Freeman v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The
Plaintiff: Greg Freeman
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The
Case Number: 3:2021cv00096
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The. (Madia, Ridhi)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The.(Madia, Ridhi)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Doolin on behalf of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The (Doolin, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2021 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Answer due date erroneously set for plaintiff. (mf)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #8 Stipulation for an extension of time. Defendant's answer or other response due by 6/24/2021. (AS)
May 27, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Acknowledgement of Service. Docket text changed to correct party served. (mf)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The. (pb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/9/2021. (pb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The. (Madia, Ridhi)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Luther on behalf of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The (Luther, Kaitlyn)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ridhi D Madia on behalf of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The (Madia, Ridhi)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by Greg Freeman. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (Schneider, McLain) Modified on 5/27/2021 to correct party served (mf).
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Greg Freeman. (js)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Greg Freeman. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/13/2021. (js)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The. (js)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000270) filed by Greg Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Freeman
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: Ridhi D Madia
Represented By: Elizabeth Doolin
Represented By: Kaitlyn Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?