County of Trumbull v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Plaintiff: County of Trumbull
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Perry Fine, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Miami-Luken, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Lynn Webster, CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Anda, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, HBC Service Company, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc., Theresa Sackler, Value Drug Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, CVS Indiana LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., John N. Kapoor, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., WSE Investment LLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Wal-Mart, Inc., Eckerd Corporation D/B/A Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center, WSE Management, LLC, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS RX Services, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., Rite Aid Corp., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Walmart Inc., P.F. Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Eckerd Corporation doing business as Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center and Walmart Stores Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Ohio CVS Stores, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5000
Case Number: 1:2018op45079
Filed: January 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 116 Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Mistrial Based on Closing Arguments filed by Plaintiff. (Weinberger, Peter)
November 16, 2021 Filing 115 Joint Motion for Mistrial Based on Closing Argument filed by Defendants (Majoras, John)
November 15, 2021 Filing 114 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State of Oklahoma v. Johnson & Johnson, #2 Exhibit B - State of Oklahoma v. Johnson & Johnson, #3 Exhibit C - State of California v. Purdue) Related document(s) #106 .(Majoras, John)
November 14, 2021 Filing 113 Response To Defendants' November 12, 2021 Submission on Jury Instructions and Verdict Form filed by Plaintiff. (Weinberger, Peter)
November 8, 2021 Filing 112 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(A) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
November 8, 2021 Filing 111 Response to Defendants' Objections to the Court's Final Jury Instructions filed by Plaintiff. (Weinberger, Peter)
November 8, 2021 Filing 110 Response to CVS Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 29, 2021 Filing 109 Motion for judgment as a matter of law Under Rule 50(a) filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Jury Instructions)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
October 29, 2021 Filing 108 Motion for judgment as a matter of law CVS Defendants' Rule 50(a) Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., 3rd Party Plaintiff CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Delinsky, Eric)
October 29, 2021 Filing 107 Walmart Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(a) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Walmart Inc.. Related document(s) #106 .(Majoras, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 106 Defendants' Joint Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(a) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Walmart Inc.. (Majoras, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 105 Response to #104 Motion to Admit Processed ARCOS Data and Defendants' Dispensing Data filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 26, 2021 Filing 104 Motion to Admit Processed ARCOS Data and Defendants' Dispensing Data filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 26, 2021 Filing 103 Opposition to Giant Eagle's Bench Memorandum Regarding Incidents of Employee Theft filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 26, 2021 Filing 102 SEALED Document:Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence of IMS Contracts filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #101 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CVS-MDLT1-000119294, #2 Exhibit B - CVS-MDLT1-000119318, #3 Exhibit C - CVS-MDLT1-000119340, #4 Exhibit D - CVS-MDLT1-000119346, #5 Exhibit E - IQVIA Records Declaration)(Weinberger, Peter)
October 26, 2021 Filing 101 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to File Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence of IMS Contracts Under Seal (Related Doc #100 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/26/21.(P,R)
October 26, 2021 Filing 100 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence of IMS Contracts Under Seal filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 25, 2021 Filing 99 Counterproposal for Jury Instructions on Applicable CSA Duties filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions)(Weinberger, Peter)
October 24, 2021 Filing 98 Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Mistrial Due to Juror Misconduct (Dkt. 4068) and Defendants HBC Service Company and Giant Eagle, Inc.'s Motion for Mistrial (Dkt. 4067) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 21, 2021 Filing 97 Proposed Limiting Instruction on Settlements Offered in Response to Defendants' Proposal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 21, 2021 Filing 96 Opposition to CVS's Objection to Certain Rulings on Deposition Designations and Exhibits by the Special Master filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 20, 2021 Filing 95 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Preclude Testimony from Nicole McCallion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo Transcript Excerpt)(Weinberger, Peter)
October 19, 2021 Filing 94 Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Preclude Testimony from Plaintiffs' Fact Witnesses about Prescription Opioids being a "Gateway" to Other Drug Use filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Caraway Transcript Excerpt at 37:10-12, #2 Exhibit B - Caraway Transcript Excerpt at 40:2-41:2, #3 Exhibit C - Fraser Transcript Excerpt at 34:8-11, #4 Exhibit D - Fraser Transcript Excerpt at 82:12-14)(Weinberger, Peter)
October 19, 2021 Filing 93 Bench Brief Regarding Admissibility of Investigations About Which Captain Villanueva Has Personal Knowledge filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Douglas Winland Criminal Case)(Weinberger, Peter)
