North Carolina Green Party et al v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
Plaintiff: North Carolina Green Party, Tony Ndege, Matthew Hoh, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Worrell, Samantha Spence, Aaron Mohammed and Michael Trudeau
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections, Chair Damon Circosta, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, Stacy Eggers, IV, Tommy Tucker and Karen Brinson Bell
Intervenor Defendant: DSCC and North Carolina Democratic Party
Amicus Curiae: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Case Number: 5:2022cv00276
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Brian S Meyers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 80 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 18, 2022, before District Judge James C. Dever III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy M. Condon. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's #website Redaction Request due 10/2/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2022. (Condon, A.)
September 8, 2022 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript #80 Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter or transcriber. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter or transcriber, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (Condon, A.)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #27 Amended Complaint, Jointly filed with Intervenor-Defendants, Stella Anderson answer due 12/7/2022; Karen Brinson Bell answer due 12/7/2022; Jeff Carmon answer due 12/7/2022; Damon Circosta answer due 12/7/2022; DSCC answer due 12/7/2022; Stacy Eggers, IV answer due 12/7/2022; North Carolina Democratic Party answer due 12/7/2022; North Carolina State Board of Elections answer due 12/7/2022; Tommy Tucker answer due 12/7/2022. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/6/2022. (Sellers, N.)
September 6, 2022 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #27 Amended Complaint, Jointly filed with Intervenor-Defendants, filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Steed, Terence)
August 30, 2022 Filing 77 RULE 42(b) MANDATE of US Court of Appeals (certified copy) as to #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by North Carolina Democratic Party, DSCC. (Rudd, D.)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by North Carolina Democratic Party, DSCC. Upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. (Rudd, D.)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by North Carolina Democratic Party, DSCC. Upon consideration of submissions relative to appellants' emergency motion for stay pending appeal, the court denies the motion. Upon consideration of the motion for leave to file brief of amicus curiae National Republican Senatorial Committee, the court grants the motion and accepts the amicus brief as filed. (Foell, S.)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying #67 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/10/2022. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DSCC answer due 9/7/2022; North Carolina Democratic Party answer due 9/7/2022. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/9/2022. (Sellers, N.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Stella Anderson answer due 9/7/2022; Karen Brinson Bell answer due 9/7/2022; Jeff Carmon answer due 9/7/2022; Damon Circosta answer due 9/7/2022; Stacy Eggers, IV answer due 9/7/2022; North Carolina State Board of Elections answer due 9/7/2022; Tommy Tucker answer due 9/7/2022. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/9/2022. (Sellers, N.)
August 9, 2022 Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #71 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #27 Amended Complaint, , #70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #27 Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
August 9, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #67 Emergency MOTION to Stay regarding #64 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Expedite. (Sellers, N.)
August 8, 2022 Filing 71 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #27 Amended Complaint, filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ghosh, Narendra)
August 8, 2022 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #27 Amended Complaint, filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Steed, Terence)
August 8, 2022 Filing 69 US Court of Appeals Case Number 22-1830 (Rickie Edwards, Case Manager) as to #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by North Carolina Democratic Party, DSCC. (Foell, S.)
August 8, 2022 Filing 68 Proposed Order regarding #67 Emergency MOTION to Stay regarding #64 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Expedite filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Dodge, Christopher)
August 8, 2022 Filing 67 Emergency MOTION to Stay regarding #64 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Expedite filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Emergency Motion to Stay) (Dodge, Christopher)
August 8, 2022 Filing 66 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Foell, S.)
August 8, 2022 Filing 65 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party as to #64 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Expedite. Filing fee, receipt number 0417-6667158. (Dodge, Christopher)
August 8, 2022 Notice to Counsel regarding: #67 Motion to Stay. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3) and Section V(I)(3) of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual and Judge Dever's practice preferences, parties must file a proposed order with any non-dispositive motion. Please file a proposed order using the event 'Proposed Order' in the Responses and Replies category and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. (Sellers, N.)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - The court CANCELS the hearing scheduled for 1:00 p.m. on August 8, 2022. The court GRANTS the intervenors' motion to intervene [D.E. 15] and DENIES as moot the intervenors' motion to expedite [D.E. 21]. The court GRANTS the NRSC's motion for leave to file as amicus curiae [D.E. 42]. Finally, the court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction [D.E. 28]. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/5/2022. (Edwards, S.)
