Sloan v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Brenda Jean Sloan
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2012cv00388
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's counsel be awarded fees under 42 U.S.C. §406(b) in the amount of $21,856.50, and refund to Plaintiff the smaller award between this amount and the EAJA award. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The court GRANTS Sloan's motion for fees and costs under the EAJA, [D.E. 35], but reduces the award to $5,400.00 in attorney's fees and $27.31 in costs. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/17/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court ADOPTS the Memorandum and Recommendations [D.E. 32]. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [D.E. 26] is GRANTED, Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [D.E. 28] is DENIED, and the action is REMANDED to the Commissioner under sentence 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/8/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sloan v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jean Sloan
Represented By: Cynthia M. Currin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?