 Filing 108 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikole Setzler Mergo on behalf of IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc. (Mergo, Nikole)
July 6, 2009 Filing 106 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Carolina State University (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 105 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nucor Corporation (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 104 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Holcim, Inc. (Mergo, Nikole)
July 6, 2009 Filing 103 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikole Setzler Mergo on behalf of Holcim, Inc. (Mergo, Nikole)
July 6, 2009 Filing 101 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cogentrix Energy, LLC (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 100 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kraft Foods Global, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kraft Foods, Inc. for Kraft Foods Global, Inc.. (Bowers, John)
July 6, 2009 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by John Watson Bowers on behalf of Kraft Foods Global, Inc. (Bowers, John)
July 6, 2009 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Byrne on behalf of Cogentrix Energy, LLC (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Byrne on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., North Carolina State University, Nucor Corporation, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (Byrne, Michael)
July 6, 2009 Filing 96 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company (Bowers, John)
July 6, 2009 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Joint MOTION (Ex Parte) for Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. (Green, Stanley)
July 6, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by John Watson Bowers on behalf of 3M Company (Bowers, John)
July 6, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley B. Green on behalf of Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC (Green, Stanley)
July 6, 2009 Filing 92 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pactiv Corporation (Adden, Robert)
July 6, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Adden, Jr on behalf of Pactiv Corporation (Adden, Robert)
July 6, 2009 Filing 90 RESPONSE by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation to the Court's June 10, 2009 Preliminary Scheduling Order and Notice of Appearance by Shelly Jacobs Ellerhorst. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 6, 2009 Filing 89 RESPONSE by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation to the Court's June 10, 2009 Preliminary Scheduling Order and Notice of Appearance by Douglas Sheppard Arnold. Associated Cases: 5:09-cv-00190-FL, 5:09-cv-00191-FL (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 6, 2009 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Sidbury, Benjamin)
July 6, 2009 Filing 87 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO) identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Resources, Inc. for Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO). (Deak, D.)
July 6, 2009 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Joint MOTION (Ex Parte) for Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cited Caselaw) (Deak, D.)
July 6, 2009 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Kyle Deak on behalf of Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO) (Deak, D.)
July 6, 2009 Filing 84 Letter from CT Corporation - CT Corporation is not the agent for Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Grady, B.)
July 6, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (DeGeorge, R.)
July 2, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J. Olson on behalf of General Extrusions, Inc., American Skiing Company, Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc., International Paper Company, Kingsport Power Company, Midamerican Energy Company, Appalachian Power Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Arkema, Inc., Sara Lee Corporation, South Central Power Company, Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc., BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Chemical Products Corporation, Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, CSX Residual Company, Duquesne Light Company (Olson, Kurt)
July 2, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
July 2, 2009 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on United States Air Force on 6/29/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Delivery Confirmation) (Belk, Caroline)
