Witham v. Boyle et al
Plaintiff: Judson Witham
Defendant: Terrence Boyle, The 4th Circuit Court of Appeals, New York State, US Supreme Court and International Paper Corp.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00260
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt: #9 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Judson Witham. (Herrmann, L.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #9 Memorandum and Recommendations by Judson Witham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Judson Witham. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is ALLOWED, and it is RECOMMENDED that the complaint be dismissed. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 8/14/2019. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/30/2019. Copy sent to Judson Witham 15215 Aiken Rd. Wake Forest, NC 27587 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Judicially Recognised Facts filed by Judson Witham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, #2 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Judicially Recognized Facts filed by Judson Witham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 9, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Herrmann, L.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #2 Order filed by Judson Witham. (Herrmann, L.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Judson Witham (Unsigned). (Herrmann, L.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Judson Witham. (Herrmann, L.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Judson Witham. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (Herrmann, L.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/1/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (NO Filing fee Paid), filed by Judson Witham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witham v. Boyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judson Witham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 4th Circuit Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?