County of Summit, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Valley Fire District, City of Norton, Ohio, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, Springfield Township, Ohio, City of Monroe Falls, Ohio, City of Tallmadge, Ohio, City of Stow, Ohio, Boston Township, Ohio, City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio, City of Akron, Ohio, City of Barberton, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Summit County Combined General Health District, City of Fairlawn, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, City of Green, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio, City of New Franklin, Joel Reed, Bryan Nace, Megan Raber, William Hanna, Justin Markey, Tom Kostoff, Bill Chirs, Amber Zibritosky, Thomas Musarra, Ed Pullekins, City of Macedonia, Sherri Bevan Walsh, Irv Sugarman, Eve Belfance, Chief Criedel, Russ Balthis, Warren Price, Mark Guidetti, Lisa Miller, Brad Bryan, Bob Heydorn and Marshal Pitchford
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Jane Does 1-50, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Kroger Co., Mallinckrodt LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Henry Schein Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Actavis LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan PLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Allergan Finance LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Discount Drug Mart, Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Prescription Supply Inc, Miami-Luken, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., RiteAid Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Actavis Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Actavis PLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc., HBC Service Company, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. and Giant Eagle, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: John and Jane Does
Interested Party: State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy
Case Number: 1:2018op45090
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 232 Reply to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response to Pharmacy Defendants' Motions In Limine on Behalf of Track 1B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Walmart Inc.. (Majoras, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 231 Attorney Appearance by Paul M. Mannix filed by on behalf of Giant Eagle, Inc.. (Mannix, Paul)
August 14, 2020 Filing 230 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence Or Argument Relating To Participation In Trade Associations On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 229 Motion in limine To Limit Testimony Of Craig McCann On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 228 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence Of Extraterritorial Conduct Without Establishing A Specific Nexus To Cuyahoga Or Summit County And A Track One-B Defendant On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 227 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence Of Settlements On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 226 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence Of Civil Or Criminal Investigations Or Other Litigation On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 225 Omnibus Motion in limine to Preserve Arguments and Objections Related to Prior Motions in Limine filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 14, 2020 Filing 224 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence Or Argument That Defendants Could Have Stopped Distributing Schedule II Controlled Substances On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 223 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence, Argument, And Testimony Comparing Defendants' Conduct To Wars, National Tragedies, Terrorist Attacks, The Tobacco Industry, Or Any Comparison Of Defendants To Such Actors On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 222 Motion in limine To Preclude Testimony Or Argument Negatively Characterizing Defendants As Large Corporations On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 221 Motion in limine To Exclude Orders From Non-Defendant Distributors filed by Defendant Rite Aid of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Summary Sheet)(Moore, Kelly)
August 14, 2020 Filing 220 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence, Argument Or Comments Regarding The Absence, Presence Or Identity Of Defendants' Corporate Representatives At Trial On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 219 Motion in limine To Preclude Evidence, Argument Or Comments Relating To Personal Information Of Counsel And Staff On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 14, 2020 Filing 218 Omnibus Motion in limine To Preserve Objections To Prior Motions In Limine On Behalf Of Track One-B Pharmacy Defendants filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
June 2, 2020 Filing 217 Notice of Filing of Notice of Dismissal In the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals filed by State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filing in Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals)(Appel, Henry)
April 7, 2020 Filing 216 Designation of Mediator filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
April 3, 2020 Filing 215 Notice of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus In the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals filed by State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed in Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals on April 3, 2020)Related document(s) #210 .(Appel, Henry)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy's Motion for reconsideration and Motion to amend order to authorize an appeal (Related Doc # #209 #214 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/17/20.(P,R)
March 12, 2020 Filing 214 Motion to Amend Order to Authorize Immediate Appeal Under 28 USC 1292(b) filed by Interested Party State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. Related document(s) #210 . (Appel, Henry) Modified on 3/13/2020 (P,R).
