Kelly v. Hospitality Ventures LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Kelly
Defendant: Hospitality Ventures LLC, SAS Institute Inc., NC Culinary Ventures LLC and Ann B. Goodnight
Case Number: 5:2017cv00098
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 79 Motion to Certify Class Motion for Conditional FLSA Certification and for Certification Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(A) and (B)(3), and to Appoint Class Counsel Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G); denying [154 ] Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings or Join Additional Parties. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and file, within 14 days of the date of this order, a joint notice regarding proposed notice and forms, as specified in more detail herein. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/3/2021. (Collins, S.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 134 Motion for Bill of Costs - Plaintiff's appeal remains pending in the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals. Given the pending appeal in this matter, the clerk DENIES defendants' motion for bill of cos ts WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and grants permission to defendants to refile and incorporate their prior filings by reference following the issuance of the mandate of the court of appeals, if appropriate. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/16/2019. (Tripp, S.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/18/2018. (Tripp, S.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - Plaintiffs motion to amend complaint 37 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth herein. Plaintiff shall file, within 7 days of the date of this order an amended complaint containing only those amendments a llowed by this order. In light of the courts ruling on the instant motion to amend, defendants motion to dismiss defendant Goodnight 21 is DENIED AS MOOT. The parties are DIRECTED to file within 15 days of the date of this order a joint report and plan in accordance with the courts April 3, 2017, initial order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/5/2017. (Collins, S.)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/9/2017. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Hospitality Ventures LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Kelly
Represented By: Michael B. Cohen
Represented By: Gilda A. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Ventures LLC
Represented By: Jordan Danielle Arkin
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: John R. Hunt
Represented By: Arch Y. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS Institute Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Danielle Arkin
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: John R. Hunt
Represented By: Arch Y. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Culinary Ventures LLC
Represented By: Jordan Danielle Arkin
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: John R. Hunt
Represented By: Arch Y. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann B. Goodnight
Represented By: Jordan Danielle Arkin
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: John R. Hunt
Represented By: Arch Y. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?