Gardner v. Town of Mooresville et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Michelle Gardner
Defendant: Town of Mooresville and Russell Clark
Case Number: 5:2022cv00037
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Michelle Gardner. Russell Clark served on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. (Smith, William)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Michelle Gardner. Town of Mooresville served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. (Smith, William)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel by Cindy Michelle Gardner. Responses due by 6/7/2022 (Smith, William). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. All Defendants shall have up to and including June 15, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/9/22. (mga)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Russell Clark, Town of Mooresville. (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Town of Mooresville. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (brl)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Mooresville, Russell Clark with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5514133), filed by Cindy Michelle Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photo, #2 Exhibit Photo)(Smith, William) Modified to correct wording on 4/5/2022 (js).
April 5, 2022 NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:22-cv-143 to 5:22-cv-37. Please use 5:22-cv-37 for all future pleadings. (js)
April 5, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (js)
April 5, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Town of Mooresville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Michelle Gardner
Represented By: William Butler Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Mooresville
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Clark
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?