March 12, 2020 Filing 213 Reply in support of #209 Motion for reconsideration filed by State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. (Appel, Henry)
March 9, 2020 Filing 212 Opposition to #209 Motion for reconsideration Order Granting Motion to Compel OAARS Data filed by Pharmacy Defendants filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 3, 2020 Filing 211 Attorney Appearance by Matthew R. Mazgaj filed by on behalf of Giant Eagle, Inc., HBC Service Company. (Mazgaj, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Filing 209 Motion for reconsideration filed by Interested Party State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. Related document(s) #208 . (Appel, Henry)
February 13, 2020 Filing 210 Discovery Ruling Regarding OARRS Data granting Pharmacy Defendants' Motion to compel (Related Doc #204 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/13/20.(P,R)
January 31, 2020 Filing 208 Reply in support of #204 Motion to compel discovery re: Limited Additional Data from the Ohio Board of Pharmacy's OARRS Database [Pharmacy Defendants] filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
January 31, 2020 Filing 207 Track One-B Case Management Order No. 2 - Case Management Conference held on 1/29/20. Jury Trial reset for 11/9/2020; follow-up case management conference to be held on 3/26/2020 at 9:00 AM. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/30/20. (P,R)
January 22, 2020 Filing 206 Response to #204 Motion to compel discovery re: Limited Additional Data from the Ohio Board of Pharmacy's OARRS Database filed by State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. (Appel, Henry)
January 13, 2020 Filing 205 Amended Answer to Amended Complaint, by Interlineation #186 filed by Rite Aid of Maryland. Related document(s) #186 , #200 . (Moore, Kelly)
January 8, 2020 Filing 204 Motion to compel discovery re: Limited Additional Data from the Ohio Board of Pharmacy's OARRS Database filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
January 6, 2020 Filing 203 Third party complaint against John and Jane Does. Filed by Walgreen Co., HBC Service Company, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Order on Reconsideration Regarding Scope of Discovery in Track One-B. Related Doc #194 . Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/27/19.(P,R)
December 24, 2019 Filing 201 Opposition to #194 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order Regarding Scope of Track One-B [Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 10, 2019 Order] filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Baig, Aelish)
December 23, 2019 Filing 200 Answer to #186 Amended complaint,, by Interlineation filed by Rite Aid of Maryland. (Moore, Kelly)
December 23, 2019 Filing 199 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Rite Aid Corporation. Related document(s) #186 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Rite Aid Corporation's Memorandum ISO Motion to Dismiss (Personal Jurisdiction), #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ron S. Chima ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Moore, Kelly)
December 23, 2019 Filing 198 Answer to #186 Amended complaint,, by Interlineation filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
December 23, 2019 Filing 197 Answer to #186 Amended complaint,, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
December 23, 2019 Filing 196 Answer to #186 Amended complaint,, filed by CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC. (Delinsky, Eric)
December 23, 2019 Filing 195 Motion to dismiss filed by CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS RX Services, Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., HBC Service Company, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc.. Related document(s) #186 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Delinsky, Eric)
December 20, 2019 Filing 194 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's Order Regarding Scope of Track One-B filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - E-mail from Special Master David R. Cohen to Counsel (Dec. 9, 2019), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration of William F. Boyd, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Declaration of David Teague, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Declaration of Jon Arends, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Declaration of James Tsipakis, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Declaration of Keith Miller, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Declaration of Derek Jones)(Fumerton, Tara)
December 19, 2019 Filing 193 Unredacted Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #157 .(Singer, Linda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 192 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation. (P,R)
December 6, 2019 Filing 191 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action to Rite Aid Corporation, #2 Summons Summons in a Civil Action to Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation)(Singer, Linda)
December 4, 2019 Filing 190 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
December 3, 2019 Filing 189 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Giant Eagle, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
November 22, 2019 Filing 188 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ohio CVS Stores, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
November 22, 2019 Filing 187 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
November 20, 2019 Filing 186 STRICKEN Amendment to Amended complaint by Interlineation against CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS RX Services, Inc., HBC Service Company, Rite Aid of Maryland, RiteAid Corp., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ohio CVS Stores, LLC, Giant Eagle, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. Filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Singer, Linda) Modified on 4/16/2020 (P,R).
November 19, 2019 Filing 185 Track One-B Case Management Order Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:00 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/19/19. (P,R)
November 1, 2019 Filing 184 Motion to amend complaint (unredacted) filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #181 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summit County Proposed Amendment by Interlineation), #2 Exhibit B (Cuyahoga County Proposed Amendment by Interlineation))(Singer, Linda)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims in this matter against Defendant Henry Schein, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/29/2019. (K,K)
October 29, 2019 Filing 182 Motion for leave to File Amendment Under Seal filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #181 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amendment Under Seal)(Singer, Linda)
October 29, 2019 Filing 181 Motion for leave to Amend filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. (Singer, Linda)
October 22, 2019 Filing 180 Stipulated Dismissal Order Summit County's claims against Defendants McKesson, Cardinal Health, AmerisourceBergen, Teva, Actavis and Cephalon are Dismissed With Prejudice. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/21/19. (P,R)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Order Dismissing Johnson & Johnson With Prejudice. Johnson & Johnson, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. terminated. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/11/19. (P,R)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order Dismissing Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, and SpecGX LLC With Prejudice. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/1/19. (P,R)
