West Virginia, State of et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of, North Dakota, State of, Georgia, State of, Iowa, State of, Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Indiana, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of and Wyoming, State of
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Michael S. Regan, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Michael L. Connor and LTG Scott A. Spellmon
Intervenor Defendant: Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation and White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe
Intervenor: American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council and U.S. Poultry and Egg Association
Case Number: 3:2023cv00032
Filed: February 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #133 RESPONSIVE BRIEF. Clerk's office added link and responsive to clarify docket text. (sc)
April 12, 2023 Filing 133 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re: #129 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION Business Plaintiffs' Response to Federal Defendants' Appeal From the Magistrate Judge's Order Granting Intervention by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Schmidt, Katie) Modified to add link and clarify docket text on 4/13/2023 (sc).
April 12, 2023 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re #115 MOTION for Hearing filed by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Shea, Sonya)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #45 Motion for oral argument. (MM)
April 5, 2023 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Plaintiff States' Reply to Intervenor-Defendants' Response) filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
April 5, 2023 Filing 129 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency re #110 Order on Motion to Intervene (Lee, Hubert)
April 5, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #127 NOTICE Reply to Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority. Clerk's office added link. (sc)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #126 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and granting #126 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Federal Defendants and Defendant Intervenors responses to Plaintiff-Intervenors preliminary injunction motion due 4/26/2023, limited to 25 pages each. Plaintiff-Intervenors combined reply to both responses due 5/10/2023, limited to 16 pages. (MM)
April 4, 2023 Filing 127 NOTICE by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency re: #122 NOTICE Reply to Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (Izfar, Sarah) Modified to add link on 4/5/2023 (sc).
April 4, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #126 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office added a link. (sj)
April 4, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 4/26/2023 Replies due by 5/10/2023. (mf)
April 3, 2023 Filing 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Industry Motion for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Izfar, Sarah) Modified on 4/4/2023 to add link. (sj).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #124 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Howard M. Shanker. (sc)
April 3, 2023 Filing 124 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard M. Shanker (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2640351) by Tohono O'Odham Nation. (Shanker, Howard) Modified to add receipt number on 4/3/2023 (sc).
April 3, 2023 Filing 123 NOTICE (Plaintiff States' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority) by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of re #122 Notice (Other) (Williams, Michael)
April 3, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #122 Notice. Clerk's Office removed 'Exhibit' reference from attachment. (mf)
March 31, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Replies due by 4/5/2023. (mf)
March 31, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Commonwealth of Kentucky v. EPA, No. 3:23-cv-00007 (E.D. Ky.) Order denying motions for preliminary relief)(Shea, Sonya) Modified on 4/3/2023 to remove 'Exhibit' reference from attachment (mf)
March 31, 2023 Filing 121 INTERVENOR ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe.(sj)
March 31, 2023 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Brimmer, Janette)
March 31, 2023 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik J. Wallevand on behalf of North Dakota, State of (Wallevand, Erik)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #87 Motion to Intervene; denying #95 Motion to Strike. (AS)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #116 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Clark Lassiter Hildabrand withdrawn from case. (AS)
March 30, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #114 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's Office added exhibit letters to attachments. (mf)
March 29, 2023 Filing 116 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Tennessee, State of. (Krimm, Gabriel)
March 29, 2023 Filing 115 MOTION for Hearing by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Schmidt, Katie)
March 29, 2023 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Support re #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index and Declarations, #2 Exhibit B 2023 Final WOTUS Rule, #3 Exhibit C 2008 Rapanos Guidance, #4 Exhibit D 1986 WOTUS Rule)(Schmidt, Katie) Modified on 3/30/2023 to add exhibit letters to attachments (mf)
March 29, 2023 Filing 113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Schmidt, Katie)
March 23, 2023 Filing 112 Summons Issued as to Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sj)
March 23, 2023 Filing 111 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by National Cattlemen's Beef Association, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, American Petroleum Institute, American Farm Bureau Federation, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, National Mining Association, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association, Public Lands Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, National Apartment Association, National Pork Producers Council, North Dakota Farm Bureau, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Association of Realtors, Associated General Contractors of America, National Corn Growers Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declarations in Support of Complaint for Declatory and Injuctive Relief)(sj)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #54 Motion to Intervene. (AS)
March 21, 2023 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Brimmer, Janette)
March 21, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #107 Notice (Other) Reply to Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority. Clerk's office linked to correct document. (jb)
March 20, 2023 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION to Intervene filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
