J.M. et al v. Wake County Board of Education
Plaintiff: J.M., D.M. and G.M.
Defendant: Wake County Board of Education
Case Number: 5:2021cv00344
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay these activities. Unless a party raises objection in filing due within 14 days from this date, the court stays the parties' scheduling conference activities pending decision on motion filed October 19, 2021. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/20/2021. (Tripp, S.)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wake County Board of Education. (Rawson, Stephen)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wake County Board of Education. (Rawson, Stephen)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wake County Board of Education. (Rawson, Stephen)
October 7, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.)
October 7, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including October 19, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/7/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Wake County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time) (Noland, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wake County Board of Education (Noland, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by David B. Noland on behalf of Wake County Board of Education. (Noland, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen G. Rawson on behalf of Wake County Board of Education. (Rawson, Stephen)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.M., G.M., D.M.. Wake County Board of Education served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Gahagan, Stacey)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by D.M. (Gahagan, Stacey)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wake County Board of Education. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to D.M. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by D.M., G.M., J.M. (Gahagan, Stacey)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stacey Marlise Gahagan on behalf of D.M., G.M., J.M.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wake County Board of Education ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6206349.), filed by J.M., G.M., D.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 2021-5-28 Final Decision, #4 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees-SMG, #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees- Keith Howard, #6 Affidavit is Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees- Kelli Espaillat) (Gahagan, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.M. et al v. Wake County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.
Represented By: Stacey Marlise Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Represented By: Stacey Marlise Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.M.
Represented By: Stacey Marlise Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County Board of Education
Represented By: David B. Noland
Represented By: Stephen G. Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?