Coulter v. Estate of Edward W. Grannis Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Eugene Coulter, Sr.
Defendant: Estate of Edward W. Grannis Jr., Margaret Buntie Russ, Earl R. Butler, Ennis Wright, Spring Lake Police Department, Michael B East, Robin Pendergraft and North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 5:2016cv00277
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and denying as moot 70 Motion to Compel. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/19/2017. (Stouch, L.)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Stay and granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/16/2017. (Stouch, L.)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying without prejudice 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying 27 Motion to Dispense with Mediation. Plaintiff is hereby DIRECTED to file an amended complaint not later than December 9, 2016. Plaintiff is further DIRECT ED to effect proper service on defendants Estate of Grannis and Russ not later than December 16,2016. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/22/2016. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important information. (Stouch, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Estate of Edward W. Grannis Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Eugene Coulter, Sr.
Represented By: James E. Ferguson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Edward W. Grannis Jr.
Represented By: David J. Adinolfi, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Buntie Russ
Represented By: David J. Adinolfi, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl R. Butler
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis Wright
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Lake Police Department
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Dan McCord Hartzog, Jr.
Represented By: Katelyn W. McCombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B East
Represented By: Hal F. Askins
Represented By: Lauren Tally Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Pendergraft
Represented By: Hal F. Askins
Represented By: Lauren Tally Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Hal F. Askins
Represented By: Lauren Tally Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?