July 2, 2009 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Duquese Light Company; Dutch Electric, Inc.; East Central Regional Hospital; East Kentucky Power Cooperative; Environmental Protection Services; Florida Power & Light Company; Foremost Electric & Transmission; Frontier Communications Corporation; Furman University; General Extrusions; Georgia Power Company; Glenwood Regional Medical Center; Greenwood Mills; Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative; Imerys Carbonates; International Power Machinery Company; Intertape Polymer Group; Kingsport Power Company; Koch Industries; Lakeland (City of), Florida; Lockwood's Electric Motor Service; Midamerican Energy Company; Monongahela Power Company; Monroe (City of), North Carolina; Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation; Norfolk Southern Railway Company; North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation; Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding; Palmetto Electric Cooperative; Philadelphia (City of), Pennsylvania; PPL Electric Utilities Corporation; Royal Street Junk Company; Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation; Shieldalloy Mettallurgical Corporation; South Central Power Company; Southland Electrical Supply; St. Joseph Medical Center; Sumter Electric Cooperative; Tennessee Electro Minerals; Test Electrical Services; The Holladay Corporation; The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania; Trap Rock; United States Pipe and Foundry Company; United Technologies Corporation; Warren Electric Cooperative; Wartburg College; Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission; West Penn Power Company; Tennessee Valley Authority; United States Air Force; United States Central Intelligence Agency; United States Defense Logistics Agency; United States Department of the Army; United States Department of the Navy; G & S Motor Equipment Co.; Haines and Kibblehouse on 6/22/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- List of Defendants Served, #2 Exhibit B1- Delivery Confirmations, #3 Exhibit B2- Delivery Confirmations, #4 Exhibit C- List of Defendants Served, #5 Exhibit D- Delivery Confirmations, #6 Exhibit E- List of Defendants Served, #7 Exhibit F- Delivery Confirmations) (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 78 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint / Service on Bassett Furniture Industries; Martin Marietta Materials; North Carolina State University; Nucor Corporation; University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill Acknowledgement filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 77 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint / Service on Consolidation Coal Company Acknowledgement filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Roanoke Electric Steel Corporation on 6/24/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delivery Confirmation) (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on American Skiing Company on 6/26/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delivery Confirmation) (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on United Technologies Corporation on 6/30/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delivery Confirmation) (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Alcan Primary Productions Corporation; American Skiing Company; Apogee Coal Company; Atlas Electrical Construction; Augusta State University; Baltimore Gas & Electric Company; Bedford (City of), Virginia; Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative; Beta Marine & Industrial Corporation; Buist Electric; Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation; Carlisle Syntec Incorporated; Carr and Duff; Chemical Products Corporation; Christus Health; City Public Service of San Antonio; Conopco, Inc.; Consumers Energy Company; CSX Residual Company; Danny Corporation; Louisburg (Town of), North Carolina; Town of Tarboro, North Carolina on 6/19/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants Served, #2 Exhibit B - Delivery Confirmations) (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Frontier Communications Corporation; Green Circle Growers; Santee Electric Cooperative; Sunbelt Transformer; Tredegar Film Products Corporation on 6/23/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants Served, #2 Exhibit B - Delivery Confirmations) (Belk, Caroline)
July 1, 2009 Filing 71 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weyerhaeuser Company (Hart, Scott)
July 1, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott C. Hart on behalf of Weyerhaeuser Company (Hart, Scott)
July 1, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Daniel M. Darragh on behalf of Consolidation Coal Company (Darragh, Daniel)
June 30, 2009 Filing 68 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consolidation Coal Company identifying Corporate Parent Consol, Corporate Parent Consol Energy, Inc. for Consolidation Coal Company. (Pollock, William)
June 30, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Pollock on behalf of Consolidation Coal Company (Pollock, William)
June 30, 2009 Filing 66 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christus Health (Bentz, Curtis)
June 30, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis L. Bentz on behalf of Christus Health (Bentz, Curtis)
June 29, 2009 Filing 64 Summons Reissued as to United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division. Counsel should print summons to effect service. (Baker, C.)
