Wake County Human Services v. Davis

Plaintiff: Wake County Human Services
Defendant: William Scott Davis, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00413
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Amend Complaint and MOTION - F.R.C.P. Rule 60, Rule 15, 28 USC 1915. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/30/2016. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to P.O. Box 1600, Butner, NC 27509. (Romine, L.)
March 30, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion Rule 60(b)(4) and Rule 15(c)(2). Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/29/2016. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to Butner - F.M.C., P.O. Box 1600, Butner, NC 27509. (Romine, L.)
February 25, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/25/2016. Copy sent to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to New Hanover County Jail, 3950 Juvenile Center Rd., Castle Haynes, NC 28429. (Romine, L.)
May 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 25 Motion to Stay; dismissing 27 Motion to Stay; dismissing 29 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/27/2013. Copy sent to Mr. Davis via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 9, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Stay. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/9/2013. Copy sent to defendant via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wake County Human Services v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wake County Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?