October 15, 2021 Filing 92 Motion in limine to Exclude any Reference to Judicial Opinions from Non-Opioid Cases Discussing Dr. Craig McCann filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 13, 2021 Filing 91 Bench Brief Regarding Admissibility of Exhibit P-15962 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 12, 2021 Filing 90 Opposition to (I) CVS's Motion to Limit Testimony of Joseph Rannazzisi on CVS-Specific Issues and to Exclude Related Exhibits and (II) Walgreens' Motion to Limit Testimony of Joseph Rannaazzisi on Walgreens-Specific Issues filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 7, 2021 Filing 89 Declaration of Linda Singer filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #88 .(Weinberger, Peter)
October 6, 2021 Filing 88 Emergency Motion to Videotape Trial Testimony of DEA Witness Joseph Rannazzisi to Preserve it for Potential Use at Future Opioids Trials filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weinberger, Peter)
October 1, 2021 Filing 87 Corrected Order regarding Admissibility of Prior Settlement Agreements. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/1/2021. (W,CM)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order regarding Admissibility of Prior Settlement Agreements. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/1/2021. (W,CM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 85 Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Brian Joyce by personal service on 9.27.21 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weinberger, Peter)
September 27, 2021 Filing 84 Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motions for Reconsideration Regarding Admissibility of Settlements filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weinberger, Peter)
September 22, 2021 Filing 83 Notice of Service of Subpoena upon George Chunderlik by personal service on 9.21.21 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
September 21, 2021 Filing 82 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Rite Aid Defendants filed by Plaintiff. (Gallucci, Frank)
September 17, 2021 Filing 81 Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part #55 Pharmacy Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Anna Lembke. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/17/21. (P,R)
September 17, 2021 Filing 80 Stipulation & Order of dismissal of Rite Aid defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/17/21. (P,R)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) regarding Defendants' Motion To Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Based on Track One Arguments (Related Doc #36 ). The motion is denied, for the reasons stated in the Court's orders addressing all of the parties' Daubert motions filed in Track One, which are incorporated by reference. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/17/21.(P,R)
September 13, 2021 Filing 79 Opinion and Order denying #39 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21. (P,R)
September 13, 2021 Filing 78 Opinion and Order denying #42 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Caleb Alexander. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21. (P,R)
September 13, 2021 Filing 77 Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carmen Catizone. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21. (P,R)
September 13, 2021 Filing 76 Opinion and Order Denying #49 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Katherine Keyes. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21. (P,R)
September 10, 2021 Filing 75 SEALED Document:Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine Reply Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #46 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weinberger, Peter)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief to Omnibus Motion in Limine and Related Exhibits Under Seal (Related Doc #74 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/10/2021.(W,CM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 74 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief to Omnibus Motion in Limine and Related Exhibits Under Seal filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
September 8, 2021 Filing 73 Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Y. Ryan filed by on behalf of Giant Eagle Inc.. (Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2021 Filing 72 Opinion and Order granting in part Defendant's Motion to Exclude Opinions of James Rafalski (Related document #36 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/7/2021. (W,CM)
September 2, 2021 Filing 71 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal (Related Doc #70 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/2/2021.(W,CM)
September 1, 2021 Filing 70 Motion for Leave to File Certain Responses to Defendants' Motions in Limine and Related Exhibits Under Seal filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
September 1, 2021 Filing 69 Notice of Service of Pharmacy Defendants' Motion To Exclude Anna Lembke filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pharmacy Defendants' Motion To Exclude Anna Lembke, #2 Pharmacy Defendants' Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Exclude Anna Lembke, #3 Declaration of Kelly Moore, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit A - Summary Sheet)(Delinsky, Eric)
September 1, 2021 Filing 68 Notice of Service of Pharmacy Defendants' Motion To Exclude Carmen Catizone filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pharmacy Defendants' Motion To Exclude Carmen Catizone, #2 Pharmacy Defendants' Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Exclude Carmen Catizone, #3 Declaration of Kelly Moore, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit A - Summary Sheet)(Delinsky, Eric)
September 1, 2021 Filing 67 Opinion and Order denying #40 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/1/21. (P,R)
August 31, 2021 Filing 66 Opinion and Order denying #37 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the opinions and testimony of Prof. Daniel C. Malone. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/31/21. (P,R)
August 30, 2021 Filing 65 Opposition to Certain Pharmacy Defendants' Objection to the Special Master's Ruling re The Track Three Deposition of Joseph Rannazzisi filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 27, 2021 Filing 64 Notice of Service of Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Livingston, Scott)
August 27, 2021 Filing 63 Notice of Service of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 27, 2021 Filing 62 Notice of Service of Defendants' Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Exclude Certain Opinions And Testimony Of Dr. Katherine Keyes filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 27, 2021 Filing 61 Notice of Service of Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company. (Barnes, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Service of Pharmacy Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Carmen Catizone filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 27, 2021 Filing 59 Notice of Service of Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Related document(s) #42 , #48 .(Livingston, Scott)
