Grant v. Hooks et al
Plaintiff: Sandra L. Grant
Defendant: BI Incorporated, Erik Hooks and Reliant Mangement Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00296
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #16 filed by Defendant Erik Hooks. For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including August 26, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/29/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
July 29, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to respond to Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to respond to Complaint filed by Erik Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Nichols, Bryan)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. BI Incorporated answer due 8/17/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/16/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 16, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, and to Respond to Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, and to Respond to Complaint filed by BI Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Prentiss, Donald)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sandra L. Grant (Dubbeling, Paul)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Dubbeling on behalf of Sandra L. Grant. (Dubbeling, Paul)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by BI Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent GEO Group, Inc for BI Incorporated. (Prentiss, Donald)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan Mitchell Douglas on behalf of BI Incorporated. (Douglas, Bryan)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Donald C. Prentiss on behalf of BI Incorporated. (Prentiss, Donald)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Hooks shall have up to and including July 27, 2020 in which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/26/2020. Paul Dubbeling of P.M. Dubbeling, PLLC at 210 North Columbia Street, Chapel Hill, NC 27514 and Counsel for Defendant, BI Incorporated, Don Prentiss at 301 East Main Street, Elizabeth City, NC 27909 mailed via US Mail on June 26, 2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Reliant Mangement Group, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, and to respond to Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, and to respond to Complaint filed by Erik Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Nichols, Bryan)
June 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Reliant Mangement Group, Inc. (Keister, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Notice of Deficiency regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
June 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Paul Dubbeling of P.M. Dubbeling, PLLC at 210 North Columbia Street, Chapel Hill, NC 27514 and Counsel for Defendant, BI Incorporated, Don Prentiss at 301 East Main Street, Elizabeth City, NC 27909 mailed via US Mail on June 22, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
June 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Reliant Mangement Group, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Erik Hooks. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Kyle Pytlik on behalf of Reliant Mangement Group, Inc.. (Pytlik, Stephen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey D. Keister on behalf of Reliant Mangement Group, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Erik Hooks from Wake Count Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 5514. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5478280), filed by Erik Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Summons of Defendant Hooks, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet) (Nichols, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Hooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BI Incorporated
Represented By: Donald C. Prentiss
Represented By: Bryan Mitchell Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Hooks
Represented By: Bryan G. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Mangement Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Kyle Pytlik
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L. Grant
Represented By: Paul M. Dubbeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?