BRYANT v. STEIN et al
Plaintiff: AMY BRYANT, M.D.
Defendant: JOSHUA H. STEIN, JEFF NIEMAN, KODY H. KINSLEY, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD and ROBERT RICH, JR., MD
Intervenor Defendant: Timothy K. Moore and Philip E. Berger
Case Number: 1:2023cv00077
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Defendants Philip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore re #53 MOTION to Dismiss (Memorandum in Support) filed by Philip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(BOYLE, WILLIAM)
March 24, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss by Philip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYLE, WILLIAM)
March 24, 2023 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by JEFF NIEMAN. (SHIELDS, KATHRYN)
March 24, 2023 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, ROBERT RICH, JR., MD, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA. (BULLERI, MICHAEL)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 03/10/2023, that the Motion to Intervene as Defendants, (Doc. #29 ), is GRANTED and Intervenors Philip E. Berger, President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate, and Timothy K. Moore, Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives, are permitted to intervene on behalf of the General Assembly and as agents of the State of North Carolina to defend N.C. Gen. Stat. 14-44, 14-45, 14- 45.1, 90-21.82, 90-21.90, and 10A N.C. Admin. Code Subchapter 14E pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24 and LR 7.3 in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenors shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 24, 2023. (Taylor, Abby)
March 10, 2023 Set Answer Deadline: Philip E. Berger answer due 3/24/2023; Timothy K. Moore answer due 3/24/2023. (Taylor, Abby)
March 8, 2023 Filing 49 RESPONSE re #29 MOTION to Intervene filed by JEFF NIEMAN. Replies due by 3/22/2023 (SHIELDS, KATHRYN)
March 7, 2023 Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by Defendants WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, ROBERT RICH, JR., MD, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA re #29 MOTION to Intervene filed by Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger filed by WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, ROBERT RICH, JR., MD, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA. Replies due by 3/21/2023 (BULLERI, MICHAEL)
March 1, 2023 Filing 47 RESPONSE filed by Defendant KODY H. KINSLEY re #29 MOTION to Intervene filed by Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger filed by KODY H. KINSLEY. Replies due by 3/15/2023 (WOOD, MICHAEL)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 03/01/2023, that any additional responses from the remaining defendants to the motion to intervene, (Doc. #29 ), shall be filed on or before Wednesday, March 8, 2023. If no response is filed on or before March 8, 2023, the motion will be decided as an uncontested motion. FURTHER that the movant Intervenors shall file an objection, if any, to the response date of March 24, 2023 as proposed by Plaintiff on or before Wednesday, March 8, 2023. (Taylor, Abby)
February 27, 2023 Filing 45 RESPONSE filed by Defendant JOSHUA H. STEIN re #29 MOTION to Intervene filed by Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger filed by JOSHUA H. STEIN. Replies due by 3/13/2023 (MAJMUNDAR, AMAR)
February 23, 2023 Filing 44 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff AMY BRYANT, MD re #29 MOTION to Intervene filed by Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger filed by AMY BRYANT, MD. Replies due by 3/9/2023 (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 22, 2023 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by JOSHUA H. STEIN. (MAJMUNDAR, AMAR)
February 22, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ERIN MORROW HAWLEY on behalf of Intervenor Defendant Timothy K. Moore ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3501377.) (HAWLEY, ERIN)
February 22, 2023 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by KODY H. KINSLEY. (WOOD, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SARAH G. BOYCE on behalf of Defendant JOSHUA H. STEIN (BOYCE, SARAH)
February 22, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN on behalf of Defendant JOSHUA H. STEIN (BRENNAN, STEPHANIE)
February 22, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney AMAR MAJMUNDAR on behalf of Defendant JOSHUA H. STEIN (MAJMUNDAR, AMAR)
February 21, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MARK LIPPELMANN on behalf of Intervenor Defendant Timothy K. Moore ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3500301.) (LIPPELMANN, MARK)
February 21, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ERICA STEINMILLER-PERDOMO on behalf of Intervenor Defendant Timothy K. Moore ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3500297.) (STEINMILLER-PERDOMO, ERICA)
February 21, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney DENISE M. HARLE on behalf of Intervenor Defendant Timothy K. Moore ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3500295.) (HARLE, DENISE)
February 21, 2023 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BOYLE, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2023 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BOYLE, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2023 Filing 32 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MEMORANDUM re #30 Memorandum (Exhibit 1 - February 13, 2023)(Corrected) by Intervenor Defendant Timothy K. Moore. (BOYLE, WILLIAM) Modified on 2/21/2023 to mark as filed in error per attorney. (Hicks, Samantha)
February 21, 2023 Filing 31 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE by Philip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore re #29 MOTION to Intervene , #30 Memorandum (PROPOSED ORDER) (BOYLE, WILLIAM) Modified on 2/21/2023 to mark as filed in error per attorney. (Hicks, Samantha)
February 21, 2023 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM re #29 MOTION to Intervene (Memorandum in Support) by Intervenor Defendant Timothy K. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 13, 2023, Letter)(BOYLE, WILLIAM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2023) (Hicks, Samantha).