September 25, 2019 Filing 177 Response in Opposition to Motion for Access to Jury Selection Records and Information filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Singer, Linda)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Order Dismissing Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC and Allergan PLC. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/24/19. (P,R)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order Dismissing Endo Pharmaceutical Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. With Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/5/19. (P,R)
August 23, 2019 Filing 174 Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc.. Related document(s) #166 .(Fumerton, Tara)
August 23, 2019 Filing 173 Reply in support of #165 Motion for leave to file Pharmacy Defendants' Civil Conspiracy Summary Judgment Motion under seal filed by Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
August 5, 2019 Filing 172 Notice of Proposed Redactions to Exhibits to Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion filed by State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Redactions, #2 Proposed Redactions)Related document(s) #165 .(Appel, Henry)
June 28, 2019 Filing 171 Notice of Service of ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC, ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, AND ALLERGAN USA, INC.S INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION & EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, SUMMARY SHEET FOR ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC, ALLERGAN SALES, LLC, AND ALLERGAN USA, INC.S INDIVIDUAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Welch, Donna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 170 Notice of Service of SUMMARY SHEET FOR MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO OFFER PROOF OF CAUSATION, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION & EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER filed by Manufacturer Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, SUMMARY SHEET FOR MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO OFFER PROOF OF CAUSATION)(Welch, Donna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 169 Notice of Service of DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE MEREDITH ROSENTHALS OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TESTIMONY, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION & EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, SUMMARY SHEET FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE MEREDITH ROSENTHALS OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TESTIMONY)(Welch, Donna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 168 Notice of Service of MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS PUBLIC NUISANCE CLAIMS, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION & EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, SUMMARY SHEET FOR MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS PUBLIC NUISANCE CLAIMS)(Welch, Donna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 167 Notice of Service of DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAVID CUTLERS OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TESTIMONY, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION & EXHIBITS, PROPOSED ORDER filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, SUMMARY SHEET FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAVID CUTLERS OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TESTIMONY)(Welch, Donna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 166 Notice of Service of Motion for Summary Judgment of Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summary Sheet)(Fumerton, Tara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 165 Motion for leave to file Pharmacy Defendants' Civil Conspiracy Summary Judgment Motion under seal filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fumerton, Tara)
May 3, 2019 Filing 164 Answer filed by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. Related document(s) #161 . (Welch, Donna)
May 3, 2019 Filing 163 Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, ACTAVIS LABORATORIES FL. INC., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. Related document(s) #157 . (Reed, Steven)
May 1, 2019 Filing 162 Civil Jury Trial Order - Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 12:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/1/19. (P,R)
April 25, 2019 Filing 161 Agreed Order Regarding Answers to The County of Summit, Ohio's Third Amended Complaint. It is hereby ordered that 1) Only the Newly-Named Defendants, and no other defendants, need answer the Third Amended Complaint by May 3, 20191; 2) The Newly-Named Defendants shall answer all allegations in the Third Amended Complaint that relate to each respective Newly-Named Defendant. With respect to the remaining allegations, and with respect to affirmative defenses, the Newly-Named Defendants may answer separately or may join in and incorporate by reference the Answer/Responsive Pleadings already submitted by other Allergan or Actavis entities; and 3) All other answers by all other defendants to the Summit County Second Amended Complaint to allegations that are repeated in the Third Amended Complaint remain operative. Signed by Special Master David R. Cohen on 4/25/2019. (K,K)
April 8, 2019 Filing 160 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 159 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file under seal (Related Doc #156 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/21/19.(P,R)
March 21, 2019 Filing 157 SEALED Document:Third Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #153 . (Singer, Linda)
March 20, 2019 Filing 156 Motion for leave to file under seal filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #153 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singer, Linda) Modified on 3/22/2019 (P,R).
March 8, 2019 Filing 155 Attorney Appearance by Lauren M. Fincher filed on behalf of Henry Schein Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.(P,R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order Governing Production of Medical and Pharmacy Claims Data in Track One Cases. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Medical Layout Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - File List)(P,R)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order denying Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default (Related Doc #143 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/15/19.(P,R)
February 19, 2019 Filing 152 Attorney Appearance by Gregory N. Heinen filed by on behalf of Anda, Inc.. (Heinen, Gregory)
February 18, 2019 Filing 151 Attorney Appearance by Kristina J. Matic filed by on behalf of Anda, Inc.. (Matic, Kristina)
February 13, 2019 Filing 150 Notice of Withdrawal of Redi Kasollja as Counsel filed by Anda, Inc.. (Kasollja, Redi)
February 11, 2019 Filing 149 Reply in support of #143 Request for Entry of Default filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aelish M. Baig in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 4 to Baig Decl. - Allergan's Responses & Objections to Amended Rule 30(b) (6) Deposition Notice and Rule 30(b) (2) Document Request, #3 Exhibit 5 to Baig Decl. - Allergan's Second Amended Written Responses to Rule 30(b)(6) Topics 1, 2, and 45, #4 Exhibit 6 to Baig Decl. - Allergan's Second Amended Written Responses to Rule 30(b)(6) Topics 17, 18, 24, 25, & 26, #5 Exhibit 7 to Baig Decl. - Excerpt of Ex. 3 to the S. Kaufhold Deposition Transcript)(Baig, Aelish)
February 5, 2019 Filing 148 Corrected Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Reed, Steven) Modified on 2/6/2019 (P,R).
