GUILFORD COLLEGE et al v. NIELSEN et al

Plaintiff: FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, THE NEW SCHOOL, GUILFORD COLLEGE, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, American Federation of Teachers, SEN LI and JIA YE
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Amicus Curiae: MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, BENNINGTON COLLEGE, ROCHESTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, SMITH COLLEGE, CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, GOUCHER COLLEGE, MANHATTANVILLE COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, EMORY UNIVERSITY, NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY, ADLER UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, MACALESTER COLLEGE, NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN, BARNARD COLLEGE, MENLO COLLEGE, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, CORNELL COLLEGE, WILLIAMS COLLEGE, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, YALE UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, MILLS COLLEGE, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGES BOARD OF GOVERNORS, STANFORD UNIVERSITY, SOUTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, DREXEL UNIVERSITY, BROWN UNIVERSITY, SARAH LAWRENCE COLLEGE, MIDDLEBURY COLLEGE, ROOSEVELT UNIVERSITY, SWARTHMORE COLLEGE, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS, CHRISTIAN BROTHERS UNIVERSITY, RUTGERS UNIVERSITY-NEWARK, DUKE UNIVERSITY, FRANKLIN & MARSHALL COLLEGE, ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, BOSTON COLLEGE, RICE UNIVERSITY, MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE, CORNELL UNIVERSITY, BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY, TRINITY WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, AMHERST COLLEGE, WELLESLEY COLLEGE, DARTMOUTH COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY OF SAN DIEGO, ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF DENVER (COLORADO SEMINARY), PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY, RHODES COLLEGE, EMERSON COLLEGE, GETTYSBURG COLLEGE, EASTERN MICHIGAN UNIVERSITY, TUFTS UNIVERSITY, POMONA COLLEGE, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY OF UTAH and CLARK UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00891
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
2 Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Amicus Parties ADLER UNIVERSITY, AMHERST COLLEGE, ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY, BARNARD COLLEGE, BENNINGTON COLLEGE, BOSTON COLLEGE, BROWN UNIVERSITY, BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGES BOARD OF GOVERNORS, CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY, CHRISTIAN BROTHERS UNIVERSITY, CLARK UNIVERSITY, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, CORNELL COLLEGE, CORNELL UNIVERSITY, DARTMOUTH COLLEGE, DREXEL UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY, EASTERN MICHIGAN UNIVERSITY, EMERSON COLLEGE, EMORY UNIVERSITY, FRANKLIN & MARSHALL COLLEGE, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY, GETTYSBURG COLLEGE, GOUCHER COLLEGE, ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MACALESTER COLLEGE, MANHATTANVILLE COLLEGE, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MENLO COLLEGE, MIDDLEBURY COLLEGE, MILLS COLLEGE, MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE, NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY, POMONA COLLEGE, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN, RHODES COLLEGE, RICE UNIVERSITY, ROCHESTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, ROOSEVELT UNIVERSITY, RUTGERS UNIVERSITY-NEWARK, SARAH LAWRENCE COLLEGE, SMITH COLLEGE, SOUTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, STANFORD UNIVERSITY, SWARTHMORE COLLEGE, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, TRINITY WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF DENVER (COLORADO SEMINARY), UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF SAN DIEGO, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, UNIVERSITY OF UTAH, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS, WELLESLEY COLLEGE, WILLIAMS COLLEGE, YALE UNIVERSITY (SPEAS, EDWIN)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR on behalf of Amicus Parties ADLER UNIVERSITY, AMHERST COLLEGE, ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY, BARNARD COLLEGE, BENNINGTON COLLEGE, BOSTON COLLEGE, BROWN UNIVERSITY, BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGES BOARD OF GOVERNORS, CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY, CHRISTIAN BROTHERS UNIVERSITY, CLARK UNIVERSITY, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, CORNELL COLLEGE, CORNELL UNIVERSITY, DARTMOUTH COLLEGE, DREXEL UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY, EASTERN MICHIGAN UNIVERSITY, EMERSON COLLEGE, EMORY UNIVERSITY, FRANKLIN & MARSHALL COLLEGE, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY, GETTYSBURG COLLEGE, GOUCHER COLLEGE, ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MACALESTER COLLEGE, MANHATTANVILLE COLLEGE, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MENLO COLLEGE, MIDDLEBURY COLLEGE, MILLS COLLEGE, MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE, NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY, POMONA COLLEGE, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN, RHODES COLLEGE, RICE UNIVERSITY, ROCHESTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, ROOSEVELT UNIVERSITY, RUTGERS UNIVERSITY-NEWARK, SARAH LAWRENCE COLLEGE, SMITH COLLEGE, SOUTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, STANFORD UNIVERSITY, SWARTHMORE COLLEGE, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, TRINITY WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF DENVER (COLORADO SEMINARY), UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF SAN DIEGO, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, UNIVERSITY OF UTAH, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS, WELLESLEY COLLEGE, WILLIAMS COLLEGE, YALE UNIVERSITY (SPEAS, EDWIN)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae of Institutions of Higher Education in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Partial Summary Judgment by ADLER UNIVERSITY, AMHERST COLLEGE, ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY, BARNARD COLLEGE, BENNINGTON COLLEGE, BOSTON COLLEGE, BROWN UNIVERSITY, BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGES BOARD OF GOVERNORS, CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY, CHRISTIAN BROTHERS UNIVERSITY, CLARK UNIVERSITY, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, CORNELL COLLEGE, CORNELL UNIVERSITY, DARTMOUTH COLLEGE, DREXEL UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY, EASTERN MICHIGAN UNIVERSITY, EMERSON COLLEGE, EMORY UNIVERSITY, FRANKLIN & MARSHALL COLLEGE, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY, GETTYSBURG COLLEGE, GOUCHER COLLEGE, PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE, ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MACALESTER COLLEGE, MANHATTANVILLE COLLEGE, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, MENLO COLLEGE, MIDDLEBURY COLLEGE, MILLS COLLEGE, MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE, NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY, THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, POMONA COLLEGE, PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN, RHODES COLLEGE, RICE UNIVERSITY, ROCHESTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, ROOSEVELT UNIVERSITY, RUTGERS UNIVERSITY-NEWARK, SARAH LAWRENCE COLLEGE, SMITH COLLEGE, SOUTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, STANFORD UNIVERSITY, SWARTHMORE COLLEGE, TRINITY WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, TUFTS UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF DENVER (COLORADO SEMINARY), UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNIVERSITY OF SAN DIEGO, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, UNIVERSITY OF UTAH, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS, WELLESLEY COLLEGE, WILLIAMS COLLEGE, YALE UNIVERSITY. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed - Brief Amici Curiae of Institutions of Higher Education in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SPEAS, EDWIN)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs American Federation of Teachers, FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, GUILFORD COLLEGE, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, SEN LI, THE NEW SCHOOL, JIA YE re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Federation of Teachers, FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, GUILFORD COLLEGE, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, SEN LI, THE NEW SCHOOL, JIA YE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sen Li, #2 Declaration of Jia Ye, #3 Declaration of Michelle Relyea, #4 Declaration of Rhonda Weingarten, #5 Declaration of John Doe, #6 Declaration of Jane Doe, #7 Declaration of Jane Doe II)(HUGHES, PAUL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Partial Summary Judgment by American Federation of Teachers, FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, GUILFORD COLLEGE, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, SEN LI, THE NEW SCHOOL, JIA YE. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PAUL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, filed by THE NEW SCHOOL, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, GUILFORD COLLEGE, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, American Federation of Teachers, JIA YE, SEN LI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(HUGHES, PAUL)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL W. HUGHES on behalf of Plaintiffs FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, GUILFORD COLLEGE, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, THE NEW SCHOOL (HUGHES, PAUL)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY on behalf of Plaintiffs FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, GUILFORD COLLEGE, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE, THE NEW SCHOOL (KIMBERLY, MICHAEL)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSHUA S. PRESS on behalf of Defendants L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (PRESS, JOSHUA)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GUILFORD COLLEGE, FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, THE NEW SCHOOL, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE. L. FRANCIS CISSNA served on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; KIRSTJEN NIELSEN served on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. on Affidavit of Service as to Matthew G.T. Martin, United States Attorney for the Middle District of North Carolina (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - US Attorney General, #2 Affidavit of Service - L. Francis Cissna, #3 Affidavit of Service - Kirstjen M. Nielsen, #4 Affidavit of Service - US Citizenship and Immigration Services, #5 Affidavit of Service - US Department of Homeland Security)(MENEES, CORY)
October 29, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 AUSA, #2 CITIZENSHIP, #3 CISSNA, #4 USDHS, #5 USAG)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 23, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAVERFORD COLLEGE. (MENEES, CORY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. (MENEES, CORY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEW SCHOOL. (MENEES, CORY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB. (MENEES, CORY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GUILFORD COLLEGE. (MENEES, CORY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2448895.), filed by GUILFORD COLLEGE, FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, THE NEW SCHOOL, GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB, HAVERFORD COLLEGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 2018 Policy Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B - May 2018 Policy Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C - May 2009 Consolidated Guidance, #4 Exhibit D - September 1997 Virtue Memo, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MENEES, CORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUILFORD COLLEGE et al v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOOTHILL-DE ANZA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT
Represented By: CORY S. MENEES
Represented By: MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NEW SCHOOL
Represented By: CORY S. MENEES
Represented By: MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUILFORD COLLEGE
Represented By: CORY S. MENEES
Represented By: MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUILFORD COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL CLUB
Represented By: CORY S. MENEES
Represented By: MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAVERFORD COLLEGE
Represented By: CORY S. MENEES
Represented By: MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEN LI
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIA YE
Represented By: PAUL W. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: JOSHUA S. PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: JOSHUA S. PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: JOSHUA S. PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: JOSHUA S. PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BENNINGTON COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROCHESTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SMITH COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOUCHER COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MANHATTANVILLE COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMORY UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADLER UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MACALESTER COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BARNARD COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MENLO COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CORNELL COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAMS COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YALE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MILLS COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGES BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STANFORD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DREXEL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROWN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SARAH LAWRENCE COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIDDLEBURY COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROOSEVELT UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SWARTHMORE COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTIAN BROTHERS UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RUTGERS UNIVERSITY-NEWARK
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DUKE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRANKLIN & MARSHALL COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOSTON COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CORNELL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRINITY WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMHERST COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WELLESLEY COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DARTMOUTH COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF SAN DIEGO
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF DENVER (COLORADO SEMINARY)
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RHODES COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMERSON COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GETTYSBURG COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EASTERN MICHIGAN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TUFTS UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POMONA COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF UTAH
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CLARK UNIVERSITY
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?