March 20, 2023 Filing 107 NOTICE by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency re #104 Notice (Other),, Reply to Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (Izfar, Sarah) Modified on 3/21/2023 to correct link. (jb)
March 20, 2023 Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION to Intervene filed by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Higgins, Elliot)
March 20, 2023 Filing 105 NOTICE by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of re #104 Notice (Other), (Plaintiff States' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Williams, Michael)
March 20, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #56 Memorandum in Support. Clerks Office removed 'exhibit' and duplicate 'exhibit' references from attachments. Re: #104 Notice. Clerk's Office removed 'exhibit' reference from attachment. (mf)
March 19, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Texas v. EPA, No. 3:23-cv-17 (S.D. Tex.) Order granting and denying motions for preliminary relief)(Shea, Sonya) Modified on 3/20/2023 to remove 'exhibit' reference from attachment (mf)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #102 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gabriel Krimm. (jb)
March 17, 2023 Filing 102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gabriel Krimm (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2630290) by Tennessee, State of. (Attachments: #1 List of Admissions)(Krimm, Gabriel) (Main Document 102 replaced on 3/17/2023 in a non-fillable .pdf format) Modified on 3/17/2023 to add receipt number and to remove 'exhibit' reference. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
March 16, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #87 MOTION to Intervene . Responses due by 3/20/2023. Replies due by 3/21/2023. See Order at 101 . (sc)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting in part #96 Motion to Expedite. Any response to the #87 MOTION to Intervene by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, and White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe is due by March 20, 2023. Any reply is due by March 21, 2023. (AS)
March 15, 2023 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION to Expedite Applicant-Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Accelerate Briefing and Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene filed by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Brimmer, Janette)
March 14, 2023 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Expedite Applicant-Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Accelerate Briefing and Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
March 14, 2023 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
March 14, 2023 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re #95 MOTION to Strike #93 Response to Motion filed by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Brimmer, Janette)
March 14, 2023 Filing 96 MOTION to Expedite Applicant-Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Accelerate Briefing and Expedite Consideration of Motion to Intervene by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Brimmer, Janette)
March 13, 2023 Filing 95 MOTION to Strike #93 Response to Motion by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Williams, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Oral Argument re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
March 10, 2023 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Brimmer, Janette)
March 10, 2023 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Text of 1986 Regulations, #2 Exhibit 2: Rapanos Guidance, #3 Exhibit 3: History of the Effects of Litigation, #4 Exhibit 4: 2023 Rule Regulatory Text, #5 Exhibit 5: Econ. Analysis Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6: 2023 Rule Response to Comments Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7: Corps Guidance Letter Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 8: Corps Impact Analysis, #9 Exhibit 9: 2015 Rule Regulatory Text, #10 Exhibit 10: Nat'l Stone Sand Gravel Ass'n Public Comments, #11 Exhibit 11: Waters Advocacy Coalition Public Comments)(Izfar, Sarah)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David L. Henkin. (mf)
March 10, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice David L. Henkin. Clerk's Office added filers (Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation). (cjs)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying #83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Opposition, and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (JO) (Main Document 90 replaced on 3/9/2023 to correct error in document) NEF Regenerated (mf)
March 9, 2023 Filing 89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David L. Henkin (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2623748) by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation. (Henkin, David) Modified on 3/9/2023 to add receipt number (mf) Modified on 3/10/2023 to add filers (cjs).
March 9, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #86 Reply to Response. Clerk's Office removed 'exhibit' reference from attachment. (mf)
March 8, 2023 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Support re #87 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Brimmer, Janette)
March 8, 2023 Filing 87 MOTION to Intervene by Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Rappahannock Tribe, Tohono O'Odham Nation, White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer, #2 Declaration of Chief Gary Harrison, #3 Declaration of Chief G. Anne Richardson, #4 Declaration of Chief Ned Norris, Jr., #5 Declaration of Chairman Michael Fairbanks)(Brimmer, Janette)
March 8, 2023 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Intervene of Proposed Business Intervenors filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Attachments: #1 Department of Education v. Brown Oral Argument Transcript)(Schmidt, Katie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/9/2023 to remove overlapping headers on attachment) NEF Regenerated. Modified on 3/9/2023 to remove 'exhibit' reference from attachment (mf)
March 8, 2023 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Opposition, As AppropriateMOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , As Appropriate filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence)(Williams, Michael)
March 8, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Motion for Leave to File Document, Motion to File Excess Pages. Clerk's Office added links. (cjs)
March 7, 2023 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION for Oral Argument re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Higgins, Elliot)
March 7, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Opposition, As Appropriate, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , As Appropriate re #44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction #54 Motion to Intervene by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Higgins, Elliot) Modified on 3/8/2023 to add links (cjs).