February 5, 2019 Filing 147 Corrected Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Cephalon, Inc. (Reed, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Filing 146 Corrected Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 145 Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon The Fred W. Albrecht Grocery Company dba ACME Fresh Market Pharmacy by Process Server on 01/22/2019 filed on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McQueen, Aaron)
January 30, 2019 Filing 144 Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon The Fred W. Albrecht Grocery Company dba ACME Fresh Market Pharmacy by Process Server on 01/22/2019 filed on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McQueen, Aaron)
January 25, 2019 Filing 143 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Baig Decl., #2 Exhibit 1 - Waivers of Service, #3 Exhibit 2 - Allergan Objections & Responses to 3d Rogs, #4 Exhibit 3 - Relevant Excerpts from Kaufhold Tr.)(Baig, Aelish) Modified on 1/28/2019 (P,R).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order denying Distributors' Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal (Related Doc #141 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/18/19.(P,R)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] - Distributor Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal is GRANTED (related Doc #125 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/18/19.(P,R)
January 17, 2019 Filing 141 Motion Distributors' Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order granting Mallinckrodt plc's Motion for leave by special appearance to file motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (#1266 in 17md2804). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/17/19. (P,R)
January 15, 2019 Filing 139 Answer to #24 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Stern, Jonathan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 138 Answer to #24 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stern, Jonathan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 137 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
January 15, 2019 Filing 136 Answer to #24 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Reed, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Filing 135 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Lifland, Charles)
January 15, 2019 Filing 134 Answer to #24 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Cephalon, Inc. (Reed, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Filing 133 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
January 15, 2019 Filing 132 Answer to #24 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Allergan Finance, LLC (Welch, Donna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 131 Notice of Special Appearance by Andrew J. O'Connor filed on behalf of Mallinckrodt PLC. (O'Connor, Andrew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 130 Answer to #24 Amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Reed, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mallinckrodt PLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
January 15, 2019 Filing 128 Notice of Special Appearance by Brien T. O'Connor filed by on behalf of Mallinckrodt PLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
January 15, 2019 Filing 127 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Rite Aid of Maryland. (Moore, Kelly)
January 15, 2019 Filing 126 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Walmart Inc. (Fumerton, Tara)
January 15, 2019 Filing 125 Motion for leave to file a Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hobart, Geoffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 124 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Cheffo, Mark)
January 15, 2019 Filing 123 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Allergan PLC. (Related document(s) #25 ). (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support #2 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of James C. D'Arecca)(Welch, Donna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 122 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by McKesson Corporation. (Hobart, Geoffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 121 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Hardin, Ashley)
January 15, 2019 Filing 120 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Anda, Inc. (Matthews, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 119 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Prescription Supply Inc. (Haggerty, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 118 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by Noramco, Inc. (Hergenrother, Jenny)
January 15, 2019 Filing 117 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS RX Services, Inc. (Delinsky, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 116 Answer to #24 Amended complaint filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Nicholas, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice of Miami-Luken, Inc. (Related Doc #100 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/11/19.(P,R)
December 19, 2018 Filing 114 Opinion and Order adopting in part and rejecting in part #97 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are DENIED with one exception (see order) Defendants' answers to Plaintiffs' Corrected Second Amended Complaint are due no later than January 15, 2019 (Related Doc # #19 #20 #41 #49 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/19/18.(P,R)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot, based on doc. #: 1146 in 17md2804, Cardinal and McKesson's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of the Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion To Dismiss Track 1 Plaintiffs' Claims for Damages (Related Doc #110 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/21/18.(P,R)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order denying Distributor Defendants' Motion for leave to File Motion to Certify Questions of Law to the Ohio Supreme Court (Related Doc #109 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/13/18.(P,R)
November 12, 2018 Filing 112 Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Leave To File Motion To Certify Questions of Law filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Hardin, Ashley)
November 12, 2018 Filing 111 Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. Related document(s) #107 . (Hardin, Ashley) .
