CANNON et al v. AUTOMONEY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER TAYLOR, JULIA HARRISON, BRIAN BREVARD, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, QUENTON ESTES, RICHARD CHAMBERS, DAVID REYNOLDS, CRYSTAL PAGE, AMANDA ALEXANDER, ANDREA JOHNSON, DOUGLAS MCKOY, DUNIYA HICKS, PHYLISS DAYE, RANDY PRATT, SARAH CARSON, KEYOKA GASTON, SHANITA RUSH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, TIFFNEY HERNDON, ALEXIS CANON, BRANSFORD ELMORE, SHENEE SHAW, ERICA KANE, GLORIA GARRIS, RICHARD LOWE, TENISHA WALKER, LEONARD KINNEY, MARLENE JONES, BONITA MCKOY, NORMAN JONES, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, KEVIN ROBERTS, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, SHALANDA PRATT, AMANDA MARTIN, SUSAN JUDD, FRAN MCINTYRE, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, BILLY STANBACK, KLELICHA SHADE, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, WILLIAM BUNCH, CHRIS CARSON, VERONICA ROLLINSON, ROBERT TILLMAN, KYLE JONES, ANGELO CUMMINGS, KAREN JACKSON, LAKESHA YOUNG, HENRY LILES, MILTON KELLY, BRIAN MCDONALD, ALESIA CANNON, RAYFORD KIMBLE, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, ANTHONY SMITH, JONATHAN WATSON, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, ROBERT STRANGE, RODNEY EASTERLING, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, JACKIE COVINGTON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, LILLIE HARRIS, JACK WRIGHT, DERRICK GREEN, TERESA DIXON, JOHN QUICK, CURTIS HOUGH, ALISHA ROBERTS, KERMIT WOOTEN, HEATHER BARBER, ANTHONY STEWART, ERNEST GREEN, JASON SMALLS, ANTON JOHNSON, SHANEIKA LITTLE, WALTER VINSON, ANGELA BURNS, DONNA WATSON, LASHONTA BESS, WAYNE BASS, DIAMOND WALL, GEORGETTE HANDY, JAMES MCKOY, ALITHA FLEMING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, CASSANDRA BYERS, LESLIE WOODS, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, PAMELA BULLS, MARY MCBRIDE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DARLENE WATSON, SHERRY GASTON, NATHAN YOUNG, LORI GRAVES, DELORES FREEMAN, ROBERT HILLIARD, ROBERT MARTIN, COREY MCDUFFIE, TONY ROLLINS, YAKEENI YOUNG, MIGONNE WALKER, MATTHEW WITHERS, EVA VANN, DWAYNE BECKETT, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARANDA KNIGHT, GREGORY CHAVIS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, TAYLA COLLINS, FRANK QUICK, TALISHA GARCIA, CYNTHIA MILLER, WILLIAM MOORE, JAMES COXE, JAMES HOPKINS, NATASHA DAVIS, KHALIA MCLAURIN, BRIAN HILLMAN, REGINALD JOHNSON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, CHARLENE HARRIS, ANITA STONE, ISAIAH NIXON, EDWARD STINSON, XZAVIER MINTZ, TRACEY NANCE, DARLINE CRUMEL, SILVIA GOODSON, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, VINCENT COWART, TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, BENJAMIN PIERCE, SHA-MICA WALL and MONTREASE BLACKMON
Defendant: AUTOMONEY, INC. and AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00877
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Defendants AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC., to Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cannon Customer Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cannon Loan Agreement April 13, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cannon Loan Agreement November 3, 2018)(COOPER, LINDSEY)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY, to #20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 Motion to Remand filed by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC., filed by Plaintiffs TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG, to Response to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey K.Peraldo, #2 Exhibit Blettner v Masick, #3 Exhibit Defendants' July 26 2019 Letter, #4 Exhibit K-Flex v Armacell)(PERALDO, JEFFREY)
October 14, 2019 Filing 22 Plaintiffs' BRIEF re #21 MOTION for Discovery on Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Young v 3M, #2 Exhibit Celgard v SK Innovation, #3 Exhibit Bassett v. Strickland's)(PERALDO, JEFFREY)
October 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Discovery on Jurisdiction by TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2019 (PERALDO, JEFFREY)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 Motion to Remand filed by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC.. Replies due by 10/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Suppl Decl of Linda Derbyshire, #2 Exhibit 2 - Larsen v Assurant (W.D.N.C. 2009), #3 Exhibit 3 - Woods v Nationwide (N.D.W. Va. 2006), #4 Exhibit 4 - Williams et al. v. Advance America et al., Docket No 11, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fee Calculations, #6 Exhibit 6 - Aikens v Microsoft Corp (4th Cir. 2005))(COOPER, LINDSEY) Modified on 10/17/2019 to correct text (Garrett, Kim).