June 29, 2009 Filing 63 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint - / Proposed Re-Issued Summons on United Technologies Corporation (Belk, Caroline)
June 26, 2009 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Honeywell International, Inc. and/or Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC; Tennessee Valley Authority; United States Air Force; United States Central Intelligence Agency; United States Defense Logistics Agency; United States Department of the Army; United States Department of the Navy on 06/17/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Delivery Confirmation, #2 Exhibit B-List of Defendants Served on U.S. Attorney-EDNC, #3 Exhibit C-Delivery Confirmations (U.S. Attorney-EDNC), #4 Exhibit D-Delivery Confirmation (NC Secretary of State)) (Belk, Caroline)
June 26, 2009 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on 3M Company; Alcoa Inc.; Appalachian Power Company; BASF Corporation; Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company; Cargill, Incorporated; Caterpillar Inc.; Cleveland Electric Company; Cooper Tire & Rubber Company; Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC; E.I. Du Pont de Nemours; Harsco Corporation; Holcim, Inc.; IES Commercial, Inc. and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc.; International Paper Company; kraft Foods Global, Inc.; Pactiv Corporation; The Hershey Company; Unimin Corporation; Union Carbide Corporation; Virginia Electric and Power Company on 06/16/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Defendants Served, #2 Exhibit B-Delivery Confirmations) (Belk, Caroline)
June 26, 2009 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Disclosure Statement; List of Mediators; Notice of Service of Ex Parte Joint Motion for Preliminary Scheduling Order; Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Joint Motion; Judge Flanagan's Order served on Central Regional Hospital; Cherry Hospital; O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center; Domtar Paper Company; Weyerhaeuser Company; Arkeman, Inc.; BayerCropScience, Inc.; Cogentrix Energy; Corning Incorporated; Eastman Chemical Company; GKN Driveline North America, Inc.; Honeywell International, Inc. and/or Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC; N.L. Industries; Sara Lee Corporation; Vulcan Construction Materials; Chevron U.S.A.; PPG Industries; Solo Cup Operating Corporation; Conocophillips Company; Bassett Furniture Industries on 06/17/09, filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Defendants Served on NC DHHS, #2 Exhibit B-Delivery Confirmations (NC DHHS), #3 Exhibit C-List of Defendants Served on National Registered Agents, #4 Exhibit D-Delivery Confirmations (National Registered Agents), #5 Exhibit E-List of Defendants Served on Corporation Service Company, #6 Exhibit F-Delivery Confirmations (Corporation Service Company), #7 Exhibit G-List of Defendants Served on Prentice-Hall, #8 Exhibit H-Delivery Confirmations (Prentice-Hall), #9 Exhibit I-Delivery Confirmation (United States Corporation Co.), #10 Exhibit J-Delivery Confirmation (Kilpatrick Stockton)) (Belk, Caroline)
June 26, 2009 Filing 59 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royal Street Junk Company, Inc. (Wellman, Jacob)
June 26, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Holmes Wellman on behalf of Royal Street Junk Company, Inc. (Wellman, Jacob)
June 25, 2009 Filing 57 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Intertape Polymer Group, Inc. (Cardwell, Ronald)
June 25, 2009 Filing 56 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Furman University (Cardwell, Ronald)
June 25, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Cardwell on behalf of Furman University, Intertape Polymer Group, Inc. (Cardwell, Ronald)
June 25, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
June 24, 2009 Filing 53 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N.L. Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Valhi, Incorporated for N.L. Industries, Inc. (Herz, Joel)
June 24, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul I. Klein on behalf of N.L. Industries, Inc. (Klein, Paul)
June 24, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Joel L Herz on behalf of N.L. Industries, Inc. (Herz, Joel)
June 18, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Joseph G. Nassif on behalf of General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Nassif, Joseph)
June 18, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance for non-district by Jane E. Fedder on behalf of General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Fedder, Jane)
June 17, 2009 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to United States Central Intelligence Agency. (Baker, C.)
June 17, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summons (Belk, Caroline)
June 16, 2009 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Honeywell International, Inc. and/or Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summons (Belk, Caroline)
June 16, 2009 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc., Consolidation Coal Company. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 15, 2009 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to The Hershey Company, The Holladay Corporation, Town of Tarboro, North Carolina, Test Electrical Services, Inc., Trap Rock, Inc., Tredegar Film Products Corporation, The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Unimin Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, United States Air Force, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Navy, United States Pipe and Foundry Company, LLC, United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division, Unitil Energy Systems, Inc., University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, Viacom Inc., Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO), Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership, Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wartburg College, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, West Penn Power Company, Weyerhaeuser Company. (Baker, C.)
