PHILLIPS v. TRIAD GUARANTY INC. et al
Plaintiff: |
JAMES L. PHILLIPS |
Defendant: |
TRIAD GUARANTY INC., MARK K. TONNESEN and KENNETH W. JONES |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00071 |
Filed: |
January 28, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Securities/Commodities Office |
County: |
Guilford |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
P. TREVOR SHARP |
Presiding Judge: |
UNASSIGNED |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
12:22 Securities Fraud |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 9, 2016 |
Filing
147
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 5/9/2016; that Lead Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses [Doc. # 126 ] is GRANTED, that Lead Counsel is awarded attorneys' fees of 30% ; of the Settlement Amount, plus expenses in the amount of $105,516.13, together with the interest earned on both amounts for the same time period and at the same rate as that earned on the Settlement Fund until paid, and that the fees and expenses shall be allocated amongst other Plaintiffs' counsel in a manner that Lead Counsel in good faith believes reflects the contributions of such counsel to the initiation, prosecution, and resolution of the litigation. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing
138
MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 3/23/2016; The Court approves both the Stipulation of Settlement and the Plan of Allocation and hereby GRANTS Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement an d Approval of Plan of Allocation [Doc. # 124 ]. A judgment and order dismissing this action with prejudice will be filed contemporaneously with this Memorandum Opinion. The Court retains jurisdiction over implementation of the Settlement and any awa rd or distribution of the Settlement Fund, including interest earned thereon; disposition of the Settlement Fund; hearing and determining applications for attorneys' fees and expenses; and all parties hereto for the purposes of construing, enforcing, and administering the Stipulation and the Settlement. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 3/30/2015; the Court affirms the Magistrate Judge's Order (Doc. # 87 ) striking Exhibits 8-11 to the Declaration of Robyn F. Tarnofsky, and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. # 73 ) is GRANTED and Exhibits 8-11 are ordered struck. The Court rejects the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (Doc. # 87 ), and Defendants' Mark K. Tonnesen's and Kenneth W. Jones' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 63 ) is GRANTED and the instant action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
May 31, 2013 |
Filing
87
ORDER, MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 05/31/2013; RECOMMENDED that Defendants' motion to dismiss the second amended complaint (Docket Entry 63 ) be DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to strike (Docket Entry 73 ) is GRANTED. (Garland, Leah)
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing
54
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, signed by MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP on 1/27/2012; that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket No. 24 ) be granted. Such a grant may, in the Court's discretion, be without prejudice to Plaintiff's opportunity, as requested at oral argument, to file a further amended complaint that adequately addresses the pleading deficiencies identified in this Recommendation. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?