November 6, 2018 Filing 110 Motion for leave To File Memorandum in Support of the Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion To Dismiss Track 1 Plaintiffs' Claims for Damages filed by Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of the Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion To Dismiss Track 1 Plaintiffs' Claims for Damages)(Hardin, Ashley)
November 2, 2018 Filing 109 Motion for leave to File Motion to Certify Questions of Law to the Ohio Supreme Court filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Certify Questions of Law to the Ohio Supreme Court)(Hardin, Ashley)
November 2, 2018 Filing 108 Objection to Report and Recommendation on Their Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Related document(s) #97 . (Stern, Jonathan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 107 Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #97 . (Singer, Linda)
November 2, 2018 Filing 106 Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Related document(s) #97 . (Hobart, Geoffrey)
November 2, 2018 Filing 105 Objection to Report and Recommendation Regarding Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Rx Services, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walmart Inc. filed by Walmart Inc.. Related document(s) #97 . (Fumerton, Tara)
October 29, 2018 Filing 104 Attorney Appearance by John J. Haggerty filed by on behalf of Prescription Supply Inc. (Haggerty, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 103 Second Order Regarding Objections to #97 Report and Recommendation. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/17/18. (P,R)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order Regarding Discovery Ruling #5. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/16/18. (P,R)
October 12, 2018 Filing 101 Notice Relating To The Court's Order Regarding Objections To Report And Recomendation filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Related document(s) #99 .(Hobart, Geoffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 100 Consent Motion to dismiss party without prejudice filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Singer, Linda)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Regarding Objections to #97 Report and Recommendation. Related documents #19 , #20 , #41 , #49 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 10/10/2018. (B,R)
October 8, 2018 Filing 98 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 97 Report and Recommendation recommending that the Manufacturers', Distributors' and Pharmacies' separate Motions to Dismiss ( #19 , #20 , #41 , #49 ) be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 10/19/2018. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/5/18. (P,R)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Cardinal Health's Motion for oral argument on Distributors' motion to dismiss (Related Doc #74 ). Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/5/18.(P,R)
September 18, 2018 Filing 96 Notice of Withdrawal of Jaclyn V. Piltch as Counsel filed by Anda, Inc.. (Piltch, Jaclyn)
September 17, 2018 Filing 95 Attorney Appearance by Redi Kasollja filed by on behalf of Anda, Inc.. (Kasollja, Redi)
August 24, 2018 Filing 94 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ross County, Ohio Order)Related document(s) #59 .(Cabraser, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. filed by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 10, 2018 Filing 92 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 7, 2018 Filing 91 SEALED Document:Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Objections and Pharmacy Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Rulings No. 2 and 3 filed by City of Akron, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #89 , #79 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of June 6, 2018 Hearing)(Singer, Linda)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Opposition to Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Objections and Pharmacy Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Rulings No. 2 and 3 Under Seal (Related Doc #84 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/30/18.(P,R)
July 31, 2018 Filing 90 Marginal Entry Order granting Chain Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Extension of Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss Reply Briefs (Related Doc #88 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/31/18.(P,R)
July 30, 2018 Filing 88 Motion for leave - Chain Pharmacy Defendants' Motion for Extension of Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss Reply Briefs filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 30, 2018 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co. filed by Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 30, 2018 Filing 86 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Co.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 30, 2018 Filing 85 Omnibus Opposition to Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Objections and Pharmacy Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Rulings No. 2 and 3 (redacted) filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #79 . (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2018 Filing 84 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Objections and Pharmacy Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Rulings No. 2 and 3 Under Seal filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weinberger, Peter)
July 27, 2018 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Zerrusen, Sandra)
July 25, 2018 Filing 82 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kentucky Motion to Dismiss Order, #2 Exhibit B - Alaska Motion to Dismiss Order, #3 Exhibit C - New York Motion to Dismiss Order)Related document(s) #59 .(Cabraser, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2018 Filing 81 Attorney Appearance by Andrew J. O'Connor filed by on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (O'Connor, Andrew)
July 25, 2018 Filing 80 Attorney Appearance by Brien T. O'Connor filed by on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
July 24, 2018 Filing 79 Objection by Manufacturer Defendants to the Special Master's Discovery Rulings Nos. 2 and 3 filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Discovery Ruling No. 2), #2 Exhibit 2 (Discovery Ruling No. 3), #3 Exhibit 3 (July 11, 2018 Letter to Cohen), #4 Exhibit 4 (July 17, 2018 Letter to Cohen), #5 Exhibit 5 (Master Purchase Agreement between Allergan & Teva), #6 Exhibit 6 (Settlement Agreement and Mutual Releases between Teva & Allergan), #7 Exhibit 7 (July 10, 2018 Letter to Egler), #8 Exhibit 8 (Declaration of Allison Lee), #9 Exhibit 9 (Declaration of Andrew J. O'Connor), #10 Exhibit 10 (Declaration of Thomas E. Sanchez), #11 Exhibit 11 (Declaration of Robert S. Hoff), #12 Exhibit 12 (Declaration of Vikram Masson), #13 Exhibit 13 (Declaration of Ryan Guilds)) (Welch, Donna)
