Burke v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Willie M. Burke
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2012cv00191
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/5/2019. (nvc)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 6/19/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nvc)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File New and Material Evidence; denying defendant's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; Commr's denial of benefits is vacated and remanded pursuant to sentence six of 42 USC 405(g) for rehearing or any other administrative proceedings that may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/7/2015. (cbb)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Pleading and Supporting Brief ( Government SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/21/2013, Plaintiff SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/22/2013); denying 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 9/19/2013. (cbb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie M. Burke
Represented By: Walter B. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?