Enstrom et al v. SAS Institute Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Betsy Enstrom, John Stana, Kevin Arias-Watkins and Randall Wagner
Defendant: SAS Institute Inc., The Board of Directors of SAS Institute, Inc., The Retirement Committee of SAS Institute Inc. and John Does 1 - 30
Case Number: 5:2024cv00105
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert T Numbers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by SAS Institute Inc. (Millen, Pressly)
April 16, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Pressly M. Millen on behalf of SAS Institute Inc.. (Millen, Pressly)
April 10, 2024 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website, #www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Peter A. Muhic on behalf of Betsy Enstrom, John Stana, Randall Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert of Good Standing) (Muhic, Peter)
March 29, 2024 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Randall Wagner, Betsy Enstrom, John Stana. SAS Institute Inc. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Gyandoh, Mark)
March 29, 2024 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Randall Wagner, Betsy Enstrom, John Stana. The Retirement Committee of SAS Institute Inc. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Gyandoh, Mark)
March 29, 2024 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Randall Wagner, Betsy Enstrom, John Stana. The Board of Directors of SAS Institute, Inc. waiver sent on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Gyandoh, Mark)
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Donald R. Reavey on behalf of Betsy Enstrom, John Stana, Randall Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing) (Reavey, Donald)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark K. Gyandoh on behalf of Betsy Enstrom, John Stana, Randall Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - MKG) (Gyandoh, Mark)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Betsy Enstrom, John Stana, Randall Wagner (Szymankiewicz, John)
February 26, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Betsy Enstrom, John Stana, Randall Wagner. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
February 26, 2024 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 26, 2024 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
February 26, 2024 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7487907.), filed by Randall Wagner, Betsy Enstrom, Kevin Arias-Watkins, John Stana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Appendix A -- Target Dates 2055-2025, #3 Appendix Appendix B -- Computational Analysis Target Dates 2025-2055) (Szymankiewicz, John) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 2/29/2024) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enstrom et al v. SAS Institute Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Enstrom
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stana
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Arias-Watkins
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Wagner
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Peter A. Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS Institute Inc.
Represented By: Pressly M. Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of SAS Institute, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Retirement Committee of SAS Institute Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?