McNeill v. Jhonson et al

Plaintiff: James C. McNeill
Defendant: FNU Jhonson, FNU Grahmn, Jhon Herring, Jackie Yang, FNU Lane, FNU White, Alfred Williams, William Horne and FNU Morrison
Case Number: 3:2018cv00188
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Anson
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the U.S. Marshal shall file a Response within fourteen (14) days of this order informing the Court of the status of its efforts to serve Defendant Johnson. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/20/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 30, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion TO Deem Waiver of Service Filed as Timely as to Alfred Williams. The Court notes that NC DPS has provided several Defendants' full and correct names, which the Clerk of Court is instructed to correct in the record. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to terminate Defendants Horne and Herring as parties to this action. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/29/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 23, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to use reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defendants Johnson and Yang at their home addresses. If the U.S. Marshal is unable to obtain service on Defendants Johnson and Yang, the U.S. Marshal shall inform the Court of the reasonable attempts to obtain service. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/23/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
August 14, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs claims against Grahmn, Jhonson, Lane, Morrison, and Yang, for excessive force and failure to intervene, and against White and Williams for denial of due process survive initial review under 28 U.S.C. § 1 915. The remaining claims are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Plaintiff shall have 14 days in which to file a superseding Amended Complaint in accordance with this Order and all applicable rules and procedures. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amend Complaint within the time limit set by the Court, this action will proceed on the original Complaint, (Doc. No. 1). The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, (Doc. No. 1), and a new Section 1983 complaint form to P laintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Rule 4.3 for Defendants Grahmn, Jhonson, Lane, Morrison, White, Williams and Yang, who are current or former employees of NC DPS.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/13/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeill v. Jhonson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Jhonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Grahmn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhon Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?