Williams v. Hamm & Phillips Service Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Malcolm Williams
Defendant: Hamm & Phillips Service Company, Inc. and Mark Miedema
Case Number: 4:2013cv00079
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2014 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
December 11, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 16 Motion to Compel. (KT)
February 6, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew G. Pletcher. (KT)
August 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hamm & Phillips Service Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Williams
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamm & Phillips Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W. Durick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Miedema
Represented By: Patrick W. Durick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.