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC. filed by TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. Replies due by 10/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Volvo Group v Forja, #2 Exhibit Guzman v Diamond, #3 Exhibit Allen v Express, #4 Exhibit State v Western Sky, #5 Exhibit Sasser v Safe Home, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff Declarations, #7 Exhibit Exemplar Mailer, #8 Exhibit Bassett v Stricklands, #9 Exhibit DMV Printouts, #10 Exhibit Hunter v Mountain, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Cannon, #12 Exhibit Market America v Yang)(PERALDO, JEFFREY)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 09/24/2019, that Motions to Extend Time [Doc. #12 ], #17 ] are GRANTED, and the deadline to file Plaintiffs' Response Brief to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue in this matter is extended up to and including October 11, 2019, and the deadline to filed Defendants' Response Brief to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is extended up to and including October 11, 2019. FURTHER that the Motion to Seal [Doc. #10 ] is GRANTED, Plaintiff's original Brief [Doc. # 8 ] is STRICKEN, and Plaintiff's corrected Brief [Doc. #9 ] is accepted as the operative brief. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Substitution of Counsel [Doc. #13 ] is GRANTED.(Taylor, Abby) ]
September 24, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
September 16, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Margarete (Allio) Boyce, #10 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4], #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ALLIO, MARGARETE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LINDSEY W. COOPER, JR on behalf of Defendants AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC. (COOPER, LINDSEY)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC (ALLIO, MARGARETE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant AUTOMONEY, INC. (ALLIO, MARGARETE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Margarete (Allio) Boyce by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC.. (ALLIO, MARGARETE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PERALDO, JEFFREY)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiffs' BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] . (PERALDO, JEFFREY)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal [If the party filing this motion is not the party claiming confidentiality, the party claiming confidentiality will have 14 days to file a Brief in accordance with Local Rule 5.4] by TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2019 (PERALDO, JEFFREY)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alexander Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit McLendon v Walter Home Mortgage)(PERALDO, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by TAQUANDRA BALDWIN, HEATHER BARBER, WAYNE BASS, DWAYNE BECKETT, LASHONTA BESS, MONTREASE BLACKMON, BRIAN BREVARD, ANTHONY BREWINGTON, PAMELA BULLS, WILLIAM BUNCH, ANGELA BURNS, CASSANDRA BYERS, ALESIA CANNON, ALEXIS CANON, CHRIS CARSON, SARAH CARSON, RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019 (PERALDO, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cannon Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cannon Loan Agreement)(ALLIO, MARGARETE)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC.. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019 (ALLIO, MARGARETE)
August 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 30, 2019 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC. (Original documents issued in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS7693 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RICHARD CHAMBERS, GREGORY CHAVIS, TAYLA COLLINS, SETI HARRIS CORDERO, JACKIE COVINGTON, VINCENT COWART, JAMES COXE, DARLINE CRUMEL, ANGELO CUMMINGS, ALEXIS CUTHRELL, NATASHA DAVIS, PHYLISS DAYE, TERESA DIXON, MARQUIS DOUGLAS, RODNEY EASTERLING, BRANSFORD ELMORE, QUENTON ESTES, TERNETTE FAIRLEY, ALITHA FLEMING, ROSHAWN FLOYD, DELORES FREEMAN, TALISHA GARCIA, GLORIA GARRIS, KEYOKA GASTON, SHERRY GASTON, JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES, SILVIA GOODSON, LORI GRAVES, DERRICK GREEN, ERNEST GREEN, GEORGETTE HANDY, CHARLENE HARRIS, LILLIE HARRIS, JULIA HARRISON, DONOVAN HAWKINS, TIFFNEY HERNDON, DUNIYA HICKS, ROBERT HILLIARD, BRIAN HILLMAN, SHRONALD HOLLIDAY, CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT, CONSTANCE HOOD, JAMES HOPKINS, CURTIS HOUGH, APRIL HUSKEY, TACHA HYATT, KAREN JACKSON, ANDREA JOHNSON, ANTON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON, REGINALD JOHNSON, KYLE JONES, MARLENE JONES, NORMAN JONES, SUSAN JUDD, ERICA KANE, MILTON KELLY, RAYFORD KIMBLE, LEONARD KINNEY, MARANDA KNIGHT, HENRY LILES, MARQUITA LIPSCOMB, SHANEIKA LITTLE, RICHARD LOWE, AMANDA MARTIN, ROBERT MARTIN, SAEMEAKIA MASSEY, DEMETRIUS MAYHUE, MARY MCBRIDE, BRIAN MCDONALD, COREY MCDUFFIE, ANESHA MCGLOCKING, SHALISA MCGOUGAN, FRAN MCINTYRE, BONITA MCKOY, DOUGLAS MCKOY, JAMES MCKOY, VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN, KHALIA MCLAURIN, CYNTHIA MILLER, XZAVIER MINTZ, WILLIAM MOORE, TRACEY NANCE, ISAIAH NIXON, CRYSTAL PAGE, FRANKLIN PHILLIPS, RAMONA PHILLIPS, BENJAMIN PIERCE, ELIZABETH PINKSTON, CHRISTINA PLEASANT, RANDY PRATT, SHALANDA PRATT, FRANK QUICK, JOHN QUICK, DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA, DAVID REYNOLDS, ALISHA ROBERTS, KEVIN ROBERTS, TONY ROLLINS, VERONICA ROLLINSON, SHANITA RUSH, KLELICHA SHADE, SHENEE SHAW, JASON SMALLS, ANTHONY SMITH, BILLY STANBACK, ANTHONY STEWART, EDWARD STINSON, ANITA STONE, ROBERT STRANGE, JENNIFER TAYLOR, YAZMYNN TAYLOR, ROBERT TILLMAN, EVA VANN, WALTER VINSON, MIGONNE WALKER, TENISHA WALKER, DIAMOND WALL, SHA-MICA WALL, DARLENE WATSON, DONNA WATSON, JONATHAN WATSON, HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS, MATTHEW WITHERS, TASHONNA WITHERSPOON, LESLIE WOODS, KERMIT WOOTEN, JACK WRIGHT, LAKESHA YOUNG, NATHAN YOUNG, YAKEENI YOUNG. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS7693 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2642675.), filed by AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC, AUTOMONEY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Linda Derbyshire, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ALLIO, MARGARETE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANNON et al v. AUTOMONEY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER TAYLOR
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA HARRISON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BREVARD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PINKSTON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUENTON ESTES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CHAMBERS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID REYNOLDS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL PAGE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA ALEXANDER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS MCKOY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUNIYA HICKS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLISS DAYE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY PRATT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH CARSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYOKA GASTON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANITA RUSH
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL HUSKEY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TACHA HYATT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFNEY HERNDON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS CANON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANSFORD ELMORE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHENEE SHAW
