State of North Carolina v. Davis
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Defendant: William Scott Davis, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00046
Filed: March 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 25 Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 17(c)(2); denying 26 Motion Pursuant to Rule 60(b); denying 27 Motion pursuant to Rules 17 and 60; denying 24 Motion F.R.Civ.P 60(b). Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/9/2017. Certified copy sent via US Mail to William Scott Davis, Jr. at Butner - F.M.C., P.O. Box 1600, Butner, NC 27509. (Stouch, L.)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 15 Rule 60(b) Motion. The motions to reopen case and for relief under Rule 60(b) in each of the above-captioned cases are DENIED. The Court will consider critically any future filings by Mr. Davis in which it is apparent that he is m erely seeking to avoid the pre-filing injunction. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/21/2016. Certified copy sent to William Scott Davis via US mail to P.O. Box 1600, Butner, NC 27509. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/21/2016. (Stouch, L.)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Memorandum & Recommendation; DENYING 7 Motion for Recusal; DENYING AS MOOT 8 Motion to Vacate; DENYING AS MOOT 9 Motion to Stay; and DENYING AS MOOT 10 Motion for Extension of Time. This matter is REMANDED in its entirety to Wake County Superior Court. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/24/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of North Carolina v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?