March 4, 2023 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION to Intervene of Proposed Business Intervenors filed by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2023 Rule Text, #2 Exhibit B - S.D. Tex. Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - S.D. Tex. Preliminary Injunction Motion, #4 Exhibit D - S.D. Tex. Declarations, #5 Exhibit E - Econ. Analysis Excerpts)(Higgins, Elliot) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/6/2023 to remove overlapping filing headers) (cjs). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/6/2023 to remove overlapping filing headers) (cjs). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/6/2023 to remove overlapping filing headers) (cjs). Regenerated on 3/6/2023 (cjs).
March 2, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #81 Notice. Clerk's Office removed 'exhibit' reference. (mf)
March 1, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Notice of Filing of Certified Index to the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Certified Index of Administrative Record)(Izfar, Sarah) Modified on 3/2/2023 to remove 'exhibit' reference (mf)
February 28, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Short on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Short, Tracy)
February 27, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Doyle on behalf of All Defendants (Doyle, Andrew)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #73 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and Exceed Page Limitations. Defendants' response to #44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 3/10/2023 and shall be limited to 30 pages. Plaintiffs' reply is due by 3/14/2023 and shall be limited to 10 pages. (KT)
February 27, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 3/10/2023 Replies due by 3/14/2023. See Text Only Order at 78 . (sj)
February 26, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Higgins on behalf of All Defendants (Higgins, Elliot)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal remains assigned, as referral judge, to the case. (pb)
February 24, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Brungard on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Brungard, Morgan)
February 24, 2023 Filing 74 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Virginia, State of. (sj)
February 24, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule/Exceed Page Limits re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Hubert)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Chief Judge Peter D. Welte recused. (EA)
February 23, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya Shea on behalf of All Defendants (Shea, Sonya)
February 23, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth B Murrill on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Murrill, Elizabeth)
February 23, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Scott St. John on behalf of Louisiana, State of (St. John, Joseph)
February 23, 2023 Filing 68 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Mississippi, State of. (sj)
February 23, 2023 Filing 67 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Alabama, State of. (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Izfar on behalf of All Defendants (Izfar, Sarah)
February 22, 2023 Filing 65 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Florida, State of. (pb)
February 22, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Divine on behalf of Missouri, State of (Divine, Joshua)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James B. Danford; granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy S. Bishop; granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brett E. Legner (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff P. Johnson on behalf of Missouri, State of (Johnson, Jeff)
February 22, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett E. Legner (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2612875) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Legner, Brett) Modified on 2/22/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy S. Bishop (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2612873) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Bishop, Timothy) Modified on 2/22/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Hubert T. Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Hubert)
February 22, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Danford, Jr. (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2612855) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Danford, James) Modified on 2/22/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Schmidt, Katie)
February 22, 2023 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Intervene of Proposed Business Intervenors filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit A to Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit B to Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Schmidt, Katie) Modified on 3/20/2023 to remove 'exhibit' and duplicate 'exhibit' references from attachments (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 55 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Intervene of Proposed Business Intervenors filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Bertsch, Katie) Modified to restrict access per request of filer on 2/22/2023 (pb).
February 22, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Intervene of Proposed Business Intervenors by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Bertsch, Katie)
February 22, 2023 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Spellmon Proof of Service, #2 Connor Proof of Service, #3 Regan Proof of Service, #4 EPA Proof of Service)(Williams, Michael) Modified to correct filers on 2/22/2023 (pb).
February 22, 2023 Filing 52 *RESTRICTED - WRONG USER LOGIN* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Danford, Jr. (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Bertsch, Katie) Modified on 2/22/2023 to restrict access (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 51 *RESTRICTED - WRONG USER LOGIN* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy S. Bishop (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Bertsch, Katie) Modified on 2/22/2023 to restrict access (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 50 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by New Hampshire, State of. (pb)
February 22, 2023 Filing 49 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Indiana, State of. (pb)
February 22, 2023 Filing 48 *RESTRICTED - WRONG USER LOGIN* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett E. Legner (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Associated General Contractors of America, Cass County Farm Bureau, Leading Builders of America, National Apartment Association, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, National Association of Realtors, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association, North Dakota Farm Bureau, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry and Egg Association. (Bertsch, Katie) Modified on 2/22/2023 to restrict access (mf)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (AS)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin M. Flowers. (mf)
February 22, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #55 MEMORANDUM in Support. Filed in error. Clerk's Office restricted access per request of filer. Filer will refile corrected document with all supporting attachments. (pb)
February 21, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Oral Argument re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit A - Decl. of Randy Bates, #3 Exhibit B- Decl. of Anna Truszczynski, #4 Exhibit C- Decl. of Scott Marler, #5 Exhibit D - Decl. of Lori McDaniel, #6 Exhibit E -Decl. of Mike Naig, #7 Exhibit F - Decl. of Duane DeKrey, #8 Exhibit G - Decl. of L. David Glatt, #9 Exhibit H - Decl. of Douglas Goehring, #10 Exhibit I - Decl. of Andrea Travnicek, #11 Exhibit J - Decl. of Jason Foster)(Williams, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin L. Matheny. (sc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Christmas on behalf of Florida, State of (Christmas, Natalie)
February 21, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin L. Matheny (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2611857) by Mississippi, State of. (Matheny, Justin) Modified to add receipt number on 2/21/2023 (sc).
