Laws v. Gaston County et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Laws
Defendant: Gaston County, Jeff Myers MD, Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Andrew Matthews MD, Andrew Matthews and Jeff Myers
Case Number: 3:2020cv00398
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 9/15/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/8/2020. (DLG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' motion to dismiss by Lisa Laws. Responses due by 9/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fosbinder, Julie). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Gaston County, Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Andrew Matthews, Jeff Myers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hamilton, Meredith)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Gaston County, Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Andrew Matthews, Jeff Myers. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Hamilton, Meredith). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Gaston County. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (ams)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 8/24/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/22/2020. (DLG)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Gaston County, Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Andrew Matthews, Jeff Myers. (Hamilton, Meredith). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Hawley Poole, Jr on behalf of Gaston County, Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Andrew Matthews, Jeff Myers (Poole, Samuel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton on behalf of Andrew Matthews (Hamilton, Meredith)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton on behalf of Gaston County, Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Jeff Myers (Hamilton, Meredith)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Gaston County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-752. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4579626), filed by Gaston County Emergency Medical Services, Gaston County, Jeff Myers MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to GC and GEMS, #2 Exhibit Summons to Myers and Matthews MD, #3 Exhibit Complaint 2-24-20, #4 Exhibit A&P Summons GC and GEMS, #5 Exhibit A&P Summons Myers and Matthews MD, #6 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit State Notice of Removal)(Poole, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laws v. Gaston County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston County
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Represented By: Samuel Hawley Poole, Jr.
Represented By: Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Myers MD
Represented By: Samuel Hawley Poole, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston County Emergency Medical Services
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Represented By: Samuel Hawley Poole, Jr.
Represented By: Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Matthews MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Matthews
Represented By: Samuel Hawley Poole, Jr.
Represented By: Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Myers
Represented By: Samuel Hawley Poole, Jr.
Represented By: Meredith FitzGibbon Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Laws
Represented By: Julie H. Fosbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?