Whitehurst v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst
Defendant: Demetrius A. Clark, Anthony A. Adams, Timothy Lewis, NC Department of Public Safety, Bertie Correctional Institution, Officer Saddler, Mr. Snyder, Sgt. Roller and Charlotte Evans
Case Number: 5:2022ct03047
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.)
March 31, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Lopez, R.)
March 29, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service of a Summons sent to NC Department of Public Safety on 3/29/2022 via email regarding Timothy Lewis and Officer Saddler. Response due by 5/27/2022. (Castania, M)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff may proceed with his claim alleging deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against defendants Saddler and Lewis. The court DISMISSES all other claims and defendants, along with plaintiff's request for release from incarceration. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/29/2022. Copy served via US Mail: Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst 1250819, Bertie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 129, Windsor, NC 27983. (Castania, M)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst requesting copies of subpoenas. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A)
March 28, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever, III regarding #10 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. (Poole, A)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Order (Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Indig, A.)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 TRUTH AFFIDAVIT Power of Attorney in Fact filed by Anthony A. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/24/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 24, 2022 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for initial review. (Indig, A.)
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
February 23, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/1/2022. Copy sent via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Plaintiff at Bertie Correctional. (Indig, A.)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Indig, A.)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony A. Adams, Bertie Correctional Institution, Demetrius A. Clark, Charlotte Evans, Timothy Lewis, NC Department of Public Safety, Sgt. Roller, Officer Saddler and Mr. Snyder filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2022: #4 Proposed Summons) (Indig, A.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehurst v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrius A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertie Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Saddler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?