Smith v. State of North Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Eric Smith
Defendant: State of North Dakota, Scott Griffeth, Cass County of North Dakota, Susan Solheim, Emily Erickson, Lindsey Froelich and Lindsey Froehlich
Case Number: 3:2019cv00232
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (pb) Distributed on 12/19/2019 (pb).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and finding as moot 11 Motion for Hearing by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. (EA) (Main Document 12 replaced to correct typographical error on 12/19/2019) (pb). Distributed on 12/19/2019 (pb). NEF regenerated.
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing by Eric Smith. (See Document #10 .) (as)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION by Eric Smith to #9 Report and Recommendations. (as)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #6 Complaint filed by Eric Smith be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2019). (AS) Distributed on 12/4/2019 (pb).
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT (Exhibit 1 - Partial Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing, 09-2015-CV-1321) to document: #6 Complaint, by Eric Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Referee's Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Amended Judgment, 09-2015-CV-1321, #2 Exhibit 3 - Letter)(pb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT (Article I Declaration of Rights) to document: #6 Complaint, by Eric Smith. (Attachments: #1 Recusal Order filed in Cass County District Court)(as)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Cass County of North Dakota, Emily Erickson, Lindsey Froelich, Scott Griffeth, Susan Solheim, State of North Dakota (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Eric Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Complaint, #2 Register of Actions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pb)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) Distributed on 10/23/2019 (pb).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Judge Peter D. Welte and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Eric Smith. (as)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eric Smith. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/5/2019. (as)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Smith. (Attachments: #1 Bank Transactions/Balance, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Supplemental Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #5 Register of Actions) (as).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State of North Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Griffeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Froelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?