Hall v. Inch et al
Plaintiff: Marc Pierre Hall
Defendant: P.A. Shaw, Unit Manager Lesley, Angela P. Dunbar, Dr. Patrick Craft, United States, Dr. Reginold Hall, T. Billingslea, Dr. Sarah Beyer, Lieutenant More, Mr. Chorosevic, G. Hall, Counselor Brooks, M. Inch, Mr. Wartz, Brandon Wyche, Nurse Borges, Case Manager Harris, Associate Warden Myatt, Dr. V. Cahill, Hospital Administrator, Lieutenant Loyd, Dr. C. Duchesne, Henry McMillan, Captain D. Avery, Warden Holland, D. Marsigli, Mr. Payne, Associate Warden Rupska, Captain Wright, Case Manager Houk, Captain Rule, Central Office Medical Designator, Administrative Remedy Coordinator, K. McKoy, M. Bredenberg, Warden Andrews and BOP Agency
Case Number: 5:2019ct03048
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT in Support regarding #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 Legal Notice for Supervisory Liability / Affodavit filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave of Court to Issue Defendants 30 day Legal Notice for Supervisory Liability in Good Faith / Affidavit / Request Waiver of Ad-remedy filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION requesting clerk of court to serve US Attorney with Meeting of the Parties Supplement due Incapacitation of Lockdown regarding #23 Document filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 Document: Request for Meeting of the Parties; Compromise and Settlements filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Marc Pierre Hall requesting a copy of the docket sheet. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Courtesy copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
March 12, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #20 MOTION for Meeting of the Parties, Compromise, and Settlements and #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Required IFP Court Fee. (Indig, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Meeting of the Parties, Compromise, and Settlements filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Document in Support) (Love, L.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Required IFP Court Fee filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 Exhibits 3-8 (Exhibits to Affidavit) filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Exhibits 8-14 filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT by Marc Pierre Hall in Support of Civil Complaint and Exhibits 1-3 filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Love, L.)
March 1, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #15 MOTION to Issue Summons for each defendant and Order Service by US Marshal. (Indig, A.)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Issue Summons for each defendant and Order Service by US Marshal filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
February 22, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Case also submitted for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/22/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 21, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Marc Pierre Hall at Hazelton - U.S.P. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 Thirty (30) Day Notice filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Marc Pierre Hall for Legal Notice Re: Obstruction of the FTCA Process by the Director of Tort Branch filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Request to the Director Tort Branch to Receive Authorization for Reconsideration of Tort filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Supplemental Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice for Post Writ of Attachment filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachment: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Third Party Complaint as Amended filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Indig, A.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administrative Remedy Coordinator, Warden Andrews, D. Avery, BOP Agency, Sarah Beyer, T. Billingslea, Nurse Borges, M. Bredenberg, Counselor Brooks, V. Cahill, Central Office Medical Designator, Mr. Chorosevic, Patrick Craft, C. Duchesne, Angela P. Dunbar, G. Hall, Reginold Hall, Case Manager Harris, Warden Holland, Hospital Administrator, Case Manager Houk, M. Inch, Unit Manager Lesley, Lieutenant Loyd, D. Marsigli, K. McKoy, Henry McMillan, Lieutenant More, Associate Warden Myatt, Mr. Payne, Captain Rule, Associate Warden Rupska, P.A. Shaw, United States, Mr. Wartz, Captain Wright and Brandon Wyche filed by Marc Pierre Hall. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Inch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Lesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela P. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Patrick Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reginold Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Billingslea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sarah Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Chorosevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Wartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Wyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Borges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. V. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. C. Duchesne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain D. Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Marsigli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Rupska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Office Medical Designator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Remedy Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. McKoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bredenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Pierre Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?