Faulk v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Gary Cornelius Faulk
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2011cv00523
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. The Commissioner is ordered to pay the plaintiff's counsel a sum of $3,542.00 from Plaintiff's back benefits and upon payment of such sum, the plaintiff's attorney must reimburse the EAJA fee. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/4/2014. (Fisher, M.)
May 13, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER granting 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/12/2013. (Edwards, S.)
February 14, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED and the matter is REMANDED to the agency for rehearing. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 2/14/2013. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulk v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cornelius Faulk
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?