Tanner et al v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Barbour, Lucas Miller and Beth Tanner
Defendant: Jeff Carmon, III, Stella Anderson, Roy Cooper, Karen Brinson Bell and Damon Circosta
Case Number: 5:2021cv00014
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Melissa Barbour, Lucas Miller, Beth Tanner as to All Defendants. (Howard, Joshua)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/22/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2021 regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lucas Miller, Melissa Barbour, Beth Tanner. Parties present with counsel. Argument by both parties regarding motion. Court announces ruling in open court. Motion denied. (Court Reporter Amy Condon) (Sellers, N.)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2021 at 01:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/21/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Roy Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Brinson Bell) (Steed, Terence)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lucas Miller, Melissa Barbour, Beth Tanner. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order is due not later than 5:00 p.m. on January 19, 2021. Any reply is due not later than 5:00 p.m. on January 20, 2021. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/15/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Melissa Barbour, Lucas Miller, Beth Tanner. (Howard, Joshua)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Melissa Barbour, Lucas Miller, Beth Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Howard, Joshua)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lucas Miller, Melissa Barbour, Beth Tanner. All Defendants. (Howard, Joshua)
January 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lucas Miller (Howard, Joshua)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Melissa Barbour (Howard, Joshua)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Beth Tanner (Howard, Joshua)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Brian Howard on behalf of Melissa Barbour, Lucas Miller, Beth Tanner. (Howard, Joshua)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, III, Damon Circosta, Roy Cooper. (Steed, Terence)
January 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
January 13, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Melissa Barbour, Lucas Miller, Beth Tanner. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roy Cooper, Damon Circosta, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, III, Karen Brinson Bell ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5821742.), filed by Beth Tanner, Lucas Miller, Melissa Barbour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Order from the State Board of Elections dated 12/21/2020, #3 Exhibit B- Memorandum of Judicial District 10-F Candidate Beth Tanner, #4 Exhibit C- Copy of an Order from the Wake County Board of Elections dated 11/19/2020) (Howard, Joshua) Modified on 1/13/2021 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner et al v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carmon, III
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Circosta
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Barbour
Represented By: Joshua Brian Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Miller
Represented By: Joshua Brian Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Tanner
Represented By: Joshua Brian Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?