June 15, 2009 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Nucor Corporation, O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center, Pactiv Corporation, Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc., City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, PPG Industries, Inc., PPL Electric Utilities Corporation, Roanoke Electric Steel Corporation, Royal Street Junk Company, Inc., Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation, Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sara Lee Corporation, Shieldalloy Mettallurgical Corporation, Solo Cup Operating Corporation, South Central Power Company, Southland Electrical Supply, Inc., St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc., Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd., Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc., Tennessee Valley Authority. (Baker, C.)
June 15, 2009 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc., Harsco Corporation, Holcim, Inc., IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Imerys Carbonates, LLC, International Paper Company, International Power Machinery Company, Intertape Polymer Group, Inc., Kingsport Power Company, Koch Industries, Inc., Kraft Foods Global, Inc., Lacrosse Footwear, Inc., City of Lakeland, Florida, Lockwood's Electric Motor Service, Town of Louisburg, North Carolina, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Midamerican Energy Company, Mid-Valley Pipeline Company, Monongahela Power Company, City of Monroe, North Carolina, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, N.L. Industries, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, North Carolina State University, North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation. (Baker, C.)
June 15, 2009 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Florida Power & Light Company, Foremost Electric & Transmission, Inc., Frontier Communications Corporation, Furman University, G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc., General Extrusions, Inc., Georgia Power Company, GKN Driveline North America, Inc., Glenwood Regional Medical Center, Graftech International Holdings, Inc., Grand Haven Board of Light & Power, Green Circle Growers, Inc., Greenwood Mills, Inc., Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc., E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Dutch Electric, Inc., East Central Regional Hospital, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East Penn Manufacturing Co., Eastman Chemical Company, Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Environmental Protection Services, Inc., Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Baker, C.)
June 15, 2009 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Caterpillar Inc., Central Regional Hospital, Chemical Products Corporation, Cherry Hospital, Chevron Mining Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Christus Health, City Public Service of San Antonio, a Municipal Board of the City of San Antonio, Cleveland Electric Company, Cogentrix Energy, LLC, Commonwealth Edison Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Conopco, Inc., Consolidation Coal Company, Consumers Energy Company, Continental Grain Company Corp., Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, Corning Incorporated, CSX Residual Company, Danny Corporation, Domtar Paper Company, LLC, Dravo Corporation, Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Duquesne Light Company. (Baker, C.)
June 15, 2009 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to American Skiing Company, Apogee Coal Company, LLC, Appalachian Power Company, Arkema, Inc., Atlas Electrical Construction, Inc., Augusta State University, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc., Beta Marine & Industrial Corporation, Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company, Buist Electric, Inc., Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation, Cargill, Incorporated, Carlisle Syntec Incorporated, Carr and Duff, Inc., 3M Company, Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., Akers National Roll Company, Alcan Primary Products Corporation, Alcoa Inc., Alliant Techsystems Inc. and/or ATK Launch Systems, Inc. (Baker, C.)
June 12, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 12, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 12, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 12, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 12, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 12, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Proposed Summonses (Belk, Caroline)
June 12, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Slosson on behalf of General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Slosson, John)
June 10, 2009 Filing 29 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 28 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 27 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sonoco Products Company (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 26 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic City Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Pepco Holdings, Inc. ("PHI") for. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 25 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delmarva Power & Light Company identifying Corporate Parent Pepco Holdings, Inc. ("PHI") for. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 24 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Potomac Electric Power Company identifying Corporate Parent Pepco Holdings, Inc. ("PHI") for. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 23 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pharmacia Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for Pharmacia Corporation. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 22 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LWB Refractories Company identifying Corporate Parent Rearden G. Holdings Vier, GmbH, Corporate Parent Magnesita Refractarios, S.A. for LWB Refractories Company. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 21 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 20 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 19 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 18 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electric Control Equipment Co. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 17 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dixon Lumber Company, Inc. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 16 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 15 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 Joint MOTION (Ex Parte) for Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by General Electric Company, General Motors Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Nassif (non-district) on behalf of General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Bright, Julia) Modified on 6/17/2009 to correct docket entry text (Baker, C.).
