Allen v. Bond et al
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Allen
Defendant: Monica Bond, Jerry Laws, FNU Harrold, Darren Daves, Chris Beiker, FNU Causby, FNU Davis, FNU Duncan, FNU Honeycutt, FNU Simms, FNU Emid, Brad Williams, John Doe Officers, FNU Moss and FNU Poteat
Case Number: 5:2022cv00134
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Johnnie D. Allen (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mga)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Johnnie D. Allen (mga)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Johnnie D. Allen with partial payment due in the amount of $14.00 and directing correctional facility to transmit payments. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rhf)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjs) Modified on 10/17/2022 to change the date filed from 10/12/2022 to 10/11/2022. (khm)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 9/29/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rhf)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 9/29/2022 (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:22-ct-03356. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/29/2022. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/29/2022.]
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 2 (rth)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Johnnie D. Allen at Central Prison. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/29/2022.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for order of transfer. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/29/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by Johnnie D. Allen. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/29/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Beiker, Monica Bond, C/O Causby, Darren Daves, C/O Davis, Mr. Duncan, Sgt. Emid, Sgt. Harrold, Mr. Honeycutt, John Doe Officers, Jerry Laws, Lt. Moss, Unit Manager Poteat, Ms. Simms and Brad Williams filed by Johnnie D. Allen. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Bond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Harrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Daves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Beiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Causby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Emid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Poteat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?