State of North Dakota v. United States Department of Interior, The et al
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, The, Debra Ann Haaland, Bureau of Land Management, The, Tracy Stone Manning and Sonya Germann
Case Number: 1:2023cv00004
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #21 Notice of Filing of Transcript. Filed in wrong case. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Filer will re-file the Notice of Filing Transcript in case 1:21-cv-148. (jb)
March 3, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #22 Transcript. Filed in wrong case. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Filer will re-file the Transcript in case 1:21-cv-148 (rh)
March 2, 2023 Filing 22 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN WRONG CASE* TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on February 21, 2023, before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronda Colby, Telephone number 701-530-2309. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 3/9/2023. Redaction Request due 3/23/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2023. (rc) Modified on 3/3/2023 to restrict access. (rh)
March 2, 2023 Filing 21 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN WRONG CASE* NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held February 21, 2023 (rc) Modified on 3/3/2023 to restrict access. (jb)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor to Consolidate Cases. (CK)
January 30, 2023 All future pleadings shall be filed in Lead Case No. 1:21-cv-148. (cjs)
January 20, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning, United States Department of Interior, The. (Sawyer, Michael)
January 20, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by State of North Dakota. (Seby, Paul)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 2/9/2023. (CK)
January 18, 2023 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to document: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning, United States Department of Interior, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - January 6 Scoping Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Preliminary Parcel List)(Sawyer, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/19/2023 to correct orientation of pages) NEF Regenerated (mf)
January 18, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning, United States Department of Interior, The. (Sawyer, Michael)
January 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sawyer on behalf of All Defendants (Sawyer, Michael)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Daniel M. Traynor regarding consolidation with case number 1:21-cv-00148. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2023. (CK)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
January 10, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion for Hearing at 11 . (jb)
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of North Dakota. See document #9 . (jb)
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 Declaration of L. Helms, #2 Exhibit #2 DOI Memorandum, #3 Exhibit #3 North Dakota Resource Management Plan and Environmental Impact Statement, #4 Exhibit #4 Northern Great Plans Management ROD EIS December 2020, #5 Exhibit #5 Garrison Dam-Lake Sakakawea Project Oil and Gas Management Plan North Dakota June 2020)(Seby, Paul)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of North Dakota. (Seby, Paul)
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED - ERROR IN DOCUMENT* MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 Declaration of L. Helms, #2 Exhibit #2 DOI Memorandum, #3 Exhibit #3 North Dakota Resource Management Plan and Environmental Impact Statement, #4 Exhibit #4 Northern Great Plans Management ROD EIS December 2020, #5 Exhibit #5 Garrison Dam-Lake Sakakawea Project Oil and Gas Management Plan North Dakota June 2020)(Seby, Paul) Modified on 1/9/2023 to restrict access. (jb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction may contain up to twenty-seven (27) pages. (SK) Modified on 1/9/2023 to correct docket text. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
January 9, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's office restricted access to document per request of filer. (jb)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by State of North Dakota. (Seby, Paul)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (cjs)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by State of North Dakota. (cjs)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to State of North Dakota. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/19/2023. (jb)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning, United States Department of Interior, The, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jb)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone Manning, United States Department of Interior, The (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000669) filed by State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Listing of Available Tracts of Land, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of North Dakota v. United States Department of Interior, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Paul M. Seby
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, The
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, The
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone Manning
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Germann
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?