February 21, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Intervene by Philip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer)(BOYLE, WILLIAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2023: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hicks, Samantha).
February 21, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney WILLIAM ELLIS BOYLE on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger (BOYLE, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MICHAEL T. WOOD on behalf of Defendant KODY H. KINSLEY (WOOD, MICHAEL)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for JEFF NIEMAN. Answer due by 3/24/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 02/17/2023. (Brubaker, John)
February 16, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by JEFF NIEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHIELDS, KATHRYN)
February 16, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KATHRYN HICKS SHIELDS on behalf of Defendant JEFF NIEMAN (SHIELDS, KATHRYN)
February 15, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, ROBERT RICH, JR., MD, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BULLERI, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MICHAEL E. BULLERI on behalf of Defendants WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, ROBERT RICH, JR., MD, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA (BULLERI, MICHAEL)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, MD, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, ROBERT RICH, JR., MD, JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, and DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA. Answer due by 3/24/2023. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/15/2023. (Brubaker, John)
February 6, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ROBERT RICH, JR., MD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to W. HOWARD HALL, MD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to KODY H. KINSLEY served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JEFF NIEMAN served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
February 6, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JOSHUA H. STEIN served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (COREY, CHELSEA)
January 30, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Carter, Alexus)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - JEFF NIEMAN, #2 Summons - KODY H. KINSLEY, #3 Summons - MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD, #4 Summons - CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO, #5 Summons - DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA, #6 Summons - JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD, #7 Summons - WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, #8 Summons - W. HOWARD HALL, MD, #9 Summons - SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC, #10 Summons - JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD, #11 Summons - MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE, #12 Summons - MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD, #13 Summons - ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD, #14 Summons - ROBERT RICH, JR., MD) (Carter, Alexus)
January 30, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
January 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JESSICA GREENBAUM on behalf of Plaintiff AMY BRYANT, MD ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3479376.) (GREENBAUM, JESSICA)
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PAUL ALESSIO MEZZINA on behalf of Plaintiff AMY BRYANT, MD ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3479363.) (MEZZINA, PAUL)
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney EVA TEMKIN on behalf of Plaintiff AMY BRYANT, MD ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3479352.) (TEMKIN, EVA)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHELSEA COREY on behalf of Plaintiff AMY BRYANT, MD (COREY, CHELSEA)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY, W. HOWARD HALL, SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, KODY KINSLEY, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JEFF NIEMAN, MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, ROBERT RICH, JR, JOHN W. RUSHER, DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, JOSHUA H. STEIN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3478658.), filed by AMY BRYANT, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet)(COREY, CHELSEA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT v. STEIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY BRYANT, M.D.
Represented By: EVA TEMKIN
Represented By: JESSICA GREENBAUM
Represented By: PAUL ALESSIO MEZZINA
Represented By: CHELSEA COREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA H. STEIN
Represented By: AMAR MAJMUNDAR
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: SARAH G. BOYCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF NIEMAN
Represented By: KATHRYN HICKS SHIELDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KODY H. KINSLEY
Represented By: MICHAEL T. WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAUX R. KILPATRICK, MD, PHD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE M. KHANDELWAL, DO
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVDUTTA G. SANGVAI, MD, MBA
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN W. RUSHER, MD, JD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM M. BRAWLEY
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. HOWARD HALL, MD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARONA Y. JOHNSON, PHD, FNP-BC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL A. PINEIRO, PA-C, MHPE
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELINDA H. PRIVETTE, MD, JD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANURADHA RAO-PATEL, MD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RICH, JR., MD
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BULLERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Timothy K. Moore
Represented By: WILLIAM ELLIS BOYLE
Represented By: DENISE M. HARLE
Represented By: ERICA STEINMILLER-PERDOMO
Represented By: ERIN MORROW HAWLEY
Represented By: MARK LIPPELMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Philip E. Berger
Represented By: WILLIAM ELLIS BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?