City of Tacoma v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Tacoma
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., John and Jane Does, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Walmart, Inc., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC., Jonathan D. Sackler, Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS RX Services, Inc. and CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017op45047
Filed: December 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 50 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) CVS Health Corporation; CVS Pharmacy Inc.; CVS RX Services, Inc.; and Rite Aid Corporation. Filed by City of Tacoma. (Ko, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 49 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; and Rhodes Technologies. Filed by City of Tacoma. (Ko, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 48 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 15, 2019 Filing 47 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., John and Jane Does, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, SpecGX LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGX LLC; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC; Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co; & Walmart, Inc.. Filed by City of Tacoma. (Ko, David)
August 2, 2018 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Mallinckrodt, LLC waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Loeser, Derek)
July 18, 2018 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Loeser, Derek)
July 18, 2018 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 7/9/2018, answer due 9/7/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 6/29/2018, answer due 8/28/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 6/29/2017, answer due 8/28/2017 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 7/9/2018, answer due 9/7/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Sarko, Lynn)
July 5, 2018 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Tacoma. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of City of Tacoma (Loeser, Derek)
May 25, 2018 Filing 34 First Amended complaint against John and Jane Does, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation and adding new party defendant(s) Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Filed by City of Tacoma. (Loeser, Derek)
December 13, 2017 Filing 33 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western. Case number 3:17-cv-05737. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2017 Filing 32 MDL 2804 TRANSFER ORDER in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; District of Northern Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn Robbs Bilanko on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Bilanko, Carolyn) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Curt Roy Hineline on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Hineline, Curt) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY AND FOR RELIEF FROM DEADLINES. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to answer or respond to the Complaint shall be 30 days after a final decision by the JPML on the pending MDL Motion. If this action is subject to transfer following thedecision of the JPML, the deadlines for Defendants' answers or responses to the Complaint shall then be determined by the transferee court. It is further ORDERED that any and all dates or deadlines arising before the deadline forDefendants' answers or responses to the Complaint, if any are to be filed in this action, are suspended until after Defendants answers or responses to the complaint are filed. Defendants' Motion to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines (Dkt. #27 ) is moot. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
November 15, 2017 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties re #27 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/17/2017, (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney R. Ryan Stoll for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick J Fitzgerald for Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma, L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Calfo, Angelo) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY R. Ryan Stoll FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5060556 (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5060537 (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Pursuant to the foregoing stipulation, the deadline for all Defendants to answer or respond to the Complaint is extended to December 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Noting Date 10/19/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Calfo, Angelo) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion Extending Deadline for the Purdue Defendants to answer or respond to the Complaint. Deadline extended to 12/11/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 13, 2017 Attorneys Ronald J Friedman and Andrew W. Durland for Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. added per #15 Notice of Appearance. (KB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION Extending Deadline for Purdue Defendants to Answer or Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Noting Date 10/13/2017, (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Dean Adams on behalf of Defendants Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Adams, Thomas) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/28/2017 (Ko, David) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Purdue Pharma, Inc. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 10, 2017 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Purdue Pharma, L.P. on 10/2/2017 (Ko, David) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings. All future documents filed in this case must bear cause numbers ending in RSM and must bear the new Judges name in the upper right hand corner of the document. Signed by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Amended Schedule of Actions, Amended Proof of Service and Supplemental Proof of Service - filed with the MDL Panel (MDL 17-P-54, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation) (PM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer of Actions - filed with the MDL Panel (MDL 17-P-54, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation). (PM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/29/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/6/2017, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/13/2017. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/13/2017. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 14, 2017 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., and John and Jane Does. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5015686) Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party City of Tacoma(pty:pla), filed by City of Tacoma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/13/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Tacoma v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Tacoma
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Christopher D. Bacha
Represented By: William Cody Fosbre
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Angelo J. Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Ronald J. Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Angelo J. Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald J. Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Ronald J. Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald J. Friedman
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: R. Ryan Stoll
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?