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA KANE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA GARRIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LOWE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENISHA WALKER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD KINNEY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE JONES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONITA MCKOY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN JONES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN PHILLIPS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA PHILLIPS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN ROBERTS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY BREWINGTON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHALANDA PRATT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA MARTIN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN JUDD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRAN MCINTYRE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARQUIS DOUGLAS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY STANBACK
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLELICHA SHADE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS CUTHRELL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BUNCH
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS CARSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA ROLLINSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT TILLMAN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE JONES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELO CUMMINGS
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN JACKSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKESHA YOUNG
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY LILES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILTON KELLY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MCDONALD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALESIA CANNON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYFORD KIMBLE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN REDDICK-UMOJA
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE MCLAUGHLIN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHRONALD HOLLIDAY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SMITH
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN WATSON
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL HONEYCUTT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSTANCE HOOD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STRANGE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY EASTERLING
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERNETTE FAIRLEY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE COVINGTON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONOVAN HAWKINS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILLIE HARRIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK WRIGHT
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK GREEN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA DIXON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN QUICK
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS HOUGH
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALISHA ROBERTS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERMIT WOOTEN
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER BARBER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY STEWART
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST GREEN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON SMALLS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTON JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANEIKA LITTLE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER VINSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA BURNS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA WATSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASHONTA BESS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE BASS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIAMOND WALL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGETTE HANDY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCKOY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALITHA FLEMING
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHALISA MCGOUGAN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAEMEAKIA MASSEY
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA BYERS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE WOODS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA PLEASANT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA BULLS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MCBRIDE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANESHA MCGLOCKING
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAZMYNN TAYLOR
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY MARCEL WILLIAMS
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSHAWN FLOYD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE WATSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY GASTON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN YOUNG
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI GRAVES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELORES FREEMAN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT HILLIARD
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MARTIN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY MCDUFFIE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY ROLLINS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAKEENI YOUNG
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGONNE WALKER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW WITHERS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA VANN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWAYNE BECKETT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS MAYHUE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARANDA KNIGHT
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY CHAVIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHONNA WITHERSPOON
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETI HARRIS CORDERO
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLA COLLINS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK QUICK
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALISHA GARCIA
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MILLER
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MOORE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES COXE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HOPKINS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATASHA DAVIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALIA MCLAURIN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN HILLMAN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINALD JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE TIFFANY GATES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE HARRIS
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANITA STONE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAIAH NIXON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD STINSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XZAVIER MINTZ
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY NANCE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLINE CRUMEL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILVIA GOODSON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARQUITA LIPSCOMB
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT COWART
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAQUANDRA BALDWIN
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN PIERCE
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHA-MICA WALL
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTREASE BLACKMON
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT FAUCHER
Represented By: JEFFREY K. PERALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOMONEY, INC.
Represented By: MARGARETE L. ALLIO
Represented By: MARGARETE L. BOYCE
Represented By: LINDSEY W. COOPER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOMONEY NORTH, LLC
Represented By: MARGARETE L. ALLIO
Represented By: MARGARETE L. BOYCE
Represented By: LINDSEY W. COOPER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?