June 10, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Fedder (non-district) on behalf of General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Bright, Julia) Modified on 6/17/2009 to correct docket entry text (Baker, C.).
June 10, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia S. Bright on behalf of General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by General Electric Company, Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, LWB Refractories Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Potomac Electric Power Company, Atlantic City Electric Company, Sonoco Products Company, T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Electric Control Equipment Co.. General Electric Company waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; LWB Refractories Company waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Occidental Chemical Corporation waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Pharmacia Corporation waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Potomac Electric Power Company waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Atlantic City Electric Company waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Sonoco Products Company waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Delmarva Power & Light Company waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Dixon Lumber Company, Inc. waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009; Electric Control Equipment Co. waiver sent on 6/10/2009, answer due 8/10/2009. (Bright, Julia)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Joint MOTION Preliminary Scheduling Order Ex Parte filed by Carolina Power & Light Company d/b/a Progress Energy Carolinas, Inc.- The relief sought by plaintiffs, now is ALLOWED, provisionally. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/10/2009. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
June 5, 2009 Motions Submitted: #7 Joint MOTION (Ex Parte) for Preliminary Scheduling Order submitted to Chief Judge Flanagan for consideration. (Baker, C.)
June 4, 2009 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 Joint MOTION (Ex Parte) for Preliminary Scheduling Order filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Belk, Caroline)
June 4, 2009 Filing 7 Joint MOTION (Ex Parte) for Preliminary Scheduling Order by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Ex Parte Joint Motion for a Preliminary Scheduling Order) (Belk, Caroline)
May 22, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
May 18, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolina Power & Light Company (Belk, Caroline)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above captioned case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Louise W. Flanagan, Chief U.S. District Judge to conduct all proceedings in this matter. All future pleadings should reflect the revised case number 5:09-CV-190-FL. Signed by Clerk of Court on 05/06/09. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
April 30, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE by Carolina Power & Light Company re #1 Complaint, / Civil Cover Sheet (Smith, Christopher)
April 30, 2009 Filing 2 FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Smith, Christopher)
April 30, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Power & Light Company, Foremost Electric & Transmission, Inc., Four County Electric Membership Corporation, Frontier Communications Corporation, Furman University, G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc., General Electric Company, General Extrusions, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Georgia Power Company, GKN Driveline North America, Inc., Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation, Glenwood Regional Medical Center, American Skiing Company, Graftech International Holdings, Inc., Grand Haven Board of Light & Power, Green Circle Growers, Inc., Greenwood Mills, Inc., Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc., Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc., Harsco Corporation, The Hershey Company, Holcim, Inc., The Holladay Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc. and/or Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC., IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Apogee Coal Company, LLC, Imerys Carbonates, LLC, International Paper Company, International Power Machinery Company, Intertape Polymer Group, Inc., Kingsport Power Company, Koch Industries, Inc., Kraft Foods Global, Inc., Lacrosse Footwear, Inc., City of Lakeland, Florida, Lockwood's Electric Motor Service, Town of Louisburg, North Carolina, City of Luverne, Minnesota, LWB Refractories Company, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Midamerican Energy Company, Appalachian Power Company, Mid-Valley Pipeline Company, Monongahela Power Company, City of Monroe, North Carolina, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation, N.L. Industries, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, North Carolina State University, North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation, Arkema, Inc., Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Nucor Corporation, O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pactiv Corporation, Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, Potomac Electric Power Company, PPG Industries, Inc., PPL Electric Utilities Corporation, Atlantic City Electric Company, Roanoke Electric Steel Corporation, Royal Street Junk Company, Inc., Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation, Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sara Lee Corporation, Shieldalloy Mettallurgical Corporation, Solo Cup Operating Corporation, Atlas Electrical Construction, Inc., Sonoco Products Company, South Central Power Company, Southland Electrical Supply, Inc., St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc., Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd., T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc., Town of Tarboro, North Carolina, Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc., Augusta State University, Tennessee Valley Authority, Test Electrical Services, Inc., Trap Rock, Inc., Tredegar Film Products Corporation, Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc., The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Unimin Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, United States Air Force, United States Central Intelligence Agency, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Navy, United States Pipe and Foundry Company, LLC, United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division, Unitil Energy Systems, Inc., BASF Corporation, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, Viacom