Taylor v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Robert W. Taylor
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv00709
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting with modifications 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards the Plaintiff's counsel fees and expenses in the amount of $10,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/17/15. (clc)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 05/12/2015. (jlk)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/15/2013. (eef)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/10/2013. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Taylor
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?