August 4, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #15 MOTION to Intervene. (Sellers, N.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 63 Proposed Order regarding #62 Status Report, #55 Order,,, filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Steed, Terence)
August 3, 2022 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT JOINTLY IN RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER [D.E. 55] by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker (Steed, Terence)
August 3, 2022 Filing 61 Proposed Order regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Hall, Oliver)
August 3, 2022 Filing 60 Notice of Related Case filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell North Carolina Democratic Party v. North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in North Carolina Democratic Party v. North Carolina State Board of Elections) (Hall, Oliver)
August 3, 2022 Filing 59 Notice of Related Case filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell North Carolina Democratic Party v. North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Hall, Oliver)
August 2, 2022 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell. (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
August 2, 2022 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- August 1 NCSBE Presentation, #2 Exhibit 2 -- July 28 Letter to NCSBE) (Ghosh, Narendra)
August 2, 2022 Filing 56 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Thomas L. Oliver on behalf of National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Oliver, Thomas)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - Not later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, August 3, 2022, the parties SHALL file a proposed consent order resolving the issues in this case in light of the NCSBE certifying the NCGP as a political party. If the parties cannot agree on a proposed consent order, each party SHALL submit its own proposed order. Not later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, August 3, 2022, the parties SHALL file a joint status report advising whether, in the parties' view, the court still needs to hold a hearing on Monday, August 8, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiffs MAY still file a reply to defendants' response in opposition to plaintiffs' motionfor a preliminary injunction should plaintiffs choose to do so. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/1/2022. (Sellers, N.)
August 1, 2022 Filing 54 Notice filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker Notice of Agency Action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8-1-22 Letter from State Board to Green Party re Recognition of Green Party) (Steed, Terence)
July 29, 2022 Filing 53 Declaration regarding #51 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Matthew Martucci by Karen Brinson Bell, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Stacy Eggers, IV, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, Tommy Tucker, Damon Circosta filed by Karen Brinson Bell, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Stacy Eggers, IV, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, Tommy Tucker, Damon Circosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Wake County Petitions, #2 Exhibit 12 - 6-7-22 Email to GP re Request to Meet about Petitions, #3 Exhibit 13 - 6-7-22 Email from GP re Put Questions in Writing, #4 Exhibit 14 - 6-15-22 Email to GP re Investigation and Statutory Authority, #5 Exhibit 15 - 6-16-22 Email to GP re Samples of Petitions) (Steed, Terence)
July 29, 2022 Filing 52 Declaration regarding #51 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Paul Cox by Karen Brinson Bell, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Stacy Eggers, IV, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, Tommy Tucker, Damon Circosta filed by Karen Brinson Bell, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Stacy Eggers, IV, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, Tommy Tucker, Damon Circosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Green Party Petition Request Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10-5-21 Email to GP re Submission of Prior Petitions, #3 Exhibit 3 - 12-22-21 Email to county boards re Current Chair Required, #4 Exhibit 4 - 3-13-22 Email from GP re Change to 2024 Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - 5-27-22 Email to GP re June 1 Deadline, #6 Exhibit 6 - 6-6-22 Email to county boards re May 17 Deadline, #7 Exhibit 7 - 6-13-22 Email to GP re Submission of Petition Copies, #8 Exhibit 8 - 6-30-22 Meeting GP Petition Presentation, #9 Exhibit 9 - SBE Petition Instructional Materials, #10 Exhibit 10 - 7-11-22 Email to county boards re Signature Comparison) (Steed, Terence)
July 29, 2022 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Steed, Terence)
July 29, 2022 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Dodge, Christopher)
July 29, 2022 Filing 49 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Aria C. Branch on behalf of DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Branch, Aria)
July 29, 2022 Filing 48 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Richard A. Medina on behalf of DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Medina, Richard)
July 29, 2022 Filing 47 Proposed Order regarding #42 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae National Republican Senatorial Committee in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Republican Senatorial Committee. (King, C.)
July 29, 2022 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance filed by C. Bailey King, Jr on behalf of National Republican Senatorial Committee. (King, C.)
July 29, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene. (Sellers, N.)
July 29, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #42 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae National Republican Senatorial Committee in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Sellers, N.)
July 28, 2022 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell. (Hall, Oliver)
July 28, 2022 Filing 44 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher D. Dodge on behalf of DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Dodge, Christopher)
July 27, 2022 Notice to Counsel regarding: #41 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out-of-district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 43 Memorandum in Support regarding #42 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae National Republican Senatorial Committee in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of the National Republican Senatorial Committee for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Republican Senatorial Committee. (King, C.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae National Republican Senatorial Committee in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Amicus Curiae National Republican Senatorial Committee ISO Pltfs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (King, C.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 41 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by C. Bailey King, Jr on behalf of National Republican Senatorial Committee. (King, C.)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER regarding #21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene filed by North Carolina Democratic Party, DSCC. Any response from plaintiffs or defendants to the proposed intervenors' motion to expedite SHALL be filed not later than Thursday, July 28, 2022. No replies are permitted. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/22/2022. (Sellers, N.)