July 20, 2018 Filing 78 Attorney Appearance by Scott D. Livingston filed by on behalf of HBC Service Company. (Livingston, Scott)
July 18, 2018 Filing 77 Attorney Appearance by Erin G. Allen filed by on behalf of HBC Service Company. (Allen, Erin)
July 16, 2018 Filing 76 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to dismiss Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc and Add Walgreen Co. and Walgreen Eastern Co. as Defendants, and rendering moot #14 Walgreens Boots Alliance's Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/16/18.(P,R)
July 13, 2018 Filing 75 Reply in support of #20 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim / Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lifland, Charles)
July 13, 2018 Filing 74 Motion for oral argument on Distributors' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Related document(s) #41 . (Hardin, Ashley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 73 Reply in support of #41 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Distributors' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Hardin, Ashley)
July 13, 2018 Filing 72 Reply in support of #19 Motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Walmart Inc., CVS Health Corp., Rite Aid Corp., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. filed by Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
July 9, 2018 Filing 71 Brief Favoring Disclosure Re: Public Records Requests filed by County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Weinberger, Peter)
July 6, 2018 Filing 70 Attorney Appearance by William H. Falin filed by on behalf of HBC Service Company. (Falin, William)
July 6, 2018 Filing 69 Attorney Appearance by George M. Moscarino filed by on behalf of HBC Service Company. (Moscarino, George)
July 5, 2018 Filing 68 Motion to dismiss party Walgreens-Boots Alliance, Inc. and Add Walgreen Co. and Walgreen Eastern Co. as Defendants filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. (Singer, Linda)
June 29, 2018 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HBC Service Company. (Barnes, Robert)
June 28, 2018 Filing 66 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Henry Schein Inc. on 6/5/2018, filed on behalf of Sherri Bevan Walsh; County of Summit, Ohio; Eve Belfance; City of Akron, Ohio Related document(s) #24 . (Singer, Linda)
June 27, 2018 Filing 65 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc. on 6/15/2018, filed on behalf of Sherri Bevan Walsh; County of Summit, Ohio; Eve Belfance; City of Akron, Ohio Related document(s) #24 . (Singer, Linda)
June 26, 2018 Filing 64 Attorney Appearance by Robert M. Barnes filed on behalf of HBC Service Company. (B,R)
June 25, 2018 Filing 63 Attorney Appearance by Brandan J. Montminy filed on behalf of Henry Schein Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.(B,R)
June 25, 2018 Filing 62 Attorney Appearance by C. Scott Jones filed on behalf of Henry Schein Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc. (B,R)
June 25, 2018 Filing 61 Attorney Appearance by John P. McDonald filed on behalf of Henry Schein Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc. (B,R)
June 23, 2018 Filing 60 Plaintiffs' Response to [Doc. No. 499-2] Manufacturer Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in Support of the Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #20 .(Singer, Linda)
June 22, 2018 Filing 59 Opposition to #41 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Distributors' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #20 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim / Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #19 Motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Walmart Inc., CVS Health Corp., Rite Aid Corp., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. filed by Eve Belfance, Sherri Bevan Walsh, City of Akron, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Singer, Linda)
June 22, 2018 Filing 58 Joint Motion for extension of time until 7/6/18 to file response/reply to #14 Motion to dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Russ Balthis, Eve Belfance, Sherri Bevan Walsh, Boston Township, Ohio, Brad Bryan, Bill Chirs, City of Akron, Ohio, City of Barberton, Ohio, City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio, City of Fairlawn, Ohio, City of Green, Ohio, City of Macedonia, City of Monroe Falls, Ohio, City of New Franklin, City of Norton, Ohio, City of Stow, Ohio, City of Tallmadge, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Chief Criedel, Mark Guidetti, William Hanna, Bob Heydorn, Tom Kostoff, Justin Markey, Lisa Miller, Thomas Musarra, Bryan Nace, Marshal Pitchford, Marshal Pitchford, Warren Price, Ed Pullekins, Megan Raber, Joel Reed, Springfield Township, Ohio, Irv Sugarman, Summit County Combined General Health District, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio, Amber Zibritosky. Related document(s) #14 . (Singer, Linda)
June 21, 2018 Filing 57 Attorney Appearance by Jaclyn V. Piltch filed by on behalf of Anda, Inc.. (Piltch, Jaclyn)
June 21, 2018 Filing 56 Attorney Appearance by Katy E. Koski filed by on behalf of Anda, Inc.. (Koski, Katy)
June 21, 2018 Filing 55 Attorney Appearance by James W. Matthews filed by on behalf of Anda, Inc.. (Matthews, James)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot CVS Health Corporation's Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Related Doc #15 ); granting Plaintiffs' Motion to dismiss CVS Health Corporation and Add CVS Indiana, LLC and CVS RX Services, Inc. (Related Doc #52 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 6/20/18.(P,R)
June 20, 2018 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Discount Drug Mart, Inc.. (Johnson, Timothy)
June 20, 2018 Filing 53 Attorney Appearance by Timothy D. Johnson filed by on behalf of Discount Drug Mart, Inc.. (Johnson, Timothy)
June 19, 2018 Filing 52 Unopposed Motion to dismiss party CVS Health Corporation and Add CVS Indiana, LLC and CVS RX Services, Inc. filed by Plaintiff County of Summit, Ohio. (Weinberger, Peter)
June 14, 2018 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent RITE AID CORPORATION for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (McEnroe, Elisa)
June 13, 2018 Filing 50 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Rite Aid Corporation filed by County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #25 .(Singer, Linda) Modified on 6/14/2018 (P,R).