August 19, 2021 Filing 58 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 57 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 56 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Daniel C. Malone filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 55 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Anna Lembke filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 54 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony Offered by Dr. Katherine Keyes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 53 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Pharmacy Defendants' Motion to Exclude Carmen Catizone filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 52 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Dr. G. Caleb Alexander filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Sheet)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 51 Trial Brief filed by County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
August 18, 2021 Filing 50 Notice of Service of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann, #2 Memo in support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann, #3 Declaration of Alex J. Harris, #4 Exhibit 1 to Harris Declaration_FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 2 to to Harris Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Harris Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Harris Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Harris Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Harris Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Harris Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Harris Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 to Harris Declaration, #13 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann, #14 Summary Sheet)Related document(s) #39 .(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 17, 2021 Filing 49 Notice of Service of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Katherine Keyes filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Katherine Keyes, #2 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Katherine Keyes, #3 Steve Herman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration, #16 Exhibit 13 to Declaration, #17 Exhibit 14 to Declaration, #18 Exhibit 15 to Declaration, #19 Exhibit 16 to Declaration, #20 Exhibit 17 to Declaration, #21 Exhibit 18 to Declaration, #22 Exhibit 19 to Declaration, #23 Exhibit 20 to Declaration, #24 Exhibit 21 to Declaration, #25 Exhibit 22 to Declaration, #26 Exhibit 23 to Declaration, #27 Exhibit 24 to Declaration, #28 Exhibit 25 to Declaration, #29 Exhibit 26 to Declaration, #30 Exhibit 27 to Declaration, #31 Exhibit 28 to Declaration, #32 Exhibit 29 to Declaration, #33 Exhibit 30 to Declaration, #34 Exhibit 31 to Declaration, #35 Exhibit 32 to Declaration, #36 Exhibit 33 to Declaration, #37 Exhibit 34 to Declaration, #38 Proposed Order, #39 Exhibit A - Summary Sheet)(Delinsky, Eric)
August 17, 2021 Filing 48 Notice of Service of Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summary Sheet for Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander, #2 Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander, #4 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander, #5 Declaration of Brian C. Hill, #6 Exhibit 1: Caleb Alexander Report Excerpt, April 16, 2021, #7 Exhibit 2: Caleb Alexander Deposition Excerpts, May 27, 2021)Related document(s) #42 .(Livingston, Scott)
August 17, 2021 Filing 47 Notice of Service of Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski filed by Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summary Sheet for Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski, #2 Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski, #3 Proposed Order Granting Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski, #4 Certain Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski, #5 Declaration of Brian C. Hill, #6 Exhibit 1: James Rafalski Report Excerpts, April 16, 2021, #7 Exhibit 2: James Rafalski Deposition Excerpts, Vol. I (June 10, 2021), Vol. II (June 11, 2021), #8 Exhibit 3: DEA Reports of Investigation - HBC and GERX)Related document(s) #41 .(Livingston, Scott)
August 12, 2021 Filing 46 Omnibus Motion in Limine and Memorandum in Support filed by County of Trumbull. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1006 McCann, #2 Exhibit B - Faber Ruling)(Weinberger, Peter)
August 12, 2021 Filing 45 In Limine Evidentiary Stipulations filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, County of Trumbull, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Weinberger, Peter)
August 10, 2021 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Diane P. Sullivan, Chantale Fiebig filed on behalf of Giant Eagle Inc. (P,R)
August 9, 2021 Filing 43 Submission of Judge's Voir Dire Questions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
July 23, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Service of Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Caleb Alexander filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Livingston, Scott)
July 23, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Service of Certain Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions Offered by James Rafalski filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Livingston, Scott)
July 23, 2021 Filing 40 Notice of Service of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - (Summary Sheet of Concise Issues Raised))(Barnes, Robert)
July 23, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Service of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary of Concise Issues Raised)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 23, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Service of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Katherine Keyes filed by CVS Indiana LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Eckerd Corporation, Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Service)(Delinsky, Eric)
July 23, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Service of Defendants' Motion to Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Daniel C. Malone filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Sheet)(Majoras, John)
July 23, 2021 Filing 36 Motion To Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Based on Track One Arguments filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion)(Majoras, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 35 Opposition to Defendant CVS's Objections to the Order Regarding Various Discovery Issues filed by County of Trumbull. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' 1.8.21 correspondence, #2 Exhibit B Defendant's 1.18.21 correspondence)(Weinberger, Peter)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Ruling Regarding Re-Deposition of Expert Witness. Parties are directed to meet and confer with each other and Special Master Cohen and determine how best to ensure non-repetitive depositions of experts and third parties (Related Doc #33 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/11/21.(P,R)
