Decoteau v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt Westin Decoteau
Defendant: Military, National Guard and Federal Bureau of Investigations
Case Number: 1:2020cv00178
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2020 (jb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Complaint filed by Wyatt Westin Decoteau by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 11/17/2020 (jb).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs) Distributed on 10/28/2020 (cjs).
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Wyatt Westin Decoteau. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/26/2020. (mf) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/20/2020 to attach corrected documented) (mf). Distributed on 10/20/2020 (mf).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2020. (BG) Distributed on 10/5/2020 (cjs).
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigations, Military, National Guard (Filing fee IFP) filed by Wyatt Westin Decoteau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 10/1/2020 (mf).
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Wyatt Westin Decoteau. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/15/2020. (mf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wyatt Westin Decoteau. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decoteau v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military, National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt Westin Decoteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?