Pierce County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Pierce County
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., John and Jane Does 1-100, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Walmart, Inc., Rhodes Technologies and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018op45195
Filed: February 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 22, 2021 Filing 21 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) CVS Health Corporation; CVS Pharmacy Inc.; CVS RX Services, Inc.; and Rite Aid Corporation. Filed by Pierce County. (Ko, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; and Rhodes Technologies. Filed by Pierce County. (Ko, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., John and Jane Does 1-100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart, Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGX LLC; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC; Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co; & Walmart, Inc.. Filed by Pierce County. (Ko, David)
August 2, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Pierce County. Mallinckrodt, LLC waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
July 5, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Pierce County. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
May 25, 2018 Filing 14 First Amended complaint ADDING NEW PARTY DEFENDANTS ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC, ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MALLINCKRODT PLC, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC n/k/a ACTAVIS, INC. against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s). Filed by Pierce County. (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Registered Agent on February 8, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 12 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Endo Health Solutions Inc., c/o The CT Company, Registered Agent on February 7, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 11 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Johnson & Johnson on February 8, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Registered Agent on February 8, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service by personal service executed upon The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. c/o Prentice Hall Corp. System Inc., Registered Agent on February 7, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Purdue Pharma, L.P. on February 7, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
March 1, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Purdue Pharma, Inc. c/o CT Corporation, Registered Agent on February 8, 2018 filed on behalf of Pierce County (Loeser, Derek)
February 16, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western. Case number 3:18-cv-05086. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 15, 2018 Filing 5 MDL 2804 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 9); in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; Northern District of Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT., FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/23/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2018, Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2018. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]
February 5, 2018 JSR due 5/7/2018. (JL) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5184560), filed by Pierce County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from wawd on 2/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierce County
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Michelle Luna-Green
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Alison Gaffney
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?