June 13, 2018 Filing 49 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim joining previously filed Distributors' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Miami-Luken, Inc.. Related document(s) #41 . (Miller, Laurie)
June 13, 2018 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Miami-Luken Holding Company, Inc. for Miami-Luken, Inc. filed by Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Miller, Laurie)
June 13, 2018 Filing 47 Attorney Appearance by Laurie K. Miller filed by on behalf of Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Miller, Laurie)
June 13, 2018 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Pyser, Steven)
June 13, 2018 Filing 45 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Prescription Supply Inc on 6/4/2018, filed on behalf of Sherri Bevan Walsh; County of Summit, Ohio; Eve Belfance; City of Akron, Ohio Related document(s) #24 . (Singer, Linda)
June 13, 2018 Filing 44 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon HBC Service Company on 6/4/2018, filed on behalf of Sherri Bevan Walsh; County of Summit, Ohio; Eve Belfance; City of Akron, Ohio Related document(s) #24 . (Singer, Linda)
June 12, 2018 Filing 43 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Discount Drug Mart, Inc. on 6/4/2018, filed on behalf of Sherri Bevan Walsh; County of Summit, Ohio; Eve Belfance; City of Akron, Ohio Related document(s) #24 . (Singer, Linda)
June 9, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RiteAid Corp.. (McEnroe, Elisa)
June 8, 2018 Filing 41 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Distributors' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Distributors' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum ISO Distributors' Motion to Dismiss)(Hardin, Ashley)
June 6, 2018 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Stern, Jonathan)
June 1, 2018 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd for Cephalon, Inc. ; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC, Corporate Parent Teva Ltd, Corporate Parent Orvet UK Unlimited for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
June 1, 2018 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Reed, Steven)
June 1, 2018 Filing 37 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Discount Drug Mart, Inc., HBC Service Company, Henry Schein Inc., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Prescription Supply Inc. (P,R)
May 31, 2018 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (O'Connor, Brien)
May 31, 2018 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noramco, Inc.. (Mendelsohn, Jenny)
May 31, 2018 Filing 34 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Eve Belfance, Sherri Bevan Walsh, City of Akron, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Summons Discount Drug Mart, Inc., #2 Summons HBC Service Co., #3 Summons Henry Schein Inc, #4 Summons Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., #5 Summons Prescription Supply, Inc.)(Singer, Linda)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to dismiss certain plaintiffs without prejudice. (Related Doc #29 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 5/31/18.(P,R)
May 31, 2018 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
May 31, 2018 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Cheffo, Mark)
May 31, 2018 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Cheffo, Mark)
May 31, 2018 Filing 29 Motion to dismiss party filed by Russ Balthis, Boston Township, Ohio, Brad Bryan, Bill Chirs, City of Barberton, Ohio, City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio, City of Fairlawn, Ohio, City of Green, Ohio, City of Monroe Falls, Ohio, City of New Franklin, City of Norton, Ohio, City of Stow, Ohio, City of Tallmadge, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Chief Criedel, Mark Guidetti, William Hanna, Bob Heydorn, Tom Kostoff, Justin Markey, Lisa Miller, Thomas Musarra, Bryan Nace, Marshal Pitchford, Marshal Pitchford, Warren Price, Ed Pullekins, Megan Raber, Joel Reed, Springfield Township, Ohio, Irv Sugarman, Summit County Combined General Health District, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio, Amber Zibritosky. Related document(s) #10 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singer, Linda)
May 30, 2018 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC for Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Welch, Donna)
May 30, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lifland, Charles)
May 30, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Johnson & Johnson filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Lifland, Charles)
May 29, 2018 Filing 25 SEALED Document:Second Amended Complaint (corrected) filed by Russ Balthis, Eve Belfance, Sherri Bevan Walsh, Boston Township, Ohio, Brad Bryan, Bill Chirs, City of Akron, Ohio, City of Barberton, Ohio, City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio, City of Fairlawn, Ohio, City of Green, Ohio, City of Monroe Falls, Ohio, City of New Franklin, City of Norton, Ohio, City of Stow, Ohio, City of Tallmadge, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Chief Criedel, Mark Guidetti, William Hanna, Bob Heydorn, Tom Kostoff, Justin Markey, Lisa Miller, Thomas Musarra, Bryan Nace, Warren Price, Ed Pullekins, Megan Raber, Joel Reed, Springfield Township, Ohio, Irv Sugarman, Summit County Combined General Health District, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio, Amber Zibritosky. Related document(s) #6 . (Singer, Linda)
May 29, 2018 Filing 24 Second Amended complaint (corrected/redacted) against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Miami-Luken, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; SpecGx LLC; Discount Drug Mart, Inc.; HBC Service Company, Inc.; Henry Schein, Inc.; Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.; Prescription Supply, Inc.. Filed by City of Stow, Ohio, Bill Chirs, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Chief Criedel, City of New Franklin, Warren Price, Village of Richfield, Ohio, City of Norton, Ohio, Justin Markey, Springfield Township, Ohio, Joel Reed, Amber Zibritosky, Bryan Nace, City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio, City of Fairlawn, Ohio, Mark Guidetti, Irv Sugarman, Tom Kostoff, William Hanna, City of Green, Ohio, City of Monroe Falls, Ohio, Sherri Bevan Walsh, Megan Raber, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio, Summit County Combined General Health District, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio, Russ Balthis, Eve Belfance, Lisa Miller, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, City of Tallmadge, Ohio, Valley Fire District, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Brad Bryan, Boston Township, Ohio, Ed Pullekins, City of Akron, Ohio, Thomas Musarra, Coventry Township, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, Bob Heydorn, City of Barberton, Ohio, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio. (Singer, Linda)
May 29, 2018 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. waiver sent on 5/15/2018, answer due 7/16/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
May 29, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. RiteAid Corp. waiver sent on 5/15/2018, answer due 7/16/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
May 29, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 5/15/2018, answer due 7/16/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
May 25, 2018 Filing 20 Joint Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim / Manufacturer Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support, #3 Declaration of Charles C. Lifland in Support, #4 Exhibit A - FDA Response, #5 Exhibit B - Ohio AG Complaint, #6 Exhibit C - Nucynta ER Label, #7 Exhibit D - OxyContin Label, #8 Exhibit E - Actiq Label, #9 Exhibit F - Fentora Label, #10 Exhibit G - Subsys Label, #11 Exhibit H - Kadian Label, #12 Exhibit I - Opana ER Label, #13 Exhibit J - Exalgo Label, #14 Exhibit K - FDA Press Release, #15 Exhibit L - TIRF REMS, #16 Proposed Order)(Lifland, Charles)
May 25, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Walmart Inc., CVS Health Corp., Rite Aid Corp., and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Fumerton, Tara)
May 25, 2018 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Tina M. Tabacchi filed by on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Tabacchi, Tina)
May 25, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
