Thompson v. Austin et al
Plaintiff: Brandy Thompson
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, Doe 1, Doe 2 and Doe 3
Case Number: 5:2021cv00283
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 Process Receipt and Return - US Attorney General served on 9/2/2021. (Waddell, K.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Process Receipt and Return - Secretary of Department of Defense served on 9/7/2021. (Waddell, K.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 Process Receipt and Return - Commissioner of EEOC served on 9/1/2021. (Waddell, K.)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding #8 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. She may re-file her request following the filing of an answer or the disposition of a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 8/25/2021. (Copy of order sent to Brandy Thompson, P. O. Box 1704, Fayetteville, NC 28302 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney U.S. Attorney General, and EEOC Headquarters. (Attachments: #1 US Marshals Service Forms) (Waddell, K.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT, filed by Brandy Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Compliaint for Employment Discrimination, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Application, Civil Service Letter, Offer Emails and Memos, VA Rating Decision, and Position Description, #4 Exhibit B -Veterans and the Americans with Disabilities Act and Enforcement Guidance and Leave Policy and Memo, #5 Exhibit C -Patient Advocate Memo and Doctor Notes, #6 Exhibit D- Email Correspondence and Patient Advocate Memo, #7 Exhibit E - Consent for Release of Information, Email Correspondence, Leave Forms, Doctor Notes, and Agency Response, #8 Exhibit F -Agency Response and Statements, #9 Exhibit G- Performance Reports and Customer Feedback, #10 Exhibit H - Before and After Pictures of Hair, #11 Exhibit I - Motion for Summary Judgment, Orders, and Right to Sue Letter) (Waddell, K.)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/23/2021. (Copy of order sent to Brandy Thompson, P. O. Box 1704, Fayetteville, NC 28302 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
August 24, 2021 Remark - Filed-stamped copies of #5 order, summonses, and complaint forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Waddell, K.)
August 24, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #8 MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel. (Waddell, K.)
July 7, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Waddell, K.)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Document: Supplement to Proposed Complaint filed by Brandy Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Note - Related to "Exhibit H", #2 Supplement EEOC - Corrected Copy of Decision, #3 Envelope) (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Brandy Thompson. (Rudd, D.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Brandy Thompson. (Rudd, D.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Brandy Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A- Application, civil service letter, tentative offer emails and memo, offer and email, rating decision and other documents, #5 Exhibit B- Veterans and the Americans with Disabilities Act, enforcement guidance, leave memo and policies, #6 Exhibit C- Patient Advocate memo, letter from doctor an April progress notices ith PTSD and medications, #7 Exhibit D- Emails to and from management and patient advocate memo, #8 Exhibit Consent for Release of Information from Senator Bill Nelson, emails to management requesting for accommodations of leave, modified work schedule, etc., #9 Exhibit F- Agency's reponse to the Senator's inquiry, Investigator Anglea R. Jones notes with management and witness testimony, #10 Exhibit G- DeCA's performance handouts, customer feedback, #11 Exhibit H- Pictures of hair before and after working at the commissary, medical records 11/29/2017, 2/21/2018, and June 1 & 13, 2018, #12 Exhibit I- Agency's motion for summary judgmnt, order entering judgment, final order with appeal rights, right to sue letter an previous right to sue letter and request for reconsideration, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Certificate of Service, #18 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?