State of North Dakota v. United States Department of Interior et al
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, Debra Ann Haaland, Bureau of Land Management, Nada Culver and John Mehlhoff
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club and Western Organization of Resource Councils
Case Number: 1:2021cv00148
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus and 7 MOTION for Hearing. Responses due by 9/20/2021. Replies due by 10/4/2021. (CK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus , 7 MOTION for Hearing by Bureau of Land Management, Nada Culver, Debra Ann Haaland, John Mehlhoff, United States Department of Interior. (Sawyer, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sawyer on behalf of All Defendants (Sawyer, Michael)
August 24, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerks Office filed MOTION for Hearing at 7 . (js)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing by State of North Dakota. See Documents #5 and #6 requesting oral argument. (js)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USDC Louisiana Order, #2 Exhibit USDC Louisiana Memorandum Ruling, #3 Exhibit USDC Wyoming Order Dismissing Motions for Preliminary Injunction as Moot, #4 Exhibit Congressional Record - Senate August 5, 2021)(Seby, Paul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by State of North Dakota. (Seby, Paul)
July 21, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Summons Returned Executed as to USA at docket #4 . (mf)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Land Management served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021; Nada Culver served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021; Debra Ann Haaland served on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; John Mehlhoff served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021; United States Department of Interior served on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney Office, District of North Dakota, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bureau of Land Management, #3 Exhibit 3 - Debra Ann Haaland, U.S. Dept. of Interior, #4 Exhibit 4 - John Mehloff, BLM, Montana/Dakota State Office, #5 Exhibit 5 - Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Dept. of Justice, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nada Culver, Acting Director, BLM, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Attorney's Office, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Department of Interior)(mf)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of North Dakota as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney Office, District of North Dakota, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bureau of Land Management, #3 Exhibit 3 - Debra Ann Haaland, US Dept. of Interior, #4 Exhibit 4 - John Mehloff, BLM, Montana/Dakota State Office, #5 Exhibit 5 - Merrick B. Garland, US Dept. of Justice, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nada Culver, Acting Director, BLM, #7 Exhibit 7 - US Attorney's Office, #8 Exhibit 8 - US Department of Interior)(Seby, Paul) Modified on 7/21/2021 to restrict access (mf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, Nada Culver, Debra Ann Haaland, John Mehlhoff, United States Department of Interior, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, Nada Culver, Debra Ann Haaland, John Mehlhoff, United States Department of Interior (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000781) filed by State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of North Dakota v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Paul M. Seby
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nada Culver
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mehlhoff
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?