Blackwell v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Lenora E. Blackwell
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2012cv00651
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/07/2015. (Baker, C.)
November 6, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/06/2014. (Baker, C.)
October 16, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered October 16, 2014, that the Administrative Law Judge rendered a favorable decision to plaintiff on July 25, 2014 which neither party contests, and final judgment is rendered in favor of plaintiff in the instant action. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 10/16/2014. (Baker, C.)
October 22, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 24 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and adopting 27 Memorandum and Recommendations - The court REMANDS to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405( g) for consideration of the Social Security Administration decision dated January 24, 2013 (DE 26-1 at 5-11), as set forth in the M&R (DE 27 at 10). Following remand, the Commissioner must return to this court to file any additional or modified findings and any transcript of additional record upon which the modification or affirmance of the prior decision is based, pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/22/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora E. Blackwell
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?