May 25, 2018 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Tara A. Fumerton filed by on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara)
May 25, 2018 Filing 15 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Delinsky, Eric)
May 25, 2018 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc's Motion to Dimiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit A - Decl. iso Motion)(Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
May 25, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Delinsky, Eric)
May 25, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
May 25, 2018 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order. In reviewing recently filed amended complaints in the Track One cases, the Court discovered that there are 22 named Plaintiffs in this particular Track One case. The Court hereby DIRECTS Summit County to file, no later than 12 noon ET on Thursday, May 31, 2018, an Amended Complaint with only Summit County as Plaintiff or this case will be withdrawn from the Track One cases heading to trial in March 2019. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 5/25/2018. (B,R)
May 22, 2018 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance Notice of Special Appearance by Eric R. Delinsky filed by on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. (Delinsky, Eric)
May 18, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED Document:Second Amended Complaint filed by Russ Balthis, Eve Belfance, Sherri Bevan Walsh, Boston Township, Ohio, Brad Bryan, Bill Chirs, City of Akron, Ohio, City of Barberton, Ohio, City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio, City of Fairlawn, Ohio, City of Green, Ohio, City of Monroe Falls, Ohio, City of New Franklin, City of Norton, Ohio, City of Stow, Ohio, City of Tallmadge, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, County of Summit, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Chief Criedel, William Hanna, Bob Heydorn, Tom Kostoff, Justin Markey, Lisa Miller, Thomas Musarra, Bryan Nace, Marshal Pitchford, Warren Price, Ed Pullekins, Megan Raber, Joel Reed, Springfield Township, Ohio, Irv Sugarman, Summit County Combined General Health District, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio, Amber Zibritosky. Related document(s) #6 . (Singer, Linda)
April 25, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED Document:Amended Complaint filed by County of Summit, Ohio. Related document(s) #6 . (Weinberger, Peter)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to strike ECF Doc. 257 and granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for leave to file Amended Complaints under seal (Related Doc # 260 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 4/25/2018. All documents related to this matter have been filed in 17md2804.(B,R)
April 13, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
April 13, 2018 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Alana V. Tanoury filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Tanoury, Alana)
April 13, 2018 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Vincent I. Holzhall filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
January 22, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-2017-12-5235 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8517251. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP; 1:17-op-45000-DAP; 1:17-op-45001-DAP; 1:17-op-45002-DAP; 1:17-op-45003-DAP; 1:17-op-45004-DAP; 1:17-op-45005-DAP; 1:18-op-45012-DAP; 1:18-op-45013-DAP; 1:18-op-45031-DAP; 1:18-op-45032-DAP; 1:18-op-45050-DAP; 1:18-op-45078-DAP; 1:18-op-45079-DAP; 1:18-op-45080-DAP. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket) (Rendon, Carole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Summit, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Represented By: Geoffrey E. Hobart
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley W. Hardin
Represented By: Steven M. Pyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Sandra K. Zerrusen
Represented By: Aaron E. McQueen
Represented By: Robert A. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina J. Matic
Represented By: Redi Kasollja
Represented By: Gregory N. Heinen
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: Jaclyn V. Piltch
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Represented By: Elisa P. McEnroe
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: Lauren M. Fincher
Represented By: Brandan J. Montminy
Represented By: C. Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny A. Hergenrother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: Lauren M. Fincher
Represented By: Brandan J. Montminy
Represented By: C. Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescription Supply Inc
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie K. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiteAid Corp.
Represented By: Elisa P. McEnroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Jonathan L Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Tina M. Tabacchi
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Fire District
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Norton, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Boston Heights, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lakemore, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copley Township, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springfield Township, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Monroe Falls, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Tallmadge, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Stow, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Township, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Summit, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Aelish Marie Baig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Akron, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Barberton, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Mogadore, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coventry Township, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Richfield, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit County Combined General Health District
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fairlawn, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Peninsula, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Clinton, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Green, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Silver Lake, Ohio
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New Franklin
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Reed
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Nace
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Raber
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hanna
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Markey
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Kostoff
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Chirs
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Zibritosky
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Musarra
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Pullekins
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Macedonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Bevan Walsh
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irv Sugarman
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Belfance
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Criedel
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Balthis
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Price
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Guidetti
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Miller
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Bryan
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Heydorn
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshal Pitchford
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Tina M. Tabacchi
Represented By: Tara A. Fumerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: HBC Service Company
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: William H. Falin
Represented By: Erin G. Allen
Represented By: George M. Moscarino
Represented By: Robert M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ohio CVS Stores, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Delinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Giant Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Ohio Board of Pharmacy
Represented By: Henry G. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?