March 9, 2021 Filing 34 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Revise the Order Regarding Time Limits for Expert Depositions filed by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc.. Related document(s) #33 . (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 3, 2021 Filing 33 Motion to Amend Ruling Regarding Re-Deposition of Expert Witnesses filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
January 21, 2021 Filing 32 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Rite Aid Corporation filed by Plaintiff County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Rite Aid Corporation (Related Doc #32 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/21/21.(P,R)
November 18, 2020 Filing 31 Opinion and Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to strike Pharmacy Defendants' Third-Party Complaint (Related Doc #27 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/18/20.(P,R)
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 Reply in support of #27 Motion to strike Third-Party Complaints filed by County of Trumbull. (Weinberger, Peter)
November 9, 2020 Filing 29 Opposition to #27 Motion to strike Third-Party Complaints filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 Response to the Court's Request for Input Regarding Statutes and Regulations to be Quoted in Jury Instructions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 27 Motion to strike Third-Party Complaints filed by County of Trumbull, County of Trumbull. Related document(s) #26 . (Weinberger, Peter)
October 5, 2020 Filing 26 Third party complaint against John and Jane Does 1-5000. Filed by Giant Eagle Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co and Walmart Inc. (Barnes, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 Answer to #13 Amended complaint,, filed by Eckerd Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Moore, Kelly)
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to #13 County of Trumbull's Supplemental and Amended Allegations to be Added to Short form for Supplementing Complaintfiled by Giant Eagle Inc., HBC Service Company. (Barnes, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Supplemental and Amended Allegations To Be Added to "Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants and Jury Demand" filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Related document(s) #13 . (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 22 Answer to #13 Amended complaint,, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) As To Certain Track Three Walmart Defendants filed by Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co. filed by Walgreen Eastern Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co. filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 Opinion and Order denying Pharmacy Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Related Doc #14 #15 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/6/20.(P,R)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corp.. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Chima Declaration)(Moore, Kelly)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas S. Moffatt)(Delinsky, Eric)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 Supplemental Amended complaint As to Short Form Complaint against CVS Health Corporation, HBC Service Company, Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., CVS Indiana LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Eckerd Corporation D/B/A Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management, LLC. Filed by County of Trumbull. (Badala, Salvatore)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. k/n/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreen Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.; Rite Aid Corp.; CVS Health Corporation; Value Drug Co.; HBC Service Company; Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Stuart D. Baker; John N. Kapoor; Mallinckrodt PLC; Mallinckrodt LLC; Noramco, Inc; Anda, Inc. and Wal-Mart, Inc.. Filed by County of Trumbull. (Badala, Salvatore)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of County of Trumbull. (Sacks, Shayna)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala filed by on behalf of County of Trumbull. (Badala, Salvatore)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of County of Trumbull. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of County of Trumbull. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
March 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) dismissing Defendant Russell Portenoy. Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 3/24/18. (P,R)
March 20, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice filed by Russell Portenoy. (Spencer, S.)
January 24, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion to stay The Date By Which To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and For an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal filed by Defendant Russell Portenoy. Related document(s) #1 . (Rauch, Jordan)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Trumbull County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017 CV 02266 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8512041. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP; 1:17-op-45000-DAP; 1:17-op-45001-DAP; 1:17-op-45002-DAP; 1:17-op-45003-DAP; 1:17-op-45004-DAP; 1:17-op-45005-DAP; 1:18-op-45012-DAP; 1:18-op-45013-DAP; 1:18-op-45031-DAP. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit 3 - MDL Transfer Order) (Rendon, Carole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Trumbull v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: Jordan D. Rauch
Represented By: S. Amy Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Represented By: Robert M. Barnes
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation D/B/A Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Barnes
Represented By: Elizabeth Y. Ryan
Represented By: Chantale Fiebig
Represented By: Diane P. Sullivan
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation doing business as Rite Aid Liverpool Distribution Center
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Trumbull
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Leo M. Spellacy, Jr.
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ohio CVS Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?