Dayton v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: City Of Dayton
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., McKesson Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Cardinal Health Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Actavis Inc, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, Mylan Specialty, L.P., Richard S. Sackler, Anda, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Mylan Pharms, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Miami-Luken, Inc., west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc., Theresa Sackler, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, H.D. Smith, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, John N. Kapoor, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017op45032
Filed: December 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney David M. Cuppage and Margaret M. Metzinger and adding attorney Scott D. Simpkins filed by on behalf of City Of Dayton. (Simpkins, Scott)
March 26, 2019 Filing 52 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 51 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. k/n/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan Specialty, L.P.; Mylan Pharms, Inc.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreen Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; Miami-Luken, Inc.; Rite Aid Corp.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.; The Kroger Co.; H.D. Smith. Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; John N. Kapoor; Insys Therapeutics, Inc.; Mallinckrodt PLC; Mallinckrodt LLC; Noramco, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; and Wal-Mart, Inc.. Filed by City Of Dayton. (Badala, Salvatore)
October 30, 2018 Filing 50 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of City Of Dayton. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 25, 2018 Filing 49 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of City Of Dayton. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 23, 2018 Filing 48 Notice of Withdrawal of G. Karl Fanter as Counsel filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fanter, G.)
January 11, 2018 Filing 46 Attorney Appearance by Michael W. Czack filed by on behalf of City Of Dayton. (Czack, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Filing 45 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 3:17-cv-00229. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2017 Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 44 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804)- IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION: All matters noted from this order pertaining to the Southern District of Ohio are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/5/2017; certified by the Northern District of Ohio on 12/12/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 43 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION - A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court. You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/5/2017. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Stay pending action by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 11-13-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
November 10, 2017 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Daloia, Andrea) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE by Plaintiff City Of Dayton re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Staubus v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., 2:17-cv-122 (E.D. Tenn. Oct. 20, 2017)) (Badala, Salvatore) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Allergan PLC. (Daloia, Andrea) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE by Defendants Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC /Consent to Notice of Removal (Daloia, Andrea) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion -It is ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion of Defendant Allergan Finance LLC to Stay Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the date by which Defendant Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Allergan Finance) shall answer, move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby stayed pending a final determination of removal; and it is further ORDERED that Allergan Finance shall have sixty (60) days after the date of the final determination of removal by which to answer, move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10-13-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of Recent Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined MDL Motion In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation) (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Date by which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Greenwell, Stacey) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea B Daloia for Defendant Actavis, Inc. (Daloia, Andrea) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert J Lucas for Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Lucas, Albert) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Martin L. Roth. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 09/26/2017. (jmb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy W. Knapp. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/26/2017. (jmb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer G. Levy. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/26/2017. (jmb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Welch. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/26/17. (jmb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey A Greenwell for Defendant Actavis, Inc. (Greenwell, Stacey) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC for Actavis, Inc... (Mitchell, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6134422) of Timothy W. Knapp by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Mitchell, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6134413) of Martin L. Roth by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Mitchell, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6134406) of Jennifer G. Levy by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Mitchell, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6134389) of Donna M. Welch by Defendant Actavis, Inc.. (Mitchell, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean O. Morris. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/20/17. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6128903) of Sean O. Morris by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 CA Certificate of Good Standing) (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Fitzgerald; granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R.Ryan Stoll; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. NapoliJoseph L. Ciaccio, and Salvatore C. Badala. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/14/2017. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6120245) of Paul J. Napoli, Joseph L. Ciaccio, Salvatore C. Badala by Plaintiff City Of Dayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Napoli Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2- Ciaccio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3- Badala Certificate of Good Standing) (Climaco, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6119779) of R. Ryan Stoll by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6119738) of Patrick Fitzgerald by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Buckley, Daniel) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Tarney for Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster (Tarney, Tyler) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Coleman, Tera) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tinos Diamantatos ; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven Reed. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/28/17. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - The #17 Unopposed Motion of Dr. Russell Portenoy to Stay the Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the date by which Dr. Russell Portenoy shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby stayed pending a final determination of removal; and it is further ORDERED that Dr. Russell Portenoy shall have seventy-five (75) days after the final determination of removal by which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-28-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6098045) of Steven A. Reed by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Yanchar, Georgia) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6098010) of Tinos Diamantatos by Defendants Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Yanchar, Georgia) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION Stay Date to Respond to Complaint and for Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal by Defendant Russell Portenoy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Scheaf, O) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay; granting #9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8-24-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles Lifland. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/23/17. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #3 Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, the Date by Which to Respond to Complaint and for Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal by Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Hyzak, Daniel) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Lewis, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6091461) of Charles C. Lifland by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B, Proposed Order) (Lewis, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Moore for Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster (Moore, Bruce) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Hyzak for Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster (Hyzak, Daniel) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ingo Sprie, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 8/14/2017. (pb) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6076592) of Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. by Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 NY Certificate of Good Standing) (Coleman, Tera) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff City Of Dayton. (Climaco, John) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Date By Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal by Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coleman, Tera) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-24-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION that McKesson Corporation not be Required to Respond to Complaint in this Court by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-19-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION that Cardinal Health, Inc. not be Required to Respond to Complaint in this Court by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Murray, Joseph) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Motion -McKesson Corp. is granted until 9/8/2017 to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-17-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Perry Fine answer due 9/8/2017; Scott Fishman answer due 9/8/2017; Lynn Webster answer due 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-17-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Russell Portenoy answer due 9/5/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 7-17-2017. (de) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 9/8/2017. by Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Brunton, Gregory) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION of Defendant McKesson that it not be Required to Respond to Complaint in this Court by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Montgomery County Order) (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, New date requested 9/5/2017. by Defendant Russell Portenoy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rauch, Jordan) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 10, 2017 If case is to be referred it will be Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. (kma) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 3 ( Copy of)COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants. ( Originally filed in the Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas on June 5, 2017, under case number 2017 CV 02647. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (kma) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Endo Health Solutions Inc. for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Fanter, G.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017 CV 02647 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6030386), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Fanter, G.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dayton v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Jerome Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Steven Andrew Reed
Represented By: Georgia Yanchar
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Tera Nichole Coleman
Represented By: G. Karl Fanter
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Represented By: O. Judson Scheaf, III
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Albert J. Lucas
Represented By: Steven Andrew Reed
Represented By: Georgia Yanchar
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Georgia K.E. Yanchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jerome Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole Schwartz Rendon
Represented By: Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Represented By: Tera Nichole Coleman
Represented By: G. Karl Fanter
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Christine M. Haaker
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Q. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jerome Buckley
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Patrick Fitzgerald
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Stacey A. Greenwell
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Represented By: Christine M. Haaker
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Dayton
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: John C. Musto
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Michael W. Czack
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?