R.A. v. Epic Games, Inc.
Plaintiff: R. A.
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00325
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 53 Memorandum in Support regarding #52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Alexander Lee Simon on behalf of R. A.. (Simon, Alexander)
September 4, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Daniel L. Warshaw on behalf of R. A.. (Warshaw, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joseph C. Bourne on behalf of R. A.. (Bourne, Joseph)
August 29, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Epic Games, Inc. answer due 9/9/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/13/2019. (Stouch, L.)
August 12, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, and Modification of Current Deadlines. (Stouch, L.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, and Modification of Current Deadlines filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Van Arnam, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick M. Wallace on behalf of R. A.. (Wallace, Patrick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel K. Bryson on behalf of R. A.. (Bryson, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 44 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jeffrey S. Jacobson on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance filed by Wes J. Camden on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Camden, Wes)
August 2, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Van Arnam on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Van Arnam, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 41 Notice Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of California Central. Case Number 2:19-cv-01488. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - FINAL RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR TRANSFER #26 by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Final Ruling. This Court would DENY Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, but GRANT Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Case electronically transferred on 7/31/2019. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR TRANSFER #26 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant's Motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE Attorney Ryan M Salztman in place and instead of Attorneys Tahir Boykins and James Saylor for defendant Epic Games, Inc #36 by Judge George H. Wu (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Tahir Boykins and James Saylor as counsel of record filed by defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boykins, Tahir) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #26 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR TRANSFER by Judge George H. Wu. The hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel or Transfer is hereby continued until July 29, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The reply is due on or before July 5, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman counsel for Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. Adding Ryan M. Salzman as counsel of record for Epic Games, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman added to party Epic Games, Inc.(pty:dft))(Salzman, Ryan) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 32 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #26 filed by Plaintiff R. A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R.A., #2 Declaration of Steve Altes)(Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph C Bourne counsel for Plaintiff R. A.. Adding Joseph C. Bourne as counsel of record for R.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph C. Bourne. (Attorney Joseph C Bourne added to party R. A.(pty:pla))(Bourne, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration or Transfer from July 11, 2019 to July 18, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #26 filed by Plaintiff R. A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Gold, Sophia) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jeffrey S Jacobson counsel for Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. Changing Kelly Drye & Warren LLP to Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP. Changing jjacobson@kelleydrye.com to jeffrey.jacobson@dbr.com. Filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of James Farnsworth in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #26 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Jeffrey S. Jacobson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #26 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendant Epic Games, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Jacobson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Stipulation for Order #24 . The parties' Stipulation is GRANTED. 1. Defendant must file a motion to compel arbitration and/or motion to transfer on or before May 17, 2019. 2. Plaintiff must file an opposition to the motion to compel arbitration and motion to transfer, or amend the Complaint in response thereto, on or before June 19, 2019. 3. Defendant must file a reply to Plaintiff's opposition(s) on or before July 3, 2019. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeffrey)[Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Epic Games, Inc., designating Tahir L Boykins as local counsel. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney James B Saylor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Epic Games, Inc., designating Tahir L Boykins as local counsel. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Saylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23599944) filed by defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boykins, Tahir) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23599858) filed by defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boykins, Tahir) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Epic Games, Inc., identifying Tencent Holdings, Ltd. (Boykins, Tahir) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tahir Lynn Boykins counsel for Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. Adding Tahir L. Boykins as counsel of record for Epic Games, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attorney Tahir Lynn Boykins added to party Epic Games, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boykins, Tahir) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S. Weiner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of R. A., designating Daniel L. Warshaw as local counsel. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff R. A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23337639) filed by Plaintiff R. A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 Standing Order Re Final Pre-TrialConferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. See order for details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff R. A.. upon Epic Games, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/3/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey S. Jacobson. (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #11 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Steve Altes as Guardian ad Litem for R.A. (sp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Epic Games, Inc. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 PETITION for Appointment of Steve Altes as Guardian ad Litem for R.A. filed by Plaintiff R. A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff R. A.. (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa S. Weiner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 171. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 837. 17. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff R.A., a minor, by and through his Guardian, Steve Altes, identifying None. (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff R.A., a minor, by and through his Guardian, Steve Altes. (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff R.A., a minor, by and through his Guardian, Steve Altes. (Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23295599 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff R.A., a minor, by and through his Guardian, Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Daniel L Warshaw added to party R.A., a minor, by and through his Guardian, Steve Altes(pty:pla))(Warshaw, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.A. v. Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Jacobson
Represented By: James B Saylor
Represented By: Tahir Lynn Boykins
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Salzman
Represented By: Wes J. Camden
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. A.
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Melissa S Weiner
Represented By: Alexander Lee Simon
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Daniel L Warshaw
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?