February 21, 2023 Filing 40 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Utah, State of. (sc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by James Emory Smith, Jr on behalf of South Carolina, State of (Smith, James)
February 21, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin M. Flowers (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2611759) by Ohio, State of. (Flowers, Benjamin) Modified on 2/21/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 21, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Molnar Fisher on behalf of Indiana, State of (Fisher, Thomas)
February 21, 2023 Filing 36 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by South Dakota, State of. (sc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 35 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Wyoming, State of. (sc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Ohio, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Williams, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Filing 33 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Montana, State of. (sc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 32 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Missouri, State of. (sc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 31 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Georgia, State of. (pb)
February 21, 2023 Filing 30 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kansas, State of. (pb)
February 17, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk's Office restricted access to entry as it was filed in error; duplicate filing. (sj)
February 17, 2023 Filing 29 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Nebraska, State of. (sj)
February 17, 2023 Filing 28 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Iowa, State of. (sc)
February 17, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon F. Chase on behalf of New Hampshire, State of (Chase, Brandon)
February 17, 2023 Filing 26 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Alaska, State of. (sj)
February 17, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark Lassiter Hildabrand on behalf of Tennessee, State of (Hildabrand, Clark)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 *RESTRICTED - FILER IN ERROR* (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (sj) Modified on 2/17/2023 to restrict access. (sj).
February 17, 2023 Filing 23 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oklahoma, State of. (sj)
February 16, 2023 Filing 22 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by North Dakota, State of. (pb)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(pb)
February 16, 2023 Filing 20 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by West Virginia, State of. (pb)
February 16, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Wyoming, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Virginia, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Utah, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to South Dakota, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Oklahoma, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Nebraska, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Montana, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Missouri, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Louisiana, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kansas, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Arkansas, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alaska, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alabama, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Iowa, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Georgia, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to North Dakota, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to West Virginia, State of. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/2/2023. (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sc)
February 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael L. Connor, Michael S. Regan, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000319) filed by Ohio, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Louisiana, State of, West Virginia, State of, Florida, State of, Nebraska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Alabama, State of, Wyoming, State of, Alaska, State of, Kansas, State of, South Dakota, State of, Georgia, State of, North Dakota, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, Mississippi, State of, Virginia, State of, Iowa, State of, Indiana, State of. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Waters of the United States Rule C1)(sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Virginia, State of et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: Michael Ray Williams
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Jennifer L. Verleger
Represented By: Margaret I. Olson
Represented By: Drew H. Wrigley
Represented By: Erik J. Wallevand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia, State of
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Eric H Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Edmund G. LaCour, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Represented By: David Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Jesse Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth B Murrill
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Morgan Brungard
Represented By: Tracy Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi, State of
Represented By: Justin L. Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Jeff P. Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Represented By: Eric Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Brandon F. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio, State of
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Garry M. Gaskins, II
Represented By: Jennifer L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota, State of
Represented By: Charles D. McGuigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee, State of
Represented By: Gabriel Krimm
Represented By: Clark Lassiter Hildabrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah, State of
Represented By: Melissa Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia, State of
Represented By: Martin Jordan Minot
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Represented By: Andrew N. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Travis Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Represented By: Hubert T. Lee
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Represented By: Andrew J. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Represented By: Andrew J. Doyle
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Represented By: Hubert T. Lee
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Andrew J. Doyle
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Represented By: Hubert T. Lee
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. Doyle
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Represented By: Hubert T. Lee
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTG Scott A. Spellmon
Represented By: Sarah Izfar
Represented By: Andrew J. Doyle
Represented By: Elliot Higgins
Represented By: Hubert T. Lee
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Chickaloon Village Traditional Council
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Rappahannock Tribe
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Tohono O'Odham Nation
Represented By: Howard Marc Shanker
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe
Represented By: David Lane Henkin
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Road and Transportation Builders Association
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Associated General Contractors of America
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cass County Farm Bureau
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Leading Builders of America
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Apartment Association
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Association of Home Builders of the United States
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Association of Realtors
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Cattlemen's Beef Association
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Corn Growers Association
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Mining Association
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Multifamily Housing Council
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Pork Producers Council
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Stone, Sand and Gravel Association
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: North Dakota Farm Bureau
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Public Lands Council
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: U.S. Poultry and Egg Association
Represented By: Timothy S Bishop
Represented By: James Brian Danford, Jr
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Represented By: Katie J Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?