Greene v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Greene
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2013cv00028
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING WITH MODIFICATIONS 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. The award will be reduced based on the unreasonableness of upholding the contingency fee agreement. Accordingly, the plaintiff's counsel shall be awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $10,000.00, and the plaintiff's counsel is ordered to refund to the plaintiff the smaller EAJA fee of $3,662.50. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/9/2014. (Fisher, M.)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/1/2014. (Fisher, M.)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and DENYING 26 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED, and this case is REMANDED for an award of benefits. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/11/2014. (Fisher, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Greene
Represented By: Frederick (Rick) W. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Elisa Donohoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?