Inc., Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO), Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership, Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc., Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc., Wartburg College, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, West Penn Power Company, Weyerhaeuser Company, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc., City of Bedford, Virginia, Beta Marine & Industrial Corporation, Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc., Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc., Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company, Buist Electric, Inc., Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation, Cargill, Incorporated, Carlisle Syntec Incorporated, Carr and Duff, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., 3M Company, Central Regional Hospital, Chemical Products Corporation, Cherry Hospital, Chevron Mining Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Christus Health, Air Products and Chemicals, Inc., City Public Service of San Antonio, a Municipal Board of the City of San Antonio, Cleveland Electric Company, Cogentrix Energy, LLC, Commonwealth Edison Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Conopco, Inc., Akers National Roll Company, Consolidation Coal Company, Consumers Energy Company, Continental Grain Company Corp., Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, Alcan Primary Products Corporation, Corning Incorporated, CSX Residual Company, Danny Corporation, Delmarva Power & Light Company, Dixon Lumber Company, Inc., Domtar Paper Company, LLC, Dravo Corporation, Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Duquesne Light Company, Dutch Electric, Inc., East Central Regional Hospital, Alcoa Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East Penn Manufacturing Co., Eastman Chemical Company, Electric Control Equipment Co., Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Environmental Protection Services, Inc., Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc., Alliant Techsystems Inc. and/or ATK Launch Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 04170000000000864981.), filed by Carolina Power & Light Company. (Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carolina Power & Light Company v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Holladay Corporation
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus Health
Represented By: Curtis L. Bentz
Represented By: Robert O. Renbarger
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Public Service of San Antonio, a Municipal Board of the City of San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State University
Represented By: Michael John Byrne
Represented By: William A. White
Represented By: David E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Hampton Y. Dellinger
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Peter T. Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trap Rock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LWB Refractories Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPS Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.L. Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joel L Herz
Represented By: Paul I. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Construction Materials, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Bradford A. De Vore
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: William T. Lavender, Jr.
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Control Equipment Co.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Electrical Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domtar Paper Company, LLC
Represented By: Mary Maclean Asbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Electric and Power Company (VEPCO)
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcan Primary Products Corporation
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Mining Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haines and Kibblehouse, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duquesne Light Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Bernard Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wartburg College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four County Electric Membership Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Represented By: Stanley B. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graftech International Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECO Energy
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Pipe and Foundry Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Circle Growers, Inc.
Represented By: Steven K. McCallister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Power & Light Company
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Regional Hospital
Represented By: Keith Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shieldalloy Mettallurgical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Energy Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dravo Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Byrne
Represented By: William A. White
Represented By: David E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Test Electrical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santee Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: William T. Lavender, Jr.
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Represented By: John Watson Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Penn Power Company
Represented By: Hampton Y. Dellinger
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Power Machinery Company
Represented By: Debora S. Lasch
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Amos C. Dawson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: John Watson Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Hampton Y. Dellinger
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monongahela Power Company
Represented By: Hampton Y. Dellinger
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Electric Utilities Corporation
Represented By: Sara Wyche Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Berry Neuro-Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Syntec Incorporated
Represented By: Susan H. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Transformer, Ltd.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Street Junk Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Holmes Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Electro Minerals, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Bernard Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intertape Polymer Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald E. Cardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guernsey-Muskingum Electric Cooperative Inc.
