Wilson et al v. Prime Source Healthcare Of Ohio, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Henrietta Wilson, Latashia Clifton, Kendra Bhagmath, Megan Lafaire, Aries Fisk, Latasha Morton, Teyonna Melton and Juanita Nicholson
Defendant: Prime Source Healthcare Of Ohio, Inc, Prime Source Healthcare Systems, Inc and David Fleming
Case Number: 1:2016cv01298
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/14/18 approving the parties' proposed settlement agreement. Further, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction to resolve any further disputes that arise concerning this settlement agreement. (Related Doc. 288 ) (D,MA)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/10/18. The Court orders defendants to pay plaintiffs' attorney's fees totaling $21,867.50. (Related Doc. 287 ) (D,MA)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/2/18. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants plaintiffs' motion to enforce the settlement. The Court denies defendants' motion to approve the settlement, denies both plaintiffs' and defendants' motions to file the settlement under seal, denies plaintiffs' motion to hold that the settlement terms are no longer confidential, and denies plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. The parties are ord ered to file a settlement agreement comporting with this decision within 14 days of the date of this order. The Court also orders plaintiffs to file an accounting of their attorney's fees related to their motion to enforce the settlement and a calculation of prejudgment interest within 14 days of the date of this order. (Related Docs. 270 , 271 , 273 , 274 , and 281 ) (D,MA)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/17/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies defendants' motions to compel plaintiff Wilson's medical records, to bifurcate the trial, and to enter a show cause order. The Court grants defendants' motion to withdraw its prior motion for reconsideration. (Related Docs. 158 , 181 , 182 , 190 , and 192 ) (D,MA)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/5/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants in part and denies in part the parties' motions for summary judgment. The Court also denies plaintiffs' motion to s trike, grants plaintiffs' motions to submit the Department of Labor audit and deposition of Mario Utreras as evidence, and orders an evidentiary hearing to take place on 7/21/17 at 12:00 p.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Docs. 100 , 104 , 141 , 146 , 155 , 160 ) (D,MA)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/22/17 denying the parties' proposed protective order for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. 73 ) (D,MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Prime Source Healthcare Of Ohio, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Wilson
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latashia Clifton
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Bhagmath
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Lafaire
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aries Fisk
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Morton
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teyonna Melton
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Nicholson
Represented By: Brian D. Spitz
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Source Healthcare Of Ohio, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Source Healthcare Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?