July 22, 2022 Filing 39 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tommy Tucker (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 38 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stacy Eggers, IV (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 37 Financial Disclosure Statement by Damon Circosta (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 36 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeff Carmon (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 35 Financial Disclosure Statement by Karen Brinson Bell (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 34 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina State Board of Elections (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 33 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stella Anderson (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Steed, Terence)
July 22, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Carla Babb on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Stacy Eggers, IV, North Carolina State Board of Elections, Tommy Tucker. (Babb, Mary)
July 22, 2022 Filing 30 Memorandum in Support regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Corrected: Table of Contents filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell. (Hall, Oliver)
July 22, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene. (Sellers, N.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 29 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #30 . Memorandum in Support regarding #28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell. (Hall, Oliver) Modified on 7/22/2022 (Sellers, N.).
July 21, 2022 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Michael Trudeau, Samantha Worrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Anthony Ndege, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael Trudeau, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Matthew Hoh, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Rose Ellen Seeman, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Clinton Ebadi, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Jeremy Gilchrist, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Charlie Hammerle, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Connor Harney, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Andrew Hicks, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Brian Irving, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Aaron Mohammed, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Janet Nagel, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of K. Ryan Parker, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Ahmed Selim, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Samantha Spence, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Samantha Worrell, #17 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Scott Satalino) (Hall, Oliver)
July 21, 2022 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against North Carolina State Board of Elections, filed by Samantha Worrell, Tony Ndege, Samantha Spence, North Carolina Green Party, Aaron Mohammed, Michael Trudeau, Matthew Hoh, K. Ryan Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter: Rose (Roby) Seeman to NCSBE Investigator (June 29, 2022), #2 Exhibit 2 - NCGP Response to NCSBE Investigator (June 16, 2022), #3 Exhibit 3 - NCGP Response to NCSBE Attorney (June 22, 2022)) (Hall, Oliver)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER regarding briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/20/2022. (Sellers, N.)
July 20, 2022 Set Hearing as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2022 at 01:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
July 19, 2022 Filing 25 Proposed Order regarding #23 Response filed by North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Steed, Terence)
July 19, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Oliver B. Hall on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hall, Oliver)
July 19, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Order regarding #18 Status Conference,, Plaintiffs' and Defendant's Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Steed, Terence)
July 19, 2022 Filing 22 Notice filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party regarding #21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene , Exhibit A to Motion to Expedite (Email Correspondence). (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 19, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Consideration of Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 18, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Carla Babb on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Babb, Mary)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:22-CV-276-D-BM. No further filing shall be made in 4:22-CV-78-D-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/18/2022. (Sellers, N.)
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Status Conference held on 7/18/2022. Counsel for both parties present. Court hears from parties regarding complaint. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant are directed to meet and confer today regarding a proposed briefing schedule for the expected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The proposed schedule should be submitted by 12:00 pm tomorrow, July 19, 2022. (Court Reporter Amy Condon) (Sellers, N.)
July 18, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Narendra K. Ghosh on behalf of DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 18, 2022 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 07/18/2022. Old Case Number 4:22-cv-78. (Sellers, N.)
July 17, 2022 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 17, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by DSCC, North Carolina Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Executive Director Report, #2 Exhibit B -- Report on NCGP Petition, #3 Exhibit C -- Jones Declaration, #4 Exhibit D -- Abuceiwicz Letter, #5 Exhibit E -- Proposed Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum) (Ghosh, Narendra)
July 17, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Pooyan Ordoubadi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael Trudeau (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Samantha Worrell (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Samantha Spence (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by K. Ryan Parker (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tony Ndege (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Aaron Mohammed (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Matthew Hoh (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 17, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of North Carolina State Board of Elections. (Steed, Terence)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Hearings - Status Conference set for 7/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/15/2022. (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North Carolina State Board of Elections. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Samantha Worrell. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Sellers, N.)
July 15, 2022 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western Division. The Clerk will enter an order to redesignate the division. (Sellers, N.)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Matthew Hoh, Aaron Mohammed, Tony Ndege, North Carolina Green Party, K. Ryan Parker, Samantha Spence, Samantha Worrell (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Pooyan Ordoubadi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6635904.), filed by Samantha Worrell, Tony Ndege, Samantha Spence, North Carolina Green Party, Aaron Mohammed, Matthew Hoh, K. Ryan Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter: Rose Roby to NCSBE Investigator Matthew Martucci June 29, 2022, #2 Exhibit 2 NCGP Response to NCSBE Investigator David Richards June 16, 2022, #3 Exhibit 3 NCGP Response to NCSBE Attorney Candace Marshall June 22, 2022, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons) (Ordoubadi, Pooyan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Carolina Green Party et al v. North Carolina State Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Green Party
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ndege
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hoh
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Ryan Parker
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Worrell
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Spence
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mohammed
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Trudeau
Represented By: Oliver B. Hall
Represented By: Pooyan Ordoubadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chair Damon Circosta
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carmon
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Eggers, IV
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Tucker
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Mary Carla Babb
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSCC
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Represented By: Richard A. Medina
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: North Carolina Democratic Party
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Richard A. Medina
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Republican Senatorial Committee
Represented By: C. Bailey King, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?