Represented By: Ben L. Pfefferle
Represented By: Gregory R. Flax
Represented By: Julia G. Mimms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixon Lumber Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Power Company
Represented By: Gavin B. Parsons
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Grain Company Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta State University
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furman University
Represented By: Ronald E. Cardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
Represented By: Joel A. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Haven Board of Light & Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce-Merrilees Electric Company
Represented By: Hampton Y. Dellinger
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Represented By: Scott C. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solo Cup Operating Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Electrical Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Hospital
Represented By: Keith Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Michael John Byrne
Represented By: William A. White
Represented By: David E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Electric Company
Represented By: Brian J. Schoolman
Represented By: Herman L. Fussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lakeland, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buist Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis L. Bentz
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firelands Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
Represented By: Michael John Byrne
Represented By: William A. White
Represented By: David E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IES Commercial, Inc., and/or Integrated Electrical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Represented By: William T. Lavender, Jr.
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Power Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedford Rural Electric Cooperative Inc.
Represented By: William T. Lavender, Jr.
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Represented By: Cynthia M. Currin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Central Regional Hospital
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akers National Roll Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broad River Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidation Coal Company
Represented By: William W. Pollock
Represented By: Daniel M. Darragh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Products and Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsport Power Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Tarboro, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bassett Furniture Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Todd S. Roessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Gas & Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine W. Cralle-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midamerican Energy Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian Power Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holcim, Inc.
Represented By: Nikole Setzler Mergo
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogentrix Energy, LLC
Represented By: Michael John Byrne
Represented By: David E. Fox
Represented By: Zackary D. Knaub
Represented By: William A. White
Represented By: Megan R. Brillault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Corporation
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenwood Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Bernard Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bedford, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Defense Logistics Agency
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: John C. Millberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Louisburg, North Carolina
Represented By: Keith Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Extrusions, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beta Marine & Industrial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jane Borthwick Story
Represented By: Michael H. Ginsberg
Represented By: Mary Beth Deemer
Represented By: Ryan D. Dahl
Represented By: J. Donald Cowan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & S Motor Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stephen W. Smithson
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Wagenbach
Represented By: William H. Gifford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc. and/or Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmarva Power & Light Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood's Electric Motor Service
Represented By: Bradley M. Risinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacrosse Footwear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Carbonates, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Bernard Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Armature & Electrical Works, Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Valley Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Techsystems Inc. and/or ATK Launch Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcoa Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pactiv Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Represented By: Robert S. Adden, Jr.
Represented By: Raymond T. Reott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Electric Power Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimin Corporation
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tredegar Film Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus Schumpert Medical Center
Represented By: Curtis L. Bentz
Represented By: Robert O. Renbarger
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Lee Corporation
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporation
Represented By: Rodney E. Alexander
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Residual Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monroe, North Carolina
Represented By: Keith Harrison Johnson
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Hatteras Electric Membership Corporation
Represented By: Norman W. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Skiing Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoco Products Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKN Driveline North America, Inc.
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladieux Trading & Marketing Co., LP, and/or Limited Corporation
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and R Electric Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holladay Property Services Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roanoke Electric Steel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Grady L. Shields
Represented By: Jessica E. Merrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Penn Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carr and Duff, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Wallack
Represented By: E. Hardy Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitil Energy Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Mills, Inc.
Represented By: William T. Lavender, Jr.
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Electric & Transmission, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: William T. Lavender, Jr.
Represented By: Marcus A. Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Luverne, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic City Electric Company
Represented By: Jane E. Fedder
Represented By: John S. Slosson
Represented By: Joseph G. Nassif
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemical Products Corporation
Represented By: Kurt J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Represented By: C. Scott Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apogee Coal Company, LLC
Represented By: Bradley M. Risinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
Represented By: Sara Wyche Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Power & Light Company
Represented By: Caroline N. Belk
Represented By: Christopher G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?