Celgard, LLC v. Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Celgard, LLC
Defendant: Dr. Xiaomin Zhang, Global Venture Development, LLC, Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd., Sun Town Technology, Inc., Bin Wang, Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute, Global Venture Development, Inc. and Steven Zhang
Case Number: 3:2020cv00130
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE by Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd., Xiaomin Zhang. Replies due by 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Senior Website Timeline, #2 Exhibit 2, N.D.Cal. Order, #3 Exhibit 3, China Judicial Assistance Information)(Wilkerson, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Gusmer Cole on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cole, Kathryn)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. Response due by 4/28/2020. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/10/2020. (Prichard, Daniel)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #13 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE by Global Venture Development, Inc., Global Venture Development, LLC, Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute, Sun Town Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 4/22/2020 (Wilkerson, David)
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Wilkerson on behalf of Global Venture Development, Inc., Global Venture Development, LLC, Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute, Sun Town Technology, Inc. (Wilkerson, David)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Global Venture Development, Inc. answer due 5/28/2020; Global Venture Development, LLC answer due 5/28/2020; Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute answer due 5/28/2020; Sun Town Technology, Inc. answer due 5/28/2020. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/1/2020. (Prichard, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Celgard, LLC. Replies due by 4/7/2020 (Wilson, J.)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE by Celgard, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wheeler Email Chain, #2 Exhibit California Case DE 17, #3 Exhibit California Case DE 30, #4 Exhibit California Case DE 36, #5 Exhibit Zhang's Charlotte Property, #6 Exhibit USPTO Certified Assignment, #7 Proposed Order)(Wilson, J.)
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE by Celgard, LLC. Responses due by 4/14/2020 (Wilson, J.)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Global Venture Development, Inc., Global Venture Development, LLC, Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute, Sun Town Technology, Inc.. (McDevitt, Larry)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Celgard, LLC. Sun Town Technology, Inc. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Wilson, J.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Celgard, LLC. Xiaomin Zhang served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Wilson, J.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Celgard, LLC. Global Venture Development, Inc. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Wilson, J.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Celgard, LLC. Global Venture Development, LLC served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Wilson, J.)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brl)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mga)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (brl)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd., Xiaomin Zhang. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Xiaomin Zhang)(brl)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(brj)
March 2, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celgard, LLC (Wilson, J.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4408903), filed by Celgard, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Translated Chinese Article from WCLF, #2 Exhibit 2 - NDCA Redacted Trade Secret Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Senior-China Trademark Registration and Application, #4 Exhibit 4 - Text Messages from Senior)(Wilson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celgard, LLC v. Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Xiaomin Zhang
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Venture Development, LLC
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd.
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Town Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bin Wang
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Senior Technology Material Co. Ltd. (US) Research Institute
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Venture Development, Inc.
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Zhang
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celgard, LